United States of America v. Cathcart et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Charles Cathcart, Yurij Debevc, Robert Nagy, Derivium Capital (USA), Inc., Chi-Hsiu Hsin, Franklin Thomason and Optech Limited
Miscellaneous: Randolph Anderson
Case Number: 3:2007cv04762
Filed: September 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 409 JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/5/2010. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 407 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re 400 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Derivium USA Objections to R&R due by 2/26/2010.Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 12, 2010. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER GRANTING re 403 Letter filed by United States of America for Nathan Clukey to appear telephonically at hearing on Feb. 12, 2010. Court to initiate the phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/4/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/1/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 395 396 Motion to Shorten Time, Motion for Certification Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b), and Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Disclosures (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 394 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/6/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 392 TRIAL RULES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/5/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER ADVANCING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/30/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/23/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/2/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER VACATING Order Granting In Part, Denying In Part Motion for Protective Order as to Non-Party Witness Randolph Anderson [Docket no. 338]. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/30/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART re 313 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Randolph Anderson. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/29/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER Denying Request for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/24/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 239 Summary Judgment and Denying 241 242 243 Summary Judgment and Miscellaneous Rulings 330 331 332 (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/10/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/12/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 289 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Compel Completion of the Deposition of Third Party Witness Timothy Scrantom filed by Franklin Thomason, Chi-Hsiu Hsin. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/6/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE re 286 Letter filed by Yurij Debevc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/4/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE and ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/20/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER GRANTING re 252 Letter Brief filed by Franklin Thomason, Chi-Hsiu Hsin for Edward Ord to appear by phone on 7/10/9 at 9:30 AM on USA's Motion to Compel. Court to initiate the phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/9/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 AMENDED ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant HSIN'S Motion For Protective Order Limiting the Use of Deposition of HSIN re 192 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Chi-Hsiu Hsin. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/6/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER Re Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge Hamilton on June 18, 2009. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Re Plaintiff's Request for Clarification. Signed by Judge Hamilton on May 20, 2009. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 202 Motion to Stay Depositions. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 188 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Charles Cathcart. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/5/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING TWO FOREIGN DEPOSITIONS re 182 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/22/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER re 177 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/8/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Sustaining Plaintiff's Objections and Overruling Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge Hamilton on April 2, 2009. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Re Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge Hamilton on March 20, 2009. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Granting in Part and Denying in Part 145 Motion to Compel Discovery; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 158 Motion to Compel Depositions. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER re 159 Overruling Objections to Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Hamilton on January 7, 2009. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WAIVE REQUIREMENT TO MEET AND CONFER IN PERSON. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/05/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT OPTECH'S MOTION TO STAY re 136 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Optech Limited. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/11/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE OF REFERENCE, TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING re: 145 First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiff United States of America.Opposition due by 1/9/2009. Replies due by 1/16/2009. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Opposition due by 12/1/8 re: 142 USA's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Charles Hsin. No reply brief. Court will determine future proceedings for this Motion. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/26/8. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 FINAL JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION re 125 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/22/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 122 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Disclosure of Experts due by 4/20/2009. Non-Expert Discovery due by 5/20/2009. Expert Discovery due by 7/20/2009. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 6/24/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2009 02:30 PM. Court Trial set for 10/19/2009 08:30 AM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/3/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 84 84 Motion to Dismiss in Part and Denying it in Part (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 86 Motion to Stay (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 113 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue the Trial Date and All Associated Deadlines filed by Robert Nagy, 111 MOTION to Continue Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 filed by Optech Limited, Chi-Hsiu Hsin. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/11/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 43 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Robert Nagy. Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2008 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/5/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cathcart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nathan Elliott Clukey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Cathcart
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yurij Debevc
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Nagy
Represented By: Tom Prountzos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derivium Capital (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi-Hsiu Hsin
Represented By: Tom Prountzos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Thomason
Represented By: Tom Prountzos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optech Limited
Represented By: Edward O.C. Ord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Randolph Anderson
Represented By: Richard A. Hricik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?