Chelsea, LLC v. Regal Stone, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Chelsea, LLC
Defendant: Regal Stone, Ltd., Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd. and China Ocean Shipping Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv05800
Filed: November 15, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2010 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 212 Motion for Attorney Fees (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 18, 2010 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Stipulation Regarding Additional Notice and Extension of Closure Claim Deadline to Certain Potential Dungeness Crab Settlement Class Members. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/18/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
October 22, 2010 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Supplemental Declarations. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/22/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
September 10, 2010 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Supplemental Declarations re: Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/10/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 7, 2010 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (45) Motion to Dismiss Captain McIsaac and Captain Nyborg and denying Request for Attorney Fees in case 3:08-cv-05098-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
April 21, 2010 209 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Limited Intervention of State Court Plaintiffs and Filing Motion for Preliminary Approval of Dungeness Crab Settlement. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/21/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
January 27, 2010 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti in case 3:07-cv-05800-SC; granting (90) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting (93) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 3:08-cv-02052-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
December 17, 2009 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Applicability of Section 1198 (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 8, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing; continuing case management conference to 3/19/2010 (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
September 22, 2009 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/21/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 2, 2009 183 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Consolidating Case with Cases: C-08-5098, C-07-6045, C-07-5800, C-08-2052, AND C-08-2268. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/1/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
April 29, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Further Conference set for 5/1/09 is continued to 9/25/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/29/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 17, 2009 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Attorney Anthony M. Urie for Plaintiffs (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
March 23, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 84 Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Marc J. Derewetzky for RLI Insurance Company added. Attorney Julia Ann Molander terminated.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/20/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
February 3, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (156) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:07-cv-05800-SC; granting (130) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:07-cv-06045-SC; granting (78) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:08-cv-02052-SC; granting (44) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:08-cv-02268-SC; granting (16) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:08-cv-05098-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
September 30, 2008 142 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Order Extending Hanjin Shipping's Time to File and Serve a Response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/29/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 19, 2008 140 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Hanjin Shipping Co., Ltd.'s Time to File and Serve a Response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/19/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 8, 2008 134 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Hanjin Shippings Time to File and Serve a Response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/8/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
February 6, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND ORDER DISMISSING Stephen Melz; Bob Silva; Patrick Davis and Gale Force Inc, without prejudice, terminated. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 4, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court PLAINTIFF ROSE MARIE, INC.'S DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
February 1, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defedant Hanjin Shipping's time to response to Plaintiff's complaint.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/1/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
November 20, 2007 21 Opinion or Order of the Court WARRANT For Arrest issued. Signed by Judge Samueul Conti on 11/20/07. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chelsea, LLC v. Regal Stone, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea, LLC
Represented By: Adel A. Nadji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Stone, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Ocean Shipping Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?