Sanchez et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker and Claudia Sanchez
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA and Wells Fargo & Company
Interested Party: Donna McMillian, Wachovia Corporation, Kristy Dagenhart and Terry Dagenhart
Undetermined: Gilardi & Co. LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv05923
Filed: November 21, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2017 Filing 722 Statement re #721 Order, Joint Statement re October 4, 2017 Order Requesting Response by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Phil Cooper, #2 Declaration of Richard D. McCune)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/4/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2017: #1 Letter) The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/4/2017, a copy of this order with sealed attachment was served by sending it via first-class mail to Richard McCune and Sonya Winner.(afmS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF SECOND HALF OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/15/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER RE DISTRIBUTION OF UNCLAIMED FUNDS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/15/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 14, 2016 Filing 718 Proposed Order re #709 Order [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF SECOND HALF OF ATTORNEYS' FEES by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 14, 2016 Filing 717 Proposed Order re #716 Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DISTRIBUTION OF UNCLAIMED FUNDS by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER APPROVING PLAN FOR UNCLAIMED PROPERTY PROCESS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER RE DECEMBER 2, 2016 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dl, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2016 Filing 714 Joint Statement and [Proposed] Order re December 2, 2016 Order Requesting Response re #712 Order by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 12/7/2016) Modified on 12/8/2016 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2016 Filing 713 Remark: Letter from Class Member ordered filed under seal per #712 Order Requesting Response. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/2/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dl, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2016 Filing 711 Statement Recommendations re Disposition of Unclaimed Funds re #709 Order by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Phil Cooper)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2016) Modified on 11/14/2016 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2016 Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked.[err102] Re: #710 Declaration in Support filed by Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 4, 2016 Filing 710 Declaration of Phil Cooper re Judgment Distribution re #709 Updated Scheduling Order filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/4/2016) Modified on 11/7/2016 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 709 UPDATED SCHEDULING ORDER RE DISTRIBUTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/2/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 708 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Update Re Distribution and Unopposed [Proposed] Further Scheduling Order by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 10/21/2016) Modified on 10/24/2016 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ***CORRECTED*** ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER DISCOVERY AND HOLDING IN ABEYANCE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 706 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PROVISION OF INFORMATION TO THE CLASS ADMINISTRATOR FOR USE IN ATTEMPTING TO FIND UPDATED ADDRESS INFORMATION FOR UNDELIVERABLE JUDGMENT CHECKS by Hon. William Alsup granting #705 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 705 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Provision of Information to the Class Administrator for Use in Attempting to Find Updated Address Information for Undeliverable Judgment Checks filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 704 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Jolley, David) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 8, 2016 Filing 703 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA re #702 Notice (Other) Of Lodging Under Seal (Jolley, David) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 702 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA Of Lodging Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 701 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA Of Filing Declaration Re Completion of Electronic Distribution (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 700 ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION TO PROCEED. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/10/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 699 Statement JOINT STATEMENT CONFIRMING CLASS DISTRIBUTION IS READY TO OCCUR, SUMMARIZING FINAL ALLOCATION OF FUNDS, AND IDENTIFYING THIRD PARTY FINANCIAL INSTITUTION DESIGNATED BY THE CLASS ADMINISTRATOR by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Olsen Declaration, #2 Declaration Cooper Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 27, 2016 Filing 698 RESPONSE re #696 Notice of Non Compliance by Wells Fargo Bank NA re (Attachments: #1 Declaration David M. Jolley, #2 Declaration Mark Lentz)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/27/2016) Modified on 4/27/2016 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2016 Filing 697 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA re #696 Notice (Other), Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Notice of Intent to Respond to Class Counsel's Notice of "Non-Compliance" and Request to Enter Distribution Order (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 26, 2016 Filing 696 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker of Non-Compliance by Wells Fargo and Request to Enter Order Authorizing Plan of Distribution to Proceed (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard M. Heimann, #2 Declaration of Phil Cooper, #3 Declaration of Arthur Olsen, #4 Proposed Order)(Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 14, 2016 Filing 695 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA of Withdrawal of Counsel Philip A. Scarborough (Scarborough, Philip) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 11, 2016 Filing 694 US Supreme Court Notice that the petition for a writ of certiorari is denied as to #598 Notice of Appeal filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
November 2, 2015 Filing 693 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 692 MANDATE of USCA Case 15-16232 as to #683 Notice of Appeal, filed by Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
September 3, 2015 Filing 691 Amended Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/21/2015, (amended solely to correct the date on its cover page) before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #687 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2015. (Related documents(s) #687 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 690 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #691 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/21/2015, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #687 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2015. (Related documents(s) #687 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 7/27/2015) Modified on 9/3/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2015 Filing 689 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/07/2013, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #687 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2015. (Related documents(s) #687 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 688 UPDATED SCHEDULING ORDER RE DISTRIBUTION by Hon. William Alsup granting #685 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 17, 2015 Filing 687 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 17, 2015 Filing 686 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on [All Hearings] before Judge WHA, re #684 USCA Case Number, #683 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 8/18/2015. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 685 Joint Statement and Request to Enter Updated Scheduling Order re Distribution by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Phil Cooper re Spot Check of Updated Class List, #2 Proposed Order -- Updated Scheduling Order re Distribution)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2015) Modified on 7/17/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2015 Filing 684 USCA Case Number 15-16232 for #683 Notice of Appeal, filed by Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 19, 2015 Filing 683 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees #682 (Fee Pd $505, Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 0971-9616297.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order, #2 Exhibit B-Representation Statement)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 6/19/2015) Modified on 6/22/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER AWARDING FEES, EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS by Judge Alsup re #638 Motion for Attorney Fees. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 Filing 681 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2015. re #638 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. Motions Granted in Part. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney Richard Heimann; Roger Heller; Marc Pilotin. Defendant Attorney David Jolley; Emily Henn; Sonya Winner. Attachment minute order.(dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/21/2015)
May 18, 2015 Filing 680 RESPONSE to #679 Request for Response by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/18/2015) Modified on 5/18/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2015 Filing 679 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Response due by 5/20/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 15, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 678 RESPONSE to re #677 Objection to Reply Submissions by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 14, 2015 Filing 677 OBJECTIONS to re #675 Reply to Opposition/Response, #674 Reply to Opposition/Response by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 12, 2015 Filing 676 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Phil Cooper re #669 Declaration of Phil Cooper by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 5/12/2015) Modified on 5/12/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2015 Filing 675 REPLY (re #638 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) CLASS COUNSEL'S RESPONSE TO WELLS FARGO'S OBJECTION TO FEE SHIFTING PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. 1021.5 filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Arthur Olsen)(Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
May 8, 2015 Filing 674 REPLY (re #638 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 5/8/2015) Modified on 5/8/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2015 Filing 673 Error, See #675 REPLY (re #638 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) CLASS COUNSEL'S RESPONSE TO WELLS FARGO'S OBJECTION TO FEE SHIFTING PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. 1021.5 filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Arthur Olsen)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2015) Modified on 5/8/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2015 Filing 672 Error, See #674 REPLY (re #638 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) < filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2015) Modified on 5/8/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/8/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2015 Filing 671 RESPONSE (re #638 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Jolley and Exhibits A through D)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 5/1/2015) Modified on 5/1/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2015 Filing 670 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Notice of Further Appellate Activity (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 24, 2015 Filing 669 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Phil Cooper, KCC by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 15, 2015 Filing 668 Letter to the Court from Dianne M Holmes. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 3, 2015 Filing 667 DECLARATION of Sonya D. Winner in Opposition to #638 MOTION for Attorney Fees with unredacted exhibits filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Supplemental Declaration of Sonya D. Winner (unredacted), #2 Exhibit B to Supplemental Declaration of Sonya D. Winner (unredacted), #3 Exhibit C to Supplemental Declaration of Sonya D. Winner)(Related document(s) #638 ) (Scarborough, Philip) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 666 STIPULATION AND ORDER ON LIMITED DISCOVERY RELATING TO CLASS COUNSEL'S FEE MOTION; AND ORDER VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup re # 655 Motion ; # 663 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER DENYING SEALING MOTION (DKT. NO. 662) by Hon. William Alsup re # 662 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 664 RESPONSE (re # 662 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A and B to the Supplemental Declaration of Sonya D. Winner ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Wells Fargo's Provisional Administrative Motion to Seal Exhibits A and B to the Supplemental Declaration of Sonya J. Winner filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 663 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ON LIMITED DISCOVERY RELATING TO CLASS COUNSELS FEE MOTION filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 662 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A and B to the Supplemental Declaration of Sonya D. Winner filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emily Johnson Henn, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A (under seal), # 4 Exhibit B (under seal))(Henn, Emily) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 661 DECLARATION of Sonya D. Winner in Opposition to # 638 MOTION for Attorney Fees , # 639 Declaration in Support,, (Supplemental Declaration of Sonya D. Winner) filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) # 638 , # 639 ) (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER RE PARAGRAPH 9 OF JANUARY 30 ORDER re # 659 Letter, # 658 Letter. Response due by 3/26/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 23, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
March 23, 2015 Filing 659 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA re # 658 Letter Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Notice of Intent to Oppose Class Counsel's Letter to the Court and Request For A Briefing Schedule (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Class Counsel's Letter Concerning Declarations re Attorney's Fees and Expenses)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
March 20, 2015 Filing 658 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel re Production of Wells Fargo Time Reports . (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 657 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE AND TENTATIVE COMMENTS re # 655 MOTION For Leave to Take Limited Discovery. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 17, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 655 MOTION For Leave to Take Limited Discovery Concerning Class Counsel's Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 3/31/2015. Replies due by 4/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of David M. Jolley ISO of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Leave to Take Limited Discovery, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Leave to Take Limited Discovery)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 656 Letter from Daniela Burke. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 653 Declaration of David M. Jolley re Email Notice filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 652 Declaration of Phil Cooper filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER APPOINTING KCC CLASS ACTION SERVICES LLC AS CLASS ADMINISTRATOR. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 24, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 23, 2015 Filing 650 STATUS REPORT on Risk-Management Evaluation of Class Administrator KCC by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 23, 2015 Filing 649 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA of Appellate Activity (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 23, 2015 Filing 648 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker of Filing Executed Agreement with KCC Class Action Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Appointing Class Administrator)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER RE PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE re # 642 Letter, # 643 Proposed Order.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 19, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER RE CLASS COUNSEL'S PROPOSED ORDER (DKT. NO. 645) re # 645 Proposed Order. Status report due February 27 at noon. Agreement due February 23 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 19, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 645 Proposed Order re # 633 Order by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 644 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 643 Proposed Order re # 642 Letter re Class Communications by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 642 Letter from Class Counsel and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re Class Communications . (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 640 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-29-2015, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re # 621 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2015. (Related documents(s) # 621 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 639 Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of # 638 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G - Part 1 of 5, # 8 Exhibit G - Part 2 of 5, # 9 Exhibit G - Part 3 of 5, # 10 Exhibit G - Part 4 of 5, # 11 Exhibit G - Part 5 of 5, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) # 638 ) (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 638 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER RE COMMENTS RE PROPOSED CLASS ADMINISTRATOR. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 17, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 636 RESPONSE to re # 635 Notice (Other), Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Response to Class Counsel's Comment Regarding Court's Tentative Appointment of Class Administrator by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 16, 2015 Filing 635 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, Claudia Sanchez re # 617 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Plaintiffs Comment Regarding Courts Tentative Appointment of Class Administrator and Response to Wells Fargos Provisional Objection Thereto (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 2/16/2015)
