Gund et al v. Pilatus Aircraft, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: George Gund, III, Theo Gund, George Gund, IV and GG Aircraft, LLC
Defendant: Pilatus Aircraft, Ltd., Pilatus Business Aircraft, Ltd. and Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp.
Case Number: 3:2007cv04902
Filed: September 21, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/23/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re: Substitution of Attorney of Garth W. Aubert. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/28/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting a two-week extension for depositions. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/24/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Granting in Part and Denying in Part re (44) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-04902-TEH (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the hearing on defendant's motion for summary judgment to 3/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/13/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/3/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/20/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/8/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gund et al v. Pilatus Aircraft, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gund, III
Represented By: Walter J. Lack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theo Gund
Represented By: Walter J. Lack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gund, IV
Represented By: Walter J. Lack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GG Aircraft, LLC
Represented By: Walter J. Lack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilatus Aircraft, Ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilatus Business Aircraft, Ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp.
Represented By: Eduardo Martorell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?