Beckway v. DeShong et al
Plaintiff: Brent Beckway
Defendant: Paul DeShong, Rodney K. Mitchell, County of Lake Sheriff's Department and County of Lake
Case Number: 3:2007cv05072
Filed: October 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER ON MOTION TO DENY COSTS, granting 324 Motion to Deny Costs (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL by Judge Thelton Henderson denying 312 Motion for New Trial (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER REGARDING FURTHER DECLARATION OF BARON J. DREXEL. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 4/17/12. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 326 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Withdraw Document and Permit Filing of New Declaration. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/11/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO AWARD OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 3/27/12. Any motion pursuant to this Order due April 2, 2012; any response to such motion due April 16, 2012; any reply in support of such motion due April 23, 2012.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER ON MOTION TO QUASH Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson: denying re 264 Motion to Quash; denying re 267 Motion to Quash. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Thelton Henderson granting 235 Motion in Limine; denying 236 Motion in Limine; granting 232 Motion in Limine no. 4; granting 232 Motion in Limine no. 5. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 265 TRIAL RULES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 1/10/2012. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Thelton Henderson granting in part and denying in part 232 Motion in Limine; denying 234 Motion in Limine; denying 237 Motion in Limine; denying 238 Motion in Limine; granting in part 239 Motion in Limine; denying 240 Motion in Limine; granting 241 Motion in Limine (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 214 Motion for Summary Judgment (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Sheriff Rodney K. Mitchell and County of Lake are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/08/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 THIRD ORDER FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 10/12/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 SECOND ORDER FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/4/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/19/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 08/31/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/10/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Appearance at Medical Examination. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/20/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 149 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 152 Motion for Summary Judgment (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011).
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER re: Further Briefing. Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment set for 4/4/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/08/11. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 153 Briefing Schedule on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/17/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 117 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/22/2010 (tehlc2, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER appointing Special Master for Discovery. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/21/2010. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of ADR deadline. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/08/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion for Reconsideration; granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion for Reconsideration. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/26/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 8/2/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/17/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating prior referral to ENE and referring case to mediation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/04/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 86 Motion to Amend/Correct Answer. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference and motion hearing to 4/26/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/26/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER for extension of time to file motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/25/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Further Telephonic Case Management Conference to 12/7/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/01/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Telephonic Case Management Conference until 10/5/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/17/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckway v. DeShong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Beckway
Represented By: Charles Frederick Bourdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul DeShong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney K. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Lake Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?