Jordan v. Paul Financial, LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory M. Jordan
Defendant: Paul Financial, LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv04496
Filed: August 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER granting joint motion for final approval of settlement. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/19/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND INCENTIVE AWARDS 433 436 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER TO PRODUCE RECORDS FOR FEE APPLICATION due 11/14/13. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/12/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER RE: STIPULATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/17/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/21/13., Motions terminated: 424 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Josephina Goldhaber, Eli Goldhaber, Gregory M. Jordan.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER Defining Certified Class and Appointing Class Representatives and Class Counsel; Pursuant to Order (Doc. 413). Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/25/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER DENYING RBS FINANCIAL PRODUCTS INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 411 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 392 continuance ORDER w/signature (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER continuing motions (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER RE: EMERGENCY EX PARTE APPLICATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 339 corrected order continuing motions to 6/17/11 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER Motion Hearing for Class Certification set for 5/20/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. re 309 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER re:P protective order (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting re 294 Request. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT RBS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 253 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER re: No. 287 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER continuing cmc to 9/24/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE RECENT DECISION (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER CONTINUING CMC TO 7/30/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER continuing cmc to 6/11/10 @ 3 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER continuing cmc to 5/14/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting 263 Motion to Appear by Telephone (counsel must contact the clerk and provide her with the direct phone numbers) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER continuing motion and cmc to 3/12/10 at 9 a.m. and 3 p.m., respectively (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER continuing cmc to 2/12/10 @ 2:30 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009) Modified on 10/29/2009 (tf, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting PRO HAC (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER re 241 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting extension (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER allowing the filing of the amended complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting 228 Motion for Leave to File (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 SCHEDULING ORDER RE: AMENDED COMPLAINT due 7/24/09.(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 200 Motion for Leave to File (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER RE: ORAL ARGUMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER VACATING HEARING (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting extension. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/23/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER continuing ADR deadline. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/8/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER continuing motion and cmc to 5/15/09 @ 9 a.m. and 3 p.m., respectively. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/26/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DENY OR CONTINUE DEFENDANTS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting substitution. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/12/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER continuing cmc to 3/27/09 @ 3:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/10/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION and DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 150 , 151 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF [Docket No. 138] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting pro hac vice re 116 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER re 119 . Signed by Judge Illston on 12/23/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER continuing cmc to 11/14/08. Signed by Judge Illston on 11/5/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 102 Ex Parte Application to seal (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Paul Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory M. Jordan
Represented By: Robert Ira Spiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?