February 16, 2015 Filing 634 Statement Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Statement and Provisional Objection to Appointment of KCC as Class Administrator by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/16/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 633 NOTICE RE CLASS ADMINISTRATOR APPLICATIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 12, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 632 Class Administrator Application from KCC. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 631 Class Administrator Application from Rust Consulting and Kinsella Media. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 630 Class Administrator Application from Garden City Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 App Part 2)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 629 Class Administrator Application from Analytics LLC. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 628 Class Administrator Application from Heffler Claims Group LLC re # 622 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exh A, # 2 Exh B, # 3 Exh C)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 627 Letter from Gilardi & Co. LLC . (Burke, Daniel) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER RE CLASS COUNSEL'S FEE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup re # 624 Motion to Amend/Correct.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 625 RESPONSE (re # 624 MOTION to Amend/Correct # 619 Order, Set Deadlines -- PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO AMEND IN PART ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES ) filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Proposed order due by 2/19/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 12, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 624 MOTION to Amend/Correct # 619 Order, Set Deadlines -- PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO AMEND IN PART ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. Responses due by 2/25/2015. Replies due by 3/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Amend in Part Order re Attorney's Fees and Expenses)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 623 Class Administrator Application from Epiq Class Action & Claims Administration re # 622 Order. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015) Modified on 2/12/2015 (dt, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2015 Filing 622 GUIDANCE RE CLASS ADMINISTRATOR APPLICATIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 4, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 621 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 620 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Case Management Conference held on 1/29/2015. Hearing on all matters noticed to the class set for 5/21/2015 at 2:00 PM.Court Reporter Name: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorney Michael Sobol; Roger Heller; Richard Heimann; Richard McCune. Defendant Attorney David Jolley; Emily Johnson Henn. Attachment Civil Minutes - 1/29/2015.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER RE ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES. Objections due by 2/11/2015 at noon. Counter-declaration due by 3/10/2015.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 30, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 618 REQUEST RE APPLICATIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 29, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 617 REQUEST FOR CLASS ADMINISTRATOR APPLICATIONS.Applications due by 2/12/2015 at noon. Objections due by 2/17/2015 at 7:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 29, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 616 SECOND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOLLOWING REMAND. Fee Motion due by 2/17/2015 at noon. Objections due by April 20, 2015. Responses due by 5/1/2015 at noon. Replies due by 5/8/2015 at noon. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 29, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 615 FINAL JUDGMENT RE INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 26, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 614 JOINT Case Management Statement. by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2015) Modified on 1/22/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2015 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. Correct event is Joint Case Management Statement. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: # 614 Notice (Other) filed by Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 12, 2015 Filing 613 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 12, 2015 Filing 612 MANDATE of USCA Cases 13-16195, 13-16598, 13-16749 as to # 604 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez, # 598 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 589 Notice of Appeal filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. re # 610 Joint MOTION. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2015 at noon. Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 9, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 8, 2015 Filing 610 Joint MOTION for Hearing -- Request for Rule 16 Status Conference following Remand from Court of Appeals filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
October 31, 2014 Filing 609 USCA Memorandum Cases 13-16195, 13-16598, 13-16749 as to # 604 Notice of Cross Appeal, # 598 Notice of Appeal,, # 589 Notice of Appeal (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
September 20, 2013 Filing 608 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 02/27/2008 to 05/02/2013 before Judge William H. Alsup, (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 607 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 02/27/2008 to 05/02/2013 before Judge William H. Alsup, (Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 606 USCA Case Number Case No 13-16749 . for # 604 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 3, 2013 Filing 605 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re # 604 Notice of Cross Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Docket)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 604 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0971-7967450. Appeal Record due by 9/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF MONEY JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL WITHOUT THE POSTING OF A SUPERSEDEAS BOND by Hon. William Alsup granting # 595 Motion to Stay.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 14, 2013 Filing 602 REPLY (re # 595 MOTION to Stay Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without The Posting of a Supersedeas Bond ) filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 12, 2013 Filing 601 RESPONSE (re # 595 MOTION to Stay Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without The Posting of a Supersedeas Bond ) filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 600 USCA 9th Circuit Case Number 13-16598 for # 598 Notice of Appeal filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 599 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re # 598 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Docket)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 598 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-7906051 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Henn, Emily) (Filed on 8/7/2013) Modified on 8/9/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). USCA 13-16598
August 7, 2013 Filing 597 Declaration of Steven Swords in Support of # 595 MOTION to Stay Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without The Posting of a Supersedeas Bond filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 595 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 596 Declaration of Paul Ackerman in Support of # 595 MOTION to Stay Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without The Posting of a Supersedeas Bond filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) # 595 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 595 MOTION to Stay Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without The Posting of a Supersedeas Bond filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 8/12/2013. Replies due by 8/14/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 594 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 2, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re # 591 Statement, filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 2, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 11, 2013 Filing 592 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 02/27/2008 to 05/02/2013 before Judge William H. Alsup, (Jolley, David) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 591 Statement Joint Recommendation After Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Judgment Following Remand by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 590 USCA 9th Circuit Case Number 13-16195 for # 589 Notice of Appeal filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 589 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Wells Fargo Bank NA.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-7764019 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Wells Fargo Bank N.A.'s Representation Statement)(Henn, Emily) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
May 16, 2013 Filing 588 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Veronica Gutierrez for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Heller, Roger) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 587 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 2, 2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2013. (Related documents(s) # 585 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FOLLOWING REMAND by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part # 580 Motion Judgment on Remand.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 585 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Wells Fargo Bank NA for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 584 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/2/2013 before Hon. William Alsup re # 580 MOTION for Entry of Judgment After Remand . Motion taken under submission.(Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2013)
April 11, 2013 Filing 583 REPLY (re # 580 MOTION Entry of Judgment After Remand ) filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 582 Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of # 581 Opposition/Response to Motion for Judgment Following Remand filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) # 581 ) (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 581 RESPONSE (re # 580 MOTION Entry of Judgment After Remand ) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment Following Remand filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 580 MOTION Entry of Judgment After Remand filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 3/29/2013. Replies due by 4/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 579 Posted in Error NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker Plaintiffs' Motion For Judgment Following Remand (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2013 Filing 578 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/7/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 3/7/2013). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 577 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER AFTER REMAND: Plaintiffs' motipn for judgment due 3/14/2013. Defendant's brief due 4/4/2013. Plaintiffs' reply due 4/11/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/7/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Posted in Error, Please Disregard CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER AFTER REMAND: Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Plaintiffs' motion for judgment due by 3/14/2013. Defendant's brief due by 4/4/2013. Plaintiffs' reply brief due by 4/11/2013. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/7/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013) Modified on 3/7/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Posted in Error, Please Disregard CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER AFTER REMAND: Bench Trial set for 2/10/2014 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Discovery due by 10/31/2013. Motions due by 12/5/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/7/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013) Modified on 3/7/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER of USCA Cases 10-16959, 10-17468 and 10-17689 as to # 478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 503 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 529 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re # 572 Notice (Other) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 571 Statement filed by Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 26, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 25, 2013 Filing 572 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA re # 571 Statement Notice of Intent to Oppose Plaintiffs' Statement After Remand (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Filing 571 Statement After Remand by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER of USCA Cases 10-16959, 10-17468 and 10-17689 as to # 478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 503 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 529 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 16, 2013 Filing 569 USCA Memorandum/Opinion Case No 10-16959, 10-17468, 10-17689 as to # 478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 503 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 529 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. Cases Remanded for Limited Purpose. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER of USCA as to # 478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 503 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 529 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. Appellant Wells Fargo's motion to file and oversized third cross-appeal brief is granted. USCA Nos. 10-16959; 10-17468; 10-17689 . (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER of USCA as to # 478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 503 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 529 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. Defendant-appellant/Cross-Appellee's motion to vacate and remand is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the third cross-appeal brief. USCA Nos. 10-16959; 10-17468; 10-17689 . (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER of USCA as to # 478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 503 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 529 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. Appellees' opposed motion to file an oversized second cross-appeal brief is granted. USCA Nos. 10-16959; 10-17468; 10-17689 . (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting (564) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:07-cv-05923-WHA. The more recently filed case C11-1222 DMR shall be reassigned to Judge Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 564 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Roger Heller, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Service)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 563 SECOND NOTICE REGARDING ANONYMOUS SUBMISSION re # 560 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 8, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 562 RESPONSE to Court's # 560 Notice Regarding Anonymous Submission by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 561 RESPONSE to re # 560 Order RESPONSE OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. TO THE COURT'S NOTICE REGARDING ANONYMOUS SUBMISSION by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 560 NOTICE REGARDING ANONYMOUS SUBMISSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 3, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 559 RESPONSE to Statement of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in Response to Order Partially Granting Its Motion for Reimbursement by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING WELLS FARGO'S MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT AND POSTPONING CLASS COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part # 507 Motion for Reimbursement and postponing # 509 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011) Modified on 1/20/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2011 Filing 557 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-13-11, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 556 Brief Class Counsel's Supplemental Briefing filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 554 Brief Supplemental Briefing of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 13, 2011 Filing 555 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/13/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/13/2011) re # 507 MOTION Reimbursement of Incremental Fees and Expenses filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 509 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsels Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR AMENDMENT TO ORDER RESOLVING BILL-OF-COSTS OBJECTIONS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup settling # 541 Motion for Bill of Costs (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER GRANTING CLASS COUNSEL'S REQUEST TO USE AUDIO-VISUAL EQUIPMENT AT JANUARY 13, 2011 MOTION HEARING by Judge Alsup granting # 551 Motion AV Equipment at Hearing (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 551 MOTION Request to Use Audio-Visual Equipment at January 13, 2011 Motion Hearing re # 507 MOTION Reimbursement of Incremental Fees and Expenses, # 509 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsels Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Alsup. