Sun Microsystems, Inc. v. Network Appliance, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Defendant: Network Appliance, Inc.
Miscellaneous: Symantec Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv05488
Filed: February 5, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2010 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/15/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
August 5, 2010 401 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION & ORDER Re Withdrawal of Pending Motions re 400 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabth D. Laporte on 8/5/2010. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
June 4, 2010 398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (397 in 3:07-cv-05488-EDL) Stipulation Extending Stay Until August 4, 2010 filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 6/4/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 24, 2010 396 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,632,012. Signed by Judge Laporte on 5/24/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
April 27, 2010 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laporte denying 318 Motion to Seal (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 6, 2010 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Stipulation filed by Network Appliance, Inc., Case stayed.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/6/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 29, 2010 358 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SEALING REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Laporte on 3/29/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 22, 2010 357 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re 346 Motion for Leave to File; Denying re 261 Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,868,417; Granting in Part & Denying in Part re 304 MOTION to Strike Improperly served Supplemental Expert Report of Gregory R. Ganger Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,868,417 and U.S. Patent No. 7,107,385. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
February 24, 2010 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re 268 Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,124,987. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 19, 2010 348 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re 266 Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,632,012. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 5, 2010 345 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 343 Joint MOTION for Administrative Relief for Leave to Permit Delivery and Use of Electronic Equipment at Motions for Summary Judgment Hearing Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/5/2010. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
January 15, 2010 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 327 Joint MOTION For Leave to Permit Delivery and Use of Electronic Equipment at Motions for Summary Judgment Hearings filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 1/14/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
December 23, 2009 308 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 303 Stipulation, filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 23, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 18, 2009 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 297 REQUEST TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/18/2009. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 16, 2009 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laporte granting 243 Motion to Amend Reply;granting in part and denying in part 241 Motion to Seal and 255 Motion to Seal(edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 15, 2009 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DECEMBER 8, 2009 JOINT LETTER BRIEF. Signed by Judge Laporte on 12/15/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 11, 2009 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING JOINT BRIEF REGARDING NOVEMBER 18, 2009 JOINT LETTER REGARDING SUN'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL 30(B)(6) DEPONENT AND REGARDING SEALING REQUEST (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
November 24, 2009 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Withdrawal of Aaron M. Nathan as Counsel for NetApp, Inc. re 249 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/24/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 20, 2009 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING NOVEMBER 18, 2009 JOINT LETTER BRIEF. Signed by Judge Laporte on 11/20/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 16, 2009 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 245 Stipulation filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 11/16/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 3, 2009 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (578 in 3:07-cv-06053-EDL) MOTION to Seal - Administrative Request to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Joint Statement Regarding NetApp's Objections that Arose During the Deposition of Gary Ross filed by Sun Microsystems Inc. Signed by Judge Laporte on 11/3/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 14, 2009 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (107 in 3:08-cv-01641-EDL) Letter filed by Sun Microsystems Inc, (576 in 3:07-cv-06053-EDL) Letter filed by Sun Microsystems Inc, (229 in 3:07-cv-05488-EDL) Letter filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/14/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
September 8, 2009 227 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING Dates for Hearings on Motions for Summary Judgment re 215 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/8/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
August 31, 2009 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laporte granting in part and denying in part motions to amend invalidity and infringement contentions; granting in part motion to compel; and modifying case schedule (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
June 19, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laporte Re Discovery Letters; in case 3:07-cv-05488-EDL; denying (369) Ex Parte Application in case 3:07-cv-06053-EDL (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 15, 2009 167 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING Due Date for Reply Brief Regarding Sun Microsystems, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Document Production forn Non-party Symantec Corporation to 6/19/2009. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/15/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
May 29, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Discovery Letters. Signed by Judge Laporte on 5/29/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 21, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following case management conference. Signed by Judge Laporte on 5/21/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 5, 2009 136 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING Deadline for Motions to Compel re 134 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/5/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
March 9, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Discovery Letters. Signed by Judge Laporte on 3/9/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 27, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request to Amend Infringement Contentions 122 Letter filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/27/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
January 29, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING Further Case Management Conference: Joint case management statement due 4/23/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2009 02:00 PM. Opening expert reports due 8/7/2009. Rebuttal expert reports due 8/28/2009. Parties shall file final reply briefs on the summary judgment motions by 11/4/2009. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/29/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 14, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Tentative Claim Construction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/14/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 23, 2008 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Construing Claim Terms of the '720 and '417 Patents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/23/2008. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 22, 2008 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Construing Claim Terms of the '987, '855, '012 and '787 Patents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/22/2008. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
November 25, 2008 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Claim Construction Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/25/2008. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 18, 2008 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 97 Stipulation filed by Network Appliance, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/18/08. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
October 15, 2008 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 87 Joint MOTION For Leave to Permit Delivery and Use of Electronic Equipment at Tutorial and Markman Hearings filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/15/2008. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 9, 2008 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 77 Letter filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 9, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
September 29, 2008 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Joint Request for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit for Responsive Claim Construction Brief re 66 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/29/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 16, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION LOGISTICS re 64 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/16/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 15, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Joint Request for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit for Opening Claim Construction Brief 54 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/15/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 9, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING Stipulation re Claim Construction Schedule 51 . Tutorial reset for 10/20/2008 09:30 AM. Claim construction hearing for Sun patents set for 11/10/2008 09:30 AM. Claim construction hearing for NetApp patents set for 11/24/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/9/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Microsystems, Inc. v. Network Appliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Alberti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Appliance, Inc.
Represented By: Byron Cain Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Symantec Corporation
Represented By: Mark A. Flagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?