Johnson v. Chevron Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Bernard Johnson, III
Defendant: Chevron Corporation, Chevron Corporation Long Term Disability Plan Organization, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Catherine Drew, Kathryn M. Gallacher, Susan J. Solger, Sellers Stough, Krystal Tran, Debbie Wong and Gary A, Yamashita
Case Number: 3:2007cv05756
Filed: November 14, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL 450 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF REGARDING ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ADMONISH AND FOR SANCTIONS AND COSTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY DISTRICT COURT'S ORDERS AND JUDGMENTS PENDING APPEAL re 393 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER to Remove Doc. 403-2 From Public's View (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO BILL OF COSTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO REDACT NOVEMBER 18, 2008 HEARING TRANSCRIPT[Docket No. 371] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER Re: Removing Doc. #352 from Public View (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 351 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER removing Doc. #329 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 334 CORRECTED ORDER (BRIEF NOT TO EXCEED 20 PAGES) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER allowing adjusted briefing schedule re 319 . (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER STRIKING PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [Docket No. 263] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
February 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [Docket No. 264] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2009)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER CLARIFYING JANUARY 26, 2009 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS [Docket No. 247] Letter filed by Gary A, Yamashita, Krystal Tran, Kathryn M. Gallacher, Sellers Stough, Harald Smedal, Catherine Drew, Susan J. Solger, Debbie Wong, Robert Schmitt. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/10/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [Docket No. 244] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due 2/11/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO REFER DISCOVERY DISPUTES [Docket No. 219] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER DENYING re 218 Letter filed by Samuel Bernard Johnson, III to exceed three page limit. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/6/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER DENYING re 208 Letter filed by Samuel Bernard Johnson, III To Take More than 10 Depositions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/17/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF re 199 Letter filed by Gary A, Yamashita, Krystal Tran, Kathryn M. Gallacher, Chevron Corporation Long Term Disability Plan Organization, Sellers Stough, Chevron Environmental Management Company, Harald Smedal, Chevron Corporation, Catherine Drew, Susan J. Solger, Robert Schmitt, Debbie Wong. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/24/8. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO PRETRIAL DISCOVERY ORDER [Docket No. 157] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO MODIFY PRETRIAL ORDER and DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Further Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Quash 128 . Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/1/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion To Quash re 128 Letter Brief filed by Samuel Bernard Johnson, III. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/25/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Chevron Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Bernard Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation Long Term Disability Plan Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Environmental Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn M. Gallacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan J. Solger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sellers Stough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystal Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary A, Yamashita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?