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Class Counsel's Request to Use Audio-Visual Equipment at January 13, 2011 Motion Hearing)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 1/12/2011) Modified on 1/13/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2011 Filing 550 Brief Class Counsel's Supplemental Submission Pursuant to Court's January 10, 2011 Order filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael W. Sobol)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 549 Brief Supplemental Submission of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 10, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 547 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing Time. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 6, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 509 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsels Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities , # 507 MOTION Reimbursement of Incremental Fees and Expenses. ***Deadlines terminated # 543 Order, Set Hearings. Motions Hearing set for 1/13/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 23, 2010 Filing 546 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker for proceedings held on Multiple Dates before Judge Hon. William H. Alsup.. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 545 Reply to Opposition re # 541 MOTION for Bill of Costs for an Amendment to the Order Resolving Bill of Costs Objections, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 54(d)(1) filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 12/21/2010) Modified on 12/22/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2010 Filing 544 Memorandum in Opposition By Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. To Plaintiff's Purported # 541 Motion For An Amendment To Order Resolving Bill Of Costs Objections filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 12/20/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER ENTERING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE re # 542 Stipulation filed by Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 14, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 542 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing Date by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 541 MOTION for Bill of Costs for an Amendment to the Order Resolving Bill of Costs Objections, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 54(d)(1) filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING re # 539 Stipulation filed by Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 10, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 8, 2010 Filing 539 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Continue Hearing Date by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER RESOLVING BILL OF COSTS OBJECTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 2, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 537 Reply Memorandum re # 509 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsels Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Roger N. Heller)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 536 Declaration in Support of # 535 Reply Memorandum, Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Reimbursement of Incremental Fees and Expenses Recoverable Pursuant to the Court's Orders of May 5 and 13, 2009 filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) # 535 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 535 Reply Memorandum re # 507 MOTION Reimbursement of Incremental Fees and Expenses Reply in Support of Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Reimbursement of Incremental Fees and Expenses Recoverable Pursuant to the Court's Orders of May 5 and 13, 2009 filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 534 USCA Case Number 10-17689 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for # 529 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 533 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' # 514 Bill of Costs by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Jolley)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 11/29/2010) Modified on 11/30/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2010 Filing 532 ERRATA re # 530 Certificate of Service, # 529 Notice of Cross Appeal, by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 531 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re # 529 Notice of Cross Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 26, 2010 Filing 528 EXHIBITS re # 527 Affidavit in Support of Motion, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 527 EXHIBIT "2" to Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Reimbursement of Incremental Fees and Expenses filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Related document(s) # 527 ) (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 11/26/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 530 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker re # 529 Notice of Cross Appeal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 529 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to # 497 ORDER REGARDING JOINT RECOMMENDATION ON POST-TRIAL ISSUES, # 498 FINAL JUDGMENT by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. Filing fee $ 455, receipt 34611053172. (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010) USCA No. 10-17689 Modified on 11/30/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2010 Filing 527 AFFIDAVIT in Support by Richard D. McCune in Support of # 526 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank for Reimbursement of Incremental Fees and Expenses filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1", *** # 2 Exhibit "2" FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 528 . *** , # 3 Exhibit "3", # 4 Exhibit "4")(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 11/24/2010) Modified on 11/29/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/29/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2010 Filing 526 Memorandum in Opposition re # 507 MOTION Reimbursement of Incremental Fees and Expenses filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 525 Declaration of Karen Moore in Support of # 523 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 523 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 524 Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of # 523 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) # 523 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 523 Memorandum in Opposition re # 509 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsels Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 522 USCA Case Number 10-17468 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for # 503 Notice of Appeal filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER REGARDING BOND by Judge Alsup granting # 501 Motion to Stay (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 520 Response re # 517 Reply Memorandum, byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 519 Declaration in Support of # 517 Reply Memorandum, Declaration of Chris Slack in Support of Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Stay of Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without the Posting of a Supersedeas Bond filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 517 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 518 Declaration in Support of # 517 Reply Memorandum, Declaration of Paul Ackerman in Support of Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Stay of Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without the Posting of a Supersedeas Bond filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) # 517 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 517 Reply Memorandum re # 501 MOTION to Stay Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without the Posting of A Supersedeas Bond Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Stay of Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without the Posting of a Supersedeas Bond filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER DENYING IN PART MOTION TO STAY MONETARY JUDGMENT AND REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION re # 501 MOTION to Stay Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without the Posting of A Supersedeas Bond filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 10, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 515 Declaration of RICHARD D. McCUNE in Support of # 509 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsels Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Related document(s) # 509 ) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 514 BILL OF COSTS Class Counsels Bill of Costs by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 513 Declaration of ERIN WALKER in Support of # 509 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsels Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Related document(s) # 509 ) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 512 Declaration of VERONICA GUTIERREZ in Support of # 509 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsels Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Related document(s) # 509 ) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 511 Declaration of MICHAEL W. SOBOL in Support of # 509 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsels Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Related document(s) # 509 ) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 510 Declaration of RICHARD M. HEIMANN in Support of # 509 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsels Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Related document(s) # 509 ) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 509 MOTION for Attorney Fees Class Counsels Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 508 Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of # 507 MOTION Reimbursement of Incremental Fees and Expenses filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) # 507 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 507 MOTION Reimbursement of Incremental Fees and Expenses filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 506 RESPONSE in Support of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s # 501 Motion for Stay of Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without the Posting of a Supersedeas Bond filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 11/5/2010) Modified on 11/8/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2010 Filing 505 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A.s # 501 Motion For Stay Of Execution Of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without The Posting Of A Supersedeas Bond filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 11/3/2010) Modified on 11/4/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2010 Filing 504 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re # 503 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 503 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to # 498 FINAL JUDGMENT by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Filing fee $ 455, receipt 34611052256. (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement, # 2 Certificate of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010) USCA No. 10-17468 Modified on 11/18/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO STAY MONETARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup granting # 500 Ex Parte Application (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 501 MOTION to Stay Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without the Posting of A Supersedeas Bond filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 500 Ex Parte Application of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Expedited Briefing of and Decision on Motion for Stay of Execution of Money Judgment Pending Appeal Without the Posting of a Supersedeas Bond filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 499 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/29/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2011. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 498 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 25, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER REGARDING JOINT RECOMMENDATION ON POST-TRIAL ISSUES. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 25, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 496 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/21/08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 495 Proposed Order re # 490 Notice (Other) [DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED] JUDGMENT AFTER BENCH TRIAL by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 494 Proposed Order re # 490 Notice (Other) [DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER AFTER BENCH TRIAL by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 493 Proposed Order PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AFTER BENCH TRIAL by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 492 Proposed Order PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED JUDGMENT RE INJUCTIVE RELIEF AFTER BENCH TRIAL by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 491 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Judgment After Bench Trial by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 490 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker, Wells Fargo Bank NA JOINT RECOMMENDATION AFTER COURTS FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL AND PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR HEARING (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO AMEND FINDINGS BASED UPON DISCOVERY OF THE NORWEST STUDY by Judge Alsup denying # 481 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 488 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA of Filing of Declaration Pursuant to Court's August 10, 2010 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law After Bench Trial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 487 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on various dates before Judge William H. Alsup, re # 478 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 11/8/2010. (Henn, Emily) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 486 Reply Memorandum of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in Support of # 481 Motion to Amend Findings of Fact Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(b) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 10/8/2010) Modified on 10/12/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2010 Filing 485 Memorandum in Opposition re # 481 MOTION to Amend/Correct Findings of Fact Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(b) filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl. of Charles Cowan)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO AMEND THE FINDINGS OF ACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 1, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 483 Declaration of P. Andrew Will in Support of # 481 MOTION to Amend/Correct Findings of Fact Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(b) filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) # 481 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 482 Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of # 481 MOTION to Amend/Correct Findings of Fact Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(b) filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) # 481 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 481 MOTION to Amend/Correct Findings of Fact Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(b) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 480 USCA Case Number 10-16959 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for # 478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 479 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re # 478 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 478 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to # 477 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Filing fee $ 455, receipt 34611050353. (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement, # 2 Certificate of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010) USCA No. 10-16959 Modified on 9/27/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2010 Exhibit Location - Shelf 109 - Three (3) Banker's Boxes containing manila folders with trial exhibits. Box 1 labeled: TX119 - TX206; Box 2: TX127; Box 3: TX526 - TX623. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 477 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 10, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010).
August 10, 2010 Filing 476 *** PDF FORMATTING CORRECTED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 477 *** FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 10, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010) Modified on 8/11/2010 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2010 Filing 475 RESPONSE to re # 474 Order RESPONSE OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. TO COURT'S AUGUST 5, 2010 ORDER by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER REGARDING "NOTICE" OF POTENTIAL JURISDICTIONAL DEFECT. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 473 Reply Memorandum Plaintiffs' Response to Wells Fargos Memorandum Regarding Release in Smith Case filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 472 RESPONSE to Wells Fargo's Reply to Plaintiffs' Memorandum Regarding Release in Smith Case by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 471 Response re # 465 Notice (Other) TO DEFENDANT WELLS FARGOS NOTICE OF POTENTIAL JURISDICTIONAL DEFECT byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 470 Declaration Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Roger Heller filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 469 RESPONSE to Court Request for Further Briefing by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 468 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Wells Fargo's Response to Court's July 20, 2010 Order Requesting Further Briefing on the Smith Release filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 467 Declaration of David M. Jolley In Support of Wells Fargo's Response to Court's July 20, 2010 Order Requesting Further Briefing on the Smith Release filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 466 RESPONSE to Wells Fargo's Response to the Court's July 20, 2010 Order Requesting Further Briefing on the Smith Release by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 465 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA of Potential Jurisdictional Defect (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 20, 2010 Filing 464 REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING RE VALIDITY OF RELEASE IN SMITH CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 20,, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 463 Minute Entry: Arguments heard. Court to prepare order.Bench Trial completed on 7/9/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 7/9/2010). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 462 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/09/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER GRANTING SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO USE A/V EQUIPMENT AT CLOSING ARGUMENT by Judge Alsup granting # 460 Motion for Use of A/V Equipment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 460 MOTION Supplemental Request to Use Audio-Visual Equipment at Closing Argument filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Supplemental Request to Use Audio-Visual Equipment at Closing Argument)(May, Margaret) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO USE A/V EQUIPMENT AT CLOSING ARGUMENT by Judge Alsup granting # 457 Motion for AV Use at Closing Argument (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 458 Proposed Order Granting Request to Use Audio-Visual Equipment at Closing Argument by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 457 MOTION REQUEST TO USE AUDIO-VISUAL EQUIPMENT AT CLOSING ARGUMENT filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER SETTING DATE FOR CLOSING ARGUMENTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 21, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 455 RESPONSE to re # 452 Proposed Findings of Fact Plaintiffs' Response To Defendant Wells Fargos Post-Trial Proposed Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 454 Response Defendant Wells Fargo's Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 19, 2010 Filing 453 Proposed Findings of Fact by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker and Conclusions of Law . (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 Filing 452 Proposed Findings of Fact by Wells Fargo Bank NA Defendant Wells Fargo's Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law . (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 Filing 451 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA Notice of Filing [Proposed] Order Granting Judgment for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on Partial Findings Under Fed.R.Civ.P.52(c) as to Plaintiffs' "Including and Deleting" Claims (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 450 TRIAL Exhibit List. (Attachments: # 1 Continued Exhibit List)(dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 449 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Illustrative Timeline by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 448 STIPULATION On Posting Order by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 447 Exhibit Location - UNDER SEAL Exhibit #224; Manila Envelope; Shelf 95. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PARTIAL FINDINGS by Judge Alsup denying # 417 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER RE TX 588. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/10/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 10, 2010 Filing 443 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Flagging of TX 126 and 127 by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schmitt, Bryanne) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 445 Minute Entry: Bench Trial completed on 5/7/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/7/2010). Witnesses: Alan Cox and C. James. Defendants REST. Findings of Fact due 5/19/10; responses due 5/25/10. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn; Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 442 Transcript of Proceedings FILED UNDER SEAL held on May 06, 2010, before Judge William Alsup. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 441 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/07/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn and Belle Ball, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 440 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 7, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 6, 2010 Filing 439 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/06/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn and Belle Ball, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 6, 2010 Filing 438 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/05/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn and Belle Ball, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 6, 2010 Filing 437 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 5/6/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/6/2010). Witnesses: K. Zimmerman; J. Ahrendt; D. Averch; M. Galindo (deposition); M. Lentz; and D. McGoveran. Further Bench Trial set for 5/7/2010 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn; Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2010)
May 6, 2010 Filing 436 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Wells Fargo's Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER REGARDING FORMAT OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 6, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 6, 2010 Filing 434 Brief Memorandum In Support Of Exclusion of Federal Register Excerpt (TX 588) filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 433 Brief Wells Fargo's Memorandum on the Admissibility of TX 588 filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 432 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' # 429 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Mark Lentz and Certain Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/5/2010) Modified on 5/6/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2010 Filing 431 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA Wells Fargo's Submission of Declaration of Daniel C. Lamb, Jr. Re Smith v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al. Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 430 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 5/5/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/5/2010). Witnesses: K. Moore and K. Zimmerman. Further Bench Trial set for 5/6/2010 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn; Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 429 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO (1) EXCLUDE TESTIMONY MARK LENTZ OFFERED IN SUPPORT OF WELLS FARGOS DAMAGES EXPERTS; AND (2) EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF WELLS FARGOS DAMAGES EXPERTS REGARDING CALCULATIONS MADE WITH OVERDRAFT TOLERANCE (SHADOWLINE) DATA REQUESTED BY BUT DENIED TO PLAINTIFFS filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 4, 2010 Filing 428 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/04/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn and Belle Ball, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 4, 2010 Filing 427 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 5/4/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/4/2010). Witnesses: E. Kadletz; S. Pinkerd (read in); D. Avrech; D. Chacon; and K. Moore. Further Bench Trial set for 5/5/2010 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn; Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2010)
May 4, 2010 Filing 426 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker OF LODGING (UNREDACTED) (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup denying # 419 Motion to Seal Document (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 424 DECLARATION of David M. Jolley Re Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 423 Response Wells Fargo's Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Lodging of Materials Re Wells Fargo's Redaction of Documents During Discovery; Supporting Declaration of David M. Jolley byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 422 Declaration of Bryanne J. Schmitt in Support of # 421 Response to Plaintiffs' Status Report Re Review and Flagging of Trial Exhibits 126 and 127 filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) # 421 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 421 Response to Plaintiffs' Status Report Re Review and Flagging of Trial Exhibits 126 and 127 byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 420 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker PROOF OF SERVICE (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 419 MOTION to Seal Document PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 79-5 REGARDING THE FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 418 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF LODGING OF MATERIALS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL'S REDACTION OF DOCUMENTS (REDACTED) (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 417 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Wells Fargo's Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 2, 2010 Filing 416 STATUS REPORT of Plaintiffs' Counsel Regarding Review and Flagging of Trial Exhibits 126 and 127 by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 415 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/30/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn and Belle Ball, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 414 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 4/30/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/30/2010). Plaintiffs REST. Witnesses called: L. Biller (by video tape); J. Gray; A. Olsen; Dr. I. Simonson; and E. Kadletz. Further Bench Trial set for 5/4/2010 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn; Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/30/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 413 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 4/29/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/29/2010). Witnesses: K. Moore; L. Mandell; E. Walker; B. Yost; Kari Lynn Tolstedt and Les Biller (by video taped deposition). Further Bench Trial set for 4/30/2010 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn; Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/29/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 412 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 4/28/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/28/2010). Witnesses called: V. Gutierrez; P. Erwin; L. Biller (by video); R. Raber-Luna; and K. Moore.Further Bench Trial set for 4/29/2010 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn; Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 411 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/28/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn and Belle Ball, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 27, 2010 Filing 410 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to Wells Fargo's # 403 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Marshall Schminke filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/27/2010) Modified on 4/28/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2010 Filing 409 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA Response to Court's Request for Additional Information Re Settlement in Smith v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab No. 1, # 2 Exhibit Tab No. 2, # 3 Exhibit Tab No. 3, # 4 Exhibit Tab No. 4, # 5 Exhibit Tab No. 5)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 Filing 408 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF LODGING OF MATERIALS REGARDING SMITH V. WELLS FARGO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Smith Settlement Order, # 2 Exhibit B Smith Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit C - Smith court docket, # 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs letter to counsel for Wells Fargo)(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 Filing 407 Transcript of Proceedings before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn and Belle Ball, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 Filing 406 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 4/27/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/27/2010). Witnesses K. Zimmerman and V. Gutierrez. Further Bench Trial set for 4/28/2010 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn; Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 405 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 4/26/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/26/2010). Bench Trial set for 4/27/2010 07:30 AM. Plaintiffs called witness K. Zimmerman.(Court Reporter Lydia Zinn; Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 404 Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of # 403 MOTION in Limine Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Marshall Schminke filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) # 403 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 403 MOTION in Limine Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Marshall Schminke filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Marshall Schminke)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 402 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/26/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn and Belle Ball, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 25, 2010 Filing 401 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition To Wells Fargo's # 400 Administrative Motion To Preclude Plaintiffs From Using Certain Evidence With Kenneth Zimmerman filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/25/2010) Modified on 4/26/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2010 Filing 400 MOTION Administrative Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs from Using Certain Evidence with Kenneth Zimmerman; Supporting Declaration of Margaret G. May filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/25/2010)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 399 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 23, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER ON PENDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS by Judge Alsup denying # 378 Motion ; denying # 384 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER SUMMARIZING RULINGS ON PRETRIAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Alsup denying # 358 Motion in Limine; denying # 360 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part # 362 Motion in Limine; denying # 365 Motion in Limine; denying # 352 Motion in Limine; denying # 356 Motion in Limine (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 396 Brief Plaintiffs' Memorandum Regarding Witness Communication filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 395 Brief Defendant's Brief Regarding Consultations By Counsel With Witnesses During Direct And Cross Examination filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 20, 2010 Filing 392 Statement of Supplemental Authority by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 20, 2010 Filing 391 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker re # 389 Order on Motion to Seal UNREDACTED SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF ARTHUR OLSEN (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 394 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 4/19/2010). Bench Trial set for 4/26/2010 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 393 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 394 *** Docket Entry: Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 4/19/2010). Each side shall have 16 hours for their case-in-chief. Bench Trial set for 4/26/2010 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/19/2010) Modified on 4/21/2010 (dt, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/22/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2010 Filing 390 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/19/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OLSEN REPORT UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup denying # 381 Motion to Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION TO USE A/V EQUIPMENT AT TRIAL by Judge Alsup granting # 387 Motion AV Equipment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 18, 2010 Filing 387 MOTION Application for Permission to Use Visual and Audio Presentation Equipment at Trial filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/18/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 386 Memorandum in Opposition re # 384 MOTION Administrative Relief Opposition of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Concerning Defendant's Authenticity Objections filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 385 DECLARATION of David M. Jolley Re Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Supplemental Olsen Report Under Seal filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 384 MOTION Administrative Relief filed by Veronica Gutierrez. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heller, Roger) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 383 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA Notice of Correction (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 382 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 381 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Regarding The Filing of Document Under Seal filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 380 Memorandum in Opposition re # 378 MOTION Wells Fargo's Administrative Motion and Supporting Declaration of David M. Jolley Concerning Plaintiffs' Untimely Submission of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 13, 2010 Filing 379 EXHIBIT E FILED UNDER SEAL to the Declaration of Roger Heller re # 363 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Related document(s) # 363 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 13, 2010 Filing 378 MOTION Wells Fargo's Administrative Motion and Supporting Declaration of David M. Jolley Concerning Plaintiffs' Untimely Submission of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Wells Fargo's Administrative Motion Concerning Plaintifs' Untimely Submission of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER GRANTING WELLS FARGO'S MOTION TO FILE EXHIBIT E UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting # 364 Motion File Exhibit E Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 13, 2010 Filing 376 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2010 09:00 AM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 13, 2010 Filing 375 Proposed Findings of Fact by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 13, 2010 Filing 374 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker of Plaintiffs' Objections to Wells Fargo's Trial Exhibits (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 373 TRIAL BRIEF of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 372 Proposed Findings of Fact by Wells Fargo Bank NA Defendant Wells Fargo's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law . (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 371 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA Wells Fargo's Notice of Filing Pretrial Objections to Trial Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 370 Proposed Pretrial Order , Jointly Filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, William Smith, Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 369 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA Wells Fargo's Notice of Filing Updated Rule (26)(a)(3) Pre-Trial Disclosures (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 368 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 367 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA Certificate of Service for Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine Nos. # 360 1, # 362 2 and # 365 3 (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/12/2010) Modified on 4/13/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2010 Filing 366 Memorandum in Opposition re # 365 MOTION in Limine Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Testimony of Untimely Disclosed and Improperly Designated Witnesses filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Roger Heller in Opposition to Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 3, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 365 MOTION in Limine Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Testimony of Untimely Disclosed and Improperly Designated Witnesses filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 3, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 3)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 364 MOTION Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Administrative Request and Supporting Declaration of David M. Jolley to File Under Seal Exhibit E to the Roger Heller Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 2 filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Administrative Request to File Under Seal Exhibit E to the Roger Heller Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 2)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 363 Memorandum in Opposition re # 362 MOTION in Limine Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Certain Exhibits and Other Evidence Relating to Other Bank Practices filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Roger Heller in Opposition to Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 2, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 362 MOTION in Limine Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Certain Exhibits and Other Evidence Relating to Other Bank Practices filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Bryanne J. Schmitt in Support of Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 2, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 2)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 361 Memorandum in Opposition re # 360 MOTION in Limine Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude the Testimony of Lewis Mandell and Certain Related Evidence filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Roger Heller in Opposition to Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 360 MOTION in Limine Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude the Testimony of Lewis Mandell and Certain Related Evidence filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Margaret G. May in Support of Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9A, # 11 Exhibit 9B, # 12 Exhibit 9C, # 13 Exhibit 9D, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Wells Fargo's Motion in Limine No. 1)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 359 Memorandum in Opposition re # 358 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Testimony of Christopher James and Paul Carrubba filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 358 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Testimony of Christopher James and Paul Carrubba filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard McCune in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 357 Memorandum in Opposition re # 356 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Any and All Reference to OCC or FDIC Regulations or Interpretive Letters filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Declaration of David Jolley in Support of Wells Fargo's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 356 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Any and All Reference to OCC or FDIC Regulations or Interpretive Letters filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard McCune in Support of Motion in Limine No. 2, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 355 Memorandum in Opposition re # 352 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Bank Industry Practice filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 354 Proposed Order re # 353 Declaration in Support, # 352 MOTION in Limine No. 1 [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Banking Practices of Other Banks and Evidence Regarding Purported Research by Norwest Bank Regarding Customer Preferences by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 353 Declaration of Richard McCune in Support of # 352 MOTION in Limine No. 1 filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Related document(s) # 352 ) (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 352 MOTION in Limine No. 1 filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 9, 2010 ***Past/Expired Deadlines terminated*** # 128 Transcript,, # 220 Transcript,, # 146 Transcript,, # 113 Case Management Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement,, # 249 Transcript,, # 263 Transcript. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 5, 2010 Filing 351 *** FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET # 340 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-24-10, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2010. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010) Modified on 4/13/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2010 Filing 350 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Supplemental Status Report In Response To The Court's April 2, 2010 Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Revised Damages Study by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' REVISED DAMAGES STUDY. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 2, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 348 Declaration of Declaration of David M. Jolley In Support of Response of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Plaintiffs' "Status Report" filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 347 RESPONSE to Response of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Plaintiffs' "Status Report" by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 31, 2010 Filing 346 STATUS REPORT REGARDING CONTINUING VIABILITY OF APRIL 26, 2010 TRIAL DATE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Alsup granting # 343 Motion for Clarification of Bench Trial Guidelines (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 31, 2010 Filing 344 Declaration of Emily Johnson Henn In Support of Administrative # 343 Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Concerning Limits Applicable to Pretrial Motions in Limine filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/31/2010) Modified on 4/1/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2010 Filing 343 MOTION Administrative Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Concerning Limits Applicable to Pretrial Motions in Limine filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 29, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated., Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial set for 4/26/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER REGARDING TRIAL DATES by Judge Alsup granting # 341 Motion for Clarification of Trial Dates (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 29, 2010 Filing 341 MOTION to Revise Pretrial Schedule and Supporting Declaration of David M. Jolley filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 26, 2010 Filing 340 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-24-10, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2010. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT'S EXPERTS by Judge Alsup denying # 303 Motion to Strike (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR CLASS DECERTIFICATION by Judge Alsup denying # 292 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot # 328 Motion to Bifurcate (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Alsup granting # 323 Motion for Leave to File; denying # 323 Motion for Reconsideration (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 26, 2010 Filing 336 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Response to Wells Fargo's Supplemental Memorandum on New Matters Presented at the March 24, 2010 Hearing by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 26, 2010 Filing 335 RESPONSE in Support re # 292 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Summary Judgment and/or to Decertify Class filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 334 Reply Memorandum Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum on Preemption and New Matters Presented at the March 24, 2010 Hearing filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 24, 2010 Filing 333 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/24/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 3/24/2010) re # 303 MOTION to Strike Expert's Testimony filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez - matter submitted on the briefs. # 292 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Summary Judgment and/or to Decertify Class filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA - HELD and taken under submission. Defendant's brief (3 to 5 pages) due by 5:00 p.m. tomorrow. Parties waive rights to a jury trial and will proceed by way of a bench trial on 4/26/10. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2010)
March 23, 2010 Filing 332 Response re # 324 Order byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 Filing 331 RESPONSE to re # 324 Order Defendant's Response to the Court's March 19, 2010, Order Concerning Trial Date by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 Filing 330 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Plaintiffs Opposition To # 323 Motion Of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. For Leave To File Motion For Reconsideration filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/23/2010) Modified on 3/24/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2010 Filing 329 Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of # 328 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 328 ) (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 328 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER REGARDING SEQUENCING ORDER #1. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 22, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 326 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2010 02:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 19, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 324 NOTICE RE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/19/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 323 MOTION for Leave to File, MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 322 Response re # 320 Objection, Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to Declaration of Mark Lentz byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 321 Declaration of Barry R. Himmelstein in Suppprt of # 319 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts and Plaintiffs' Objection to Evidence filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 3/12/2010) Modified on 3/15/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2010 Filing 320 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Filed By Wells Fargo in Opposition to Plaintiffs' # 303 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 3/12/2010) Modified on 3/15/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2010 Filing 319 Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' # 303 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 3/12/2010) Modified on 3/15/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2010 Filing 318 Declaration of Margaret May in Support of # 317 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A. for Summary Judgment and/or to Decertify Class filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) # 317 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 317 Reply Memorandum in Support of # 292 Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A. for Summary Judgment and/or to Decertify Class filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/11/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 316 Memorandum in Opposition re # 292 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Summary Judgment and/or to Decertify Class filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 315 DECLARATION of Mark Lentz In Opposition to Plaintiffs' # 303 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/5/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 314 DECLARATION of Alan J. Cox In Opposition to Plaintiffs' # 303 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/5/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 313 DECLARATION of David McGoveran In Opposition to Plaintiffs' # 303 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/5/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 312 DECLARATION of David M. Jolley In Opposition to Plaintiffs' # 303 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts filed by Wells Fargo & Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/5/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 311 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' # 303 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/5/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO TAKE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR by Judge Alsup denying # 304 Motion to Take Hearing Off Calendar (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL MCGOVERN EXHIBIT 6 by Judge Alsup granting # 296 Motion to Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 24, 2010 Filing 307 Memorandum in Opposition re # 304 MOTION Administrative Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Take the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts Off Calendar; Declaration of David M. Jolley filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 306 Declaration of Margaret G. May in Support of # 296 MOTION to Seal Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal Exhibit A to the First Declaration of Barry R. Himmelstein filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 296 ) (May, Margaret) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 305 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Take the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts Off Calendar by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 304 MOTION Administrative Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Take the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wells Fargo's Damages Experts Off Calendar; Declaration of David M. Jolley filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 303 MOTION to Strike Expert's Testimony filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 309 FILED UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT A- re # 301 Declaration in Support, filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Related document(s) # 301 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 302 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 301 Declaration of Barry R. Himmelstein Second Declaration of Barry R. Himmelstein ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 300 Declaration of Barry R. Himmelstein First Declaration of Barry R. Himmelstein in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 299 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 298 Proposed Order re # 296 MOTION to Seal Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 297 Declaration of Barry R. Himmelstein in Support of # 296 MOTION to Seal Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Related document(s) # 296 ) (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 296 MOTION to Seal Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 295 Declaration of David McGoveran in Support of # 292 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Summary Judgment and/or to Decertify Class filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A, # 2 Exhibit 1B)(Related document(s) # 292 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 294 Declaration of Alan J. Cox in Support of # 292 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Summary Judgment and/or to Decertify Class filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2A, # 3 Exhibit 2B, # 4 Exhibit 2C, # 5 Exhibit 2D, # 6 Exhibit 2E, # 7 Exhibit 2F)(Related document(s) # 292 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 293 Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of # 292 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Summary Judgment and/or to Decertify Class filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) # 292 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 292 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Summary Judgment and/or to Decertify Class filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
January 7, 2010 Filing 291 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (5/10/2010) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (4/26/2010). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/6/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
December 3, 2009 Filing 290 FILED UNDER SEAL - EXHIBIT A re # 285 Notice (Other) filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Claudia Sanchez, Erin Walker. (Related document(s) # 285 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 3, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 3, 2009 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN WRONG CASE*** Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/30/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 1/5/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009) Modified on 12/4/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL OLSEN REPORT by Judge Alsup granting # 286 Motion to Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 30, 2009 Filing 288 Declaration of Bryanne J. Schmitt # 286 in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Expert Report of Arthur Olsen filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 11/30/2009) Modified on 12/1/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2009 Filing 287 Declaration in Support of # 286 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Notice of Administrative Motion; Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Expert Report of Arthur Olsen Declaration of Barry Himmelstein in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Expert Report of Arthur Olsen filed byVeronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion)(Related document(s) # 286 ) (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 286 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Notice of Administrative Motion; Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Expert Report of Arthur Olsen filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 285 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance with October 6, 2009 Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Expert Report of Arthur Olsen)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case numbers C07-5923 WHA, C08-5739 WHA and C09-4700 EDL are related. The more recently filed case C09-4700 shall be reassigned to Judge Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/19/09. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER Denying Transfer. Signed by Acting Chairman of the MDL Panel, Robert L. Miller, Jr. on 10/07/09. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULE by Judge Alsup (re # 280 Motion to Modify Schedule). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 6, 2009 Filing 281 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 280 MOTION MODIFY SCHEDULE re # 278 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULE filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 18, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPOINT ADDITIONAL CLASS COUNSEL by Judge Alsup (re # 277 Motion to Appoint Counsel). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULE by Judge Alsup (re # 276 Motion to Modify Schedule). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 15, 2009 Filing 277 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO APPOINT ADDITIONAL CLASS COUNSEL filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF BARRY HIMMELSTEIN, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION, # 3 Proposed Order)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 14, 2009 Filing 276 Joint MOTION MODIFY SCHEDULE re # 261 Order JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULE filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY EMILY JOHNSON HENN by Judge Alsup [re # 274 Motion for Pro Hac Vice]. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
September 2, 2009 Filing 274 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Emily Johnson Henn (Filing fee $ 210.) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
August 25, 2009 Filing 273 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Emily Johnson Henn, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611035858.) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 18, 2009 Filing 272 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA re # 271 Notice (Other) Defendant Wells Fargo's Supplemental Information in Connection with the Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 11, 2009 Filing 271 REPLY BRIEF in Support of # 269 MOTION to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1)by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 8/11/2009) Modified on 8/12/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2009 Filing 270 Memorandum in Opposition to # 269 Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 8/3/2009) Modified on 8/5/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2009 Filing 269 MOTION to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order filed by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
June 8, 2009 Filing 268 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 267 ASSOCIATION of Counsel on behalf of Plaintiffs, and all others similarly situated by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 SECOND ORDER RE ELECTRONIC DATA SECURITY. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 2, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting # 264 Plaintiffs' Administrative Request. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
June 1, 2009 Filing 264 MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Request for a Court Order Approving the Unopposed Second Order Re Electronic Data Security filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
May 27, 2009 Filing 263 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-13-09, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 20, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Exhibit List due by 11/6/2009. Motions due by 12/11/2009. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/21/2009. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2010 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2010 02:00 PM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER ACCEPTING JOINT PROPOSED AMENDED SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 20, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 20, 2009 Filing 260 STIPULATION Joint Statement on Proposed Amended Schedule by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 13, 2009 Filing 262 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/13/2009 before William Alsup Plt shall have time to do a revised study. (Date Filed: 5/13/2009). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/13/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER VACATING PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 13, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 13, 2009 Filing 258 NOTICE RE REQUEST FOR SUMMARY OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 13, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 12, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2009 02:15 PM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 257 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Brief in Response to the Court's Order of May 6, 2009 re Alternative Methods for Proceeding by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 256 Declaration of Margaret G. May in Support of # 255 Response in Support of Defendant Wells Fargo's Memorandum in Response to the Court's Order on Motion Seeking Class Decertification filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) # 255 ) (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 255 RESPONSE in Support Memorandum of Wells Fargo Bank In Response to the Court's Order on Motion Seeking Class Decertification filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re (253 in 3:07-cv-05923-WHA) Stipulation filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/12/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 253 STIPULATION Joint Request for Case Management Conference by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 252 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 5/12/2009 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case settled. Agreement reached in principle. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER APPROVING JOINT DISSEMINATION PLAN FOR THE NOTICE OF DECERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 12, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 11, 2009 Filing 250 Brief Joint Dissemination Plan for the Notice of Decertification of the "Including and Deleting" Class filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1")(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 249 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/30/2009, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2009. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 5/12/2009 at 09:30 AM. Updated confidential settlement conference statements to be lodged with Judge Spero's chambers by Noon on Friday, 5/8/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 5/5/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER RE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part (176) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-05923-WHA]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part (199) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-05923-WHA]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER ON MOTION CHALLENGING DAMAGE STUDY AND SEEKING CLASS DECERTIFICATION by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part (200) Motion in case 3:07-cv-05923-WHA]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 4, 2009 Filing 244 NOTICE OF PENDING DECISIONS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/4/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 243 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/30/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/30/2009) re # 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, # 200 MOTION Decertify Classes filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting # 209 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting # 229 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 233 Appendix re # 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action, Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action, Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], Appendix of Select Authority Cited in Motion for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) # 199 ) (May, Margaret) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 232 NOTICE RE APRIL 30 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 23, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 231 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA for Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Margaret G. May [Confidential Version Submitted Under Seal] (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 230 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Request to File Portions of Documents Under Seal by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 229 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Documents and Supporting Declaration of Bryanne J. Schmitt filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 228 OBJECTIONS to # 214 Declaration of Art Olsen by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/16/2009) Modified on 4/17/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2009 Filing 227 Declaration of David M. Jolley, Supplemental, in Support of # 225 Reply to Response to Motion filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) # 225 ) (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 226 Declaration of Margaret G. May in Support of # 225 Reply to Response to Motion, # 224 Reply to Response to Motion filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7 (Public Redacted Version))(Related document(s) # 225 , # 224 ) (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 225 REPLY to Response to Motion # 200 to Decertify Classes filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/16/2009) Modified on 4/17/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2009 Filing 224 REPLY to Response to Motion # 199 for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 4/16/2009) Modified on 4/17/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2009 Filing 223 Declaration of Bryanne J. Schmitt # 209 In Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Request To File Documents and Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/14/2009) Modified on 4/15/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2009 Filing 220 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/19/2009, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting # 216 Motion for Leave to File. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting # 215 Motion to Seal Document ; granting # 215 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 222 FILED UNDER SEAL- Memorandum in Opposition re # 200 MOTION Decertify Classes , Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 221 FILED UNDER SEAL- EXHIBITS 2(portions), 4(portions), 7,8,9,10,12, 23(portions), 24,26 and 27 re # 213 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Related document(s) # 213 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 217 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 4/9/9 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 216 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Wells Fargo's Motion to Decertify Classes filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Richard D. McCune, # 2 Proposed Order)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 9, 2009 Filing 215 MOTION to Seal Document # 213 Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,, MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard D. McCune, # 2 Proposed Order)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 9, 2009 Filing 214 Memorandum in Opposition # 200 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Wells Fargo's Motion to Decertify Classes filed by # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Art Olsen, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 4/9/2009) Modified on 4/10/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2009 Filing 213 Memorandum in Opposition # 199 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment to All Causes of Action filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Veronica Gutierrez, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37, # 40 Exhibit 38, # 41 Exhibit 39, # 42 Exhibit 40, # 43 Exhibit 41, # 44 Exhibit 42, # 45 Exhibit 43, # 46 Exhibit 44, # 47 Exhibit 45, # 48 Exhibit 46, # 49 Exhibit 47, # 50 Exhibit 48, # 51 Exhibit 49)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 4/9/2009) Modified on 4/10/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action, Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action, Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], , # 200 MOTION Decertify Classes , Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], , # 201 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Marshall Schminke, Notice of Motion, ., Set/Reset Hearings: Responses due by 4/9/2009. Replies due by 4/16/2009. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2009 08:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2009 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2009 02:00 PM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE AND RESPONSE DATE by Judge Alsup granting # 211 Motion to Continue (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 30, 2009 Filing 211 MOTION to Continue For 14-Days the Hearing and Response Dates to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Motion to Decertify Classes and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Marshall Schminke filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Motion to Continue Hearing and Response Dates, # 2 Proposed Order)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 242 FILED UNDER SEAL- EXHIBIT A re # 206 Declaration in Support, filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 206 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 241 FILED UNDER SEAL- EXHIBIT 1 re # 205 Declaration in Support, filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 205 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 240 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Todd Menenberg in Support of 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 236 MOTION to Certify Class filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) 237 , 236 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 239 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Christopher M. James in Support of 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 236 MOTION to Certify Class filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) 237 , 236 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 238 FILED UNDER SEAL - EXHIBITS 4,5, 25, 27-29 re # 227 Declaration in Support, filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 227 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 237 FILED UNDER SEAL- NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 236 FILED UNDER SEAL - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Decertify Class filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 210 Proposed Order re # 209 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Documents; Supporting Declaration of Bryanne J. Schmitt, by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 209 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Documents; Supporting Declaration of Bryanne J. Schmitt, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 208 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE # 199 # 200 # 202 # 203 # 204 # 205 # 206 by Wells Fargo Bank NA of Confidential Version of Documents Submitted Under Seal (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009) Modified on 3/20/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2009 Filing 207 Declaration of John Ahrendt in Support of # 200 MOTION Decertify Classes , Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], Second Declaration of John Ahrendt, filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 200 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 206 Declaration of Itamar Simonson, Ph.D. in Support of # 200 MOTION Decertify Classes , Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A [Public Redacted Version])(Related document(s) # 200 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 205 Declaration of Steven T. Visser in Support of # 200 MOTION Decertify Classes , Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 [Public Redacted Version])(Related document(s) # 200 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 204 Declaration of Todd Menenberg in Support of # 201 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Marshall Schminke, Notice of Motion, , # 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action, Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action, Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], , # 200 MOTION Decertify Classes , Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 [Public Redacted Version])(Related document(s) # 201 , # 199 , # 200 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 203 Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of # 201 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Marshall Schminke, Notice of Motion, , # 200 MOTION Decertify Classes , Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], , # 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action, Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action, Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 [Public Redacted Version], # 5 Exhibit 5 [Public Redacted Version], # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25 [Public Redacted Version], # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27 [Public Redacted Version], # 28 Exhibit 28 [Public Redacted Version], # 29 Exhibit 29 [Public Redacted Version], # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32)(Related document(s) # 201 , # 200 , # 199 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 202 Declaration of Christopher M. James in Support of # 201 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Marshall Schminke, Notice of Motion, , # 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action, Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action, Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], , # 200 MOTION Decertify Classes , Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 201 , # 199 , # 200 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 201 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Marshall Schminke, Notice of Motion, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 200 MOTION Decertify Classes , Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Causes of Action, Notice of Motion [Public Redacted Version], filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 198 Memorandum in Opposition REVISED REDACTED VERSION [Pursuant to Court Order] of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit REVISED REDACTED VERSION of Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Opposition, # 2 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED VERSION - Exhibit 1 to McCune Declaration, # 3 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED VERSION - Exhibit 26 to McCune Declaration, # 4 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED VERSION - Exhibit 2 to Mandell Declaration)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 197 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/19/2009 before William H. Alsup (Date Filed: 3/19/2009) re # 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Matter taken under submission. (Court Reporter Lydai Zinn.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting # 192 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting # 182 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 18, 2009 Filing 194 NOTICE RE MARCH 19 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 18, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 193 Proposed Order re # 192 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Docket No. 186-6) by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 192 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Docket No. 186-6) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 191 EXHIBITS E to Declaration of Bryanne J. Schmitt In Support of Reply of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. In Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [186-6] filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 6, 2009 Filing 190 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing Time. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXCHANGE OF EXPERT REPORTS ON DAMAGES. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 6, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 5, 2009 Filing 188 Proposed Order # 176 Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/5/2009) Modified on 3/6/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2009 Filing 187 OBJECTIONS to # 179 Declaration of Lewis Mandell In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/5/2009) Modified on 3/6/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2009 Filing 186 Declaration of Bryanne J. Schmitt # 185 In Support of Reply of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. In Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, *** # 5 Exhibit E FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 191 . *** , # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/5/2009) Modified on 3/6/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/16/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/17/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2009 Filing 185 REPLY to # 179 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/5/2009) Modified on 3/6/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2009 Filing 184 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re Exchange of Expert Reports on Damages by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 3, 2009 Filing 183 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Administrative Request and Supporting Declaration of Margaret G. May to File Under Seal Portions of (1) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (2) Exhibits to the Supporting Declaration of Richard McCune, and (3) Exhibit Two to the Supporting Declaration of Lewis Mandell by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 3, 2009 Filing 182 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of (1) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (2) Exhibits to the Supporting Declaration of Richard McCune, and (3) Exhibit Two to the Supporting Declaration of Lewis Mandell; Declaration of Margaret G. May in Support Thereof filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 26, 2009 Filing 181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith re # 179 Memorandum in Opposition,, Re: Service of Documents Under Seal (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 26, 2009 Filing 180 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Def's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Declaration of Richard McCune; Exhs 1,4,7,8,9,26(portions), 42 and Exh 2 to Mandell Decl filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Administrative Request to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Def's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Declaration of Richard McCune; Exhs 1,4,7,8,9,26(portions), 42 and Exh 2 to Mandell Decl, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Request to File Under Seal)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 26, 2009 Filing 179 Memorandum in Opposition re # 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims [Redacted Version] filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit [Redacted] Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Opposition, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Lewis Mandell in Support of Opposition, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-24 in Support of Opposition [includes notice of submission of Exhibits 1,4,7,8,9 under seal], # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 25-49 in Support of Opposition [includes notice of submission of Exhibits 26 (portion) and 42 under seal])(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 19, 2009 Filing 178 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing Time. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 12, 2009 Filing 177 Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of # 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) # 176 ) (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/12/2009) Modified on 2/13/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/13/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2009 Filing 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER IN RESPONSE TO PARTIES' FEBRUARY 2, 2009 JOINT LETTER BRIEF REGARDING DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORIES by Judge Maria-Elena James granting # 172 Motion to Compel (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
February 9, 2009 Filing 174 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 2/9/2009 before HON. MARIA-ELENA JAMES (Date Filed: 2/9/2009). () (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2009)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATION RE EXPERT DISCOVERY AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 3, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 2, 2009 Filing 172 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 Filing 171 STIPULATION Re Expert Discovery and [Proposed] Order by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER DENYING "MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION" RE REFERRAL # 166 re # 164 # 163 ;Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/29/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-15, the motion is hereby referred to the Honorable Marilyn Hall Patel re # 166 Order Signed by Executive Committee on 1/28/09. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009) Modified on 1/29/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/28/09. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 167 DISREGARD CLERICAL ERROR ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. William H. Alsup no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/27/09. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009) Modified on 1/28/2009 (mab, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' LETTER RE DISQUALIFICATION AND REFERRAL FOR RANDOM RE-ASSIGNMENT TO ANOTHER JUDGE FOR DECISION. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 27, 2009. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Letter, # 2 Appendix Letter, # 3 Appendix Letter)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 165 Letter from Wells Fargo Responding to Letter from Richard McCune. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 164 Letter from Richard McCune in Response to Letter from Sonya D. Winner Re Disclosure of Potential Issue Under 28 U.S.C. S. 455. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 163 Letter from Sonya D. Winner Re Disclosure of Potential Issue Under 28 U.S.C. S. 455. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James denying without prejudice # 158 Motion to Compel (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 161 NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/20/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 16, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 160 NOTICE RE WELLS FARGO AND THE UNDERSIGNED. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/15/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/15/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 14, 2009 Filing 158 MOTION to Compel filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Jolley, David) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting # 156 Motion to Relate Case. Case C08-5739 JCS is related and shall be reassigned to Judge Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 2, 2009 Filing 156 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Donna McMillian, Terry Dagenhart, Kristy Dagenhart. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 1/2/2009)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting # 141 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting # 151 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 16, 2008 Filing 152 Proposed Order re # 151 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Administrative Request and Supporting Declaration of Margaret G. May to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Without Redactions by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 16, 2008 Filing 151 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Administrative Request and Supporting Declaration of Margaret G. May to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Without Redactions filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 16, 2008 Filing 150 NOTICE by Wachovia Corporation Of Disassociation Of Counsel For E-Filing Purposes (McGuire, James) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 16, 2008 Filing 149 Reply to # 145 Opposition to Motion to Compel filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 12/16/2008) Modified on 12/17/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 16, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER RE ELECTRONIC DATA SECURITY. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 16, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 15, 2008 Filing 146 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 10, 2008, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, e-mail belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, Telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2009. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 Filing 145 Memorandum in Opposition # 140 to Motion to Compel filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 12/15/2008) Modified on 12/16/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2008 Filing 143 Proposed Order Re Electronic Data Security by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 10, 2008 Filing 155 FILED UNDER SEAL- PLAINTIFFS' MOTION to Compel Production of Documents without Redaction Under Seal filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008) Modified on 8/4/2009 (mejlc1, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2008 Filing 144 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 12/10/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/10/2008). Plt shall go to Wells Fargo to review the electronic data. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2008 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/10/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 142 Brief re # 136 Memorandum in Opposition, Plaintiffs Submission of Select Portions of Wells Fargo Employee Depositions Referenced in Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Related document(s) # 136 ) (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 141 MOTION for Leave to File UNDER SEAL Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents without Redaction and Exhibits 1 and 2 of the Motion filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support, # 2 Proposed Order To File Under Seal)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 140 MOTION to Compel [REDACTED] Production of Documents without Redactions filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Unredacted Documents)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 12/9/2008) Modified on 8/4/2009 (mejlc1, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2008 Filing 139 Reply to Opposition # 136 to Motion for Protective Order filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 12/9/2008) Modified on 12/10/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE RE HEARING ISSUE [re # 137 Order]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/9/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 8, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 12/10/2008 02:00 PM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING [re # 135 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/8/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 136 Memorandum in Opposition re # 135 MOTION for Protective Order and Plaintiffs [Proposed] Order for Production of Customer Information filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order For Production of Customer Information)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 135 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting # 131 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 133 RESPONSE to re # 131 MOTION Clarification ON THE LANGUAGE OF THE CLASS NOTICE; and REQUEST FOR RESOLUTION ON SHORTENED TIME by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 132 Proposed Order re # 131 MOTION Clarification ON THE LANGUAGE OF THE CLASS NOTICE; and REQUEST FOR RESOLUTION ON SHORTENED TIME by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 131 MOTION Clarification ON THE LANGUAGE OF THE CLASS NOTICE; and REQUEST FOR RESOLUTION ON SHORTENED TIME filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CHANGE THE OPT OUT DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 20, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2008: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ls, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER the Court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur # 118 Motion to Relate Case. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 128 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 29, 2008, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2009. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 127 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Change the Opt Out Deadline in the Class Notice from March 5, 2009 to February 5, 2009 by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 126 Reply to Opposition re # 118 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 16, 2008 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wachovia Corporation re # 124 Memorandum in Opposition, (McGuire, James) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 Filing 124 Memorandum in Opposition re # 118 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed byWachovia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McGuire, James) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 123 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE TIME TO RESPOND TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 13, 2008 Filing 122 STIPULATION re # 118 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE TIME TO RESPOND TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFFS by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 10/13/2008)
October 13, 2008 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank NA re # 120 Response ( Non Motion ) (May, Margaret) (Filed on 10/13/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 120 RESPONSE to # 118 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 10/10/2008) Modified on 10/14/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2008 Filing 119 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing Time. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2008 02:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 118 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER APPROVING JOINT DISSEMINATION PLAN. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 2, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Notice of Settlement conference And Settlement Conference Order Settlement Conference set for 4/9/2009 09:30 AM. Confidential Settlement conference Statement to be LODGED with Chambers by 4/2/2009.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/1/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 114 Brief Joint Dissemination Plan for the Notice of Pendency of Class Action filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 29, 2008 Filing 117 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/29/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 9/29/2008). Jury Trial set for 5/11/2009 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2009 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Mediation/Settlement. Discovery due by 1/23/2009. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2009 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 2/19/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/29/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 112 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Veronica Gutierrez, William Smith, Erin Walker. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 9/25/2008) Modified on 9/26/2008 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2008 Filing 111 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of David M Jolley in Support of # 105 Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Clarification of Class Definitions filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/24/2008) Modified on 9/26/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2008 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion # 105 Reply In Support of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Clarification of Class Definitions filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/24/2008) Modified on 9/26/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2008 Filing 109 Declaration of RICHARD D. McCUNE in Support of # 108 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.'s Motion for Clarification of Class Definitions filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Related document(s) # 108 ) (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 108 Memorandum in Opposition re # 105 MOTION to Certify Class Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Clarification of Class Definitions filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 23, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 106 Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Clarification of Class Definitions filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 105 MOTION to Certify Class Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Clarification of Class Definitions filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 104 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 17, 2008 Filing 103 Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference. Hearing 1/8/2009 @ 9:30 a.m. Updated confidential settlement conference statements due by 12/30/2008. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 17, 2008 Filing 102 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference Held. After some discussions a settlement is NOT reached. Further Settlement Conference set for 1/8/2009 09:30 AM. (Court Reporter/FTR None.)(Date Filed: 9/17/2008). (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/17/2008)
September 16, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2008 02:00 PM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 16, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2008: # 1 Certificate of Service) (rbe, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2008 Filing 100 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Administrative Request to Continue Case Management Conference by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 99 MOTION to Continue / Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Administrative Request to Continue Case Management Conference; Supporting Declaration of David M. Jolley filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 11, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2008 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2008. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Alsup denying # 38 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Certify Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 95 Letter from Richard D. McCune in Response to Letter Brief of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank . (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 97 AMENDED Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/21/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 8/21/2008) re # 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, 56 MOTION to Certify Class filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 96 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/21/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 8/21/2008) re # 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, 56 MOTION to Certify Class filed by William Smith, Erin Walker, Veronica Gutierrez. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 94 Letter Brief re # 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion, & Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 38 ) (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Alsup granting # 87 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting # 76 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting # 84 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 13, 2008 Filing 88 Proposed Order # 87 Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Administrative Request to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 8/13/2008) Modified on 8/14/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2008 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Administrative Request and Supporting Declaration of David M. Jolley to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 92 FILED UNDER SEAL- Reply to Opposition re 56 MOTION to Certify Class filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 86 EXHIBIT 19 re # 80 Declaration in Support,, filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Related document(s) # 80 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT # 79 # 80 of Personal Service of Submitted Under Seal: Plaintiffs' Reply to Def Opp to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support; Exhibits by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 8/7/2008) Modified on 8/8/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2008 Filing 84 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply to Def Opp to Motion for Class Cert and Exhibits 24, 27, 28, 29 filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Plaintiffs' Adminstrative Request to File Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply to Def Opp to Motion for Class Cert, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Adminstrative Request to File Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply to Def Opp to Motion for Class Cert)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 83 RESPONSE to re # 67 Objection of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A. to Declaration of Lewis Mandell by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 82 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith re # 80 Declaration in Support,, MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION of EXHIBITS 24, 27, 28 and 29 to Decl Richard McCune in Support of Reply to Def Opp to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Cert (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 81 NOTICE by Veronica Gutierrez, Claudia Sanchez, Erin Walker re # 80 Declaration in Support,, MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION of EXHIBIT 19 to Decl Richard McCune in Support of Reply to Def Opp to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Cert (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 80 Declaration of RICHARD D. McCUNE in Support of # 79 Reply to Opposition of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 19, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 20, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 21, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 22, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 23, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 24-Submitted Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 25, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 26, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 27-Submitted Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 28-Submitted Under Seal, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 29-Submitted Under Seal, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 30, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 31, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 32)(Related document(s) # 79 ) (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 79 Reply to # 57 Opposition re 56 MOTION to Certify Class Public Version-Redacted filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 8/7/2008) Modified on 8/8/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2008 Filing 78 Reply Memorandum # 38 in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 8/7/2008) Modified on 8/8/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2008 Filing 77 Proposed Order # 76 Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Administrative Request to File Under Seal Portions of (1) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) Exhibits to the Supporting Declaration of Richard McCune by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 8/6/2008) Modified on 8/7/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2008 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of (1) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) Exhibits to the Supporting Declaration of Richard McCune; Declaration of Margaret G. May in Support filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 74 ERRATA re # 63 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., for Summary Judgment by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. *** ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 4, 2008. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008) Modified on 8/4/2008 (whalc2, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF DECLARATION OF MARK LENTZ by Judge Alsup granting # 62 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 75 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Mark Lentz in Support of # 57 Memorandum in Opposition filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 57 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 91 FILED UNDER SEAL- Memorandum in Opposition re # 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion, & Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT re # 63 Memorandum in Opposition Affidavit of Personal Service by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Richard D. McCune in Support of # 63 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh 1 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 2 Exhibit Exh 2 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 3 Exhibit Exh 3 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 4 Exhibit Exh 4 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 5 Exhibit Exh 5 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 6 Exhibit Exh 6 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 7 Exhibit Exh 7 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 8 Exhibit Exh 8 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 9 Exhibit Exh 9 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 10 Exhibit Exh 10 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 11 Exhibit Exh 11 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 12 Exhibit Exh 12 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 13 Supplement Notice of Manual Filing)(Related document(s) # 63 ) (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Modified on 8/1/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2008 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Erin Walker in Support of # 63 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Related document(s) # 63 ) (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Modified on 8/1/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2008 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Veronica Gutierrez in Support of # 63 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Related document(s) # 63 ) (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Modified on 8/1/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2008 Filing 67 OBJECTIONS to Declaration of Lewis Mandell by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 66 DECLARATION of William Smith in Opposition to # 63 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Related document(s) # 63 ) (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Unredacted Declaration of Mark Lentz by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 64 Proposed Order # 62 Granting Administrative Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Declaration of Mark Lentz by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Modified on 8/1/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2008 Filing 63 Memorandum in Opposition re # 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion, & Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File [Unredacted] Declaration of Mark Lentz in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; Declaration of Margaret G. May in Support thereof filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 61 MOTION to Seal and Administrative Request to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Administrative Request)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING - DECLARATION of Mark Lentz [Unredacted] in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Modified on 8/1/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2008 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Mark Lentz [Redacted], in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Margaret G. May in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 Filing 57 Memorandum in Opposition 56 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Modified on 8/1/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting # 52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell M. Breit. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND EXHIBITS TO SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF RICHARD MCCUNE by Judge Alsup granting # 50 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE PORTIONS OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting # 35 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Mitchell M. Breit, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611021517.) filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 16, 2008 Filing 51 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Administrative Request to File Under Seal Portions of (1) Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and (2) Exhibits to the Supporting Declaration of Richard McCune by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
July 16, 2008 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Administrative Request and Supporting Declaration of David M. Jolley to File Under Seal Portions of (1) Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and (2) Exhibits to the Supporting Declaration of Richard McCune filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING # 43 DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNREDACTED DECLARATION OF KENNETH A. ZIMMERMAN UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 14, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2008) Modified on 7/15/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2008 Filing 49 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Kenneth A. Zimmerman in Support of # 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion, & Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Related document(s) # 38 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 11, 2008 Filing 47 Proposed Order [Amended] Granting Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Declaration of Kenneth A. Zimmerman Under Seal by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO & COMPANY. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 11, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 56 FILED UNDER SEAL- MOTION to Certify Class; Declaration of Richard D. McCune; Exhibits filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2008 08:00 AM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Unredacted Declaration of Kenneth A. Zimmerman by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 44 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Declaration of Kenneth A