Candelore v. LDK Solar Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Allan Candelore
Defendant: LDK Solar Co., Ltd., LDK Solar USA, Inc., Xiaofeng Peng and Jack K. Lai
Case Number: 3:2007cv05182
Filed: October 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUND by Judge Alsup granting 583 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 580 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 579 CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING FINAL CLASS APPROVAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 29, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Alsup granting 554 Motion for Settlement; granting in part and denying in part 555 Motion for Attorney Fees (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Alsup granting 536 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY FILING OF DOCUMENTS by Judge Alsup denying 514 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL (DKT. NO. 327). Signed by Judge Alsup on February 24, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER RE PROPOSED MODIFICATIONS OF INTRODUCTORY PARAGRAPH TO CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 23, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO SEAL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Alsup denying 405 Motion ; denying 411 Motion ; denying 418 Motion ; granting 429 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 431 Motion ; denying 441 Motion to Seal Do cument ; denying 442 Motion ; denying 446 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 448 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 451 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 453 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 455 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 458 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 472 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 482 Motion ; denying 492 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Judge Alsup granting 500 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER POSTPONING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 10, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER RE LETTER OF FEBRUARY 5, 2010. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/5/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER DENYING LEAD PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Alsup denying 402 Motion to Strike (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying (278) Motion to Compel; denying (321) Motion to Compel in case 3:07-cv-05182-WHA (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PAGE-LIMIT EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 28, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 319 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (3/22/2010) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (3/8/2010 AT 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/1/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 318 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/30/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER EXTENDING EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF TO DECEMBER 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 19, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER DENYING EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 16, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 310 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/30/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER OVERRULING LEAD PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO SIXTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/15/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING OF ONE DEPOSITION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 2, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER ON DISCLOSING EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/28/09. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER REQUESTING OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 22, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 301 EIGHTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/16/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 296 SEVENTH DISCOVERY ORDER re (287 in 3:07-cv-05182-WHA) Letter, filed by Shahpour Javizdad, (288 in 3:07-cv-05182-WHA) Letter filed by Shahpour Javizdad. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/4/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 286 SIXTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/26/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying (279) Motion to Seal in case 3:07-cv-05182-WHA (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST RE LETTER DATED JULY 15, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/20/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERgranting 271 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S SUBPOENA ON NON-PARTY SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT. Signed by Judge Bernard Zimmerman on May 28, 2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 REQUEST FOR VIEWS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE REGARDING STATUS OF DISCOVERY [ re (244 in 3:07-cv-05182-WHA) MOTION Modification of Discovery Schedule filed by Shahpour Javizdad]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/15/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 USCA ORDER - The court denies petition for permission to appeal. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER VACATING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/17/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/13/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 FOURTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/7/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 THIRD DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/3/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/20/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/18/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER RE MOTION TO APPROVE FORM OF CLASS NOTICE, PLAN OF NOTICE AND NOTICE ADMINISTRATORgranting 178 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/27/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS LETTER DATED 2/23/2009. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/24/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/20/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Alsup granting 119 Motion to Certify Class; granting 138 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 141 Motion to Seal; denying 147 Motion in Limine; granting 164 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
October 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DAUBERT MOTION BRIEFING AND HEARING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER DENYING CHINA-BASED DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY by Judge Alsup denying 108 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 108 Motion to Dismiss; denying 109 Motion to Stay (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON LEAD PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Candelore v. LDK Solar Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Candelore
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LDK Solar Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LDK Solar USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiaofeng Peng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack K. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?