Arroyo Vista Tenants Association et al v. City of Dublin et al
Petitioner: Arroyo Vista Tenants Association, Rhenea Keyes, Andres Arroyo, Darlene Brown and Elise Veal
Respondent: City of Dublin, Dublin Housing Authority and Housing Authority of the County of Alameda
Case Number: 3:2007cv05794
Filed: November 14, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Injunctive/Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/16/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REVISED STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING TRIAL PREPARATION SCHEDULE; Signed by Judge Mariliyn Hall Patel on 12/3/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING TRIAL PREPARATION SCHEDULE: Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/24/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY TRIAL PREPARATION SCHEDULE AND TRIAL. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/23/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING TRIAL SCHEDULES: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 6/9/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Jury Trial reset for 6/22/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Mariyln Hall Patel on 10/7/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying trial and pretrial dates/deadlines: Jury Trial reset for 4/27/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Pretrial Conference reset for 4/7/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/10/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL SCHEDULES: Bench Trial reset for 3/2/2010 08:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2010 02:30 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/11/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arroyo Vista Tenants Association et al v. City of Dublin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arroyo Vista Tenants Association
Represented By: Naomi Lynn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rhenea Keyes
Represented By: Naomi Lynn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andres Arroyo
Represented By: Naomi Lynn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darlene Brown
Represented By: Naomi Lynn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elise Veal
Represented By: Naomi Lynn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: City of Dublin
Represented By: Joseph Martin Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dublin Housing Authority
Represented By: Lee Charles Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Housing Authority of the County of Alameda
Represented By: Lee Charles Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?