United States Small Business Administration in Capacity as Receiver for Alto Tech II, L.P. v. Alto Tech Ventures, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States Small Business Administration in its capacity as Receiver for Alto Tech II, LP
Defendant: Alto Tech Ventures, LLC, Alto Tech Management, LLC, Gloria Chen Wahl, Walter T.G. Lee and Thanos Triant
Case Number: 3:2007cv04530
Filed: August 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/15/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER setting hearing on motion for determination of good faith settlement (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 101 Motion for Leave to File (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Summary Judgment (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/9/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Small Business Administration in Capacity as Receiver for Alto Tech II, L.P. v. Alto Tech Ventures, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Small Business Administration in its capacity as Receiver for Alto Tech II, LP
Represented By: Gregory Caesar Nuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alto Tech Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alto Tech Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Chen Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter T.G. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thanos Triant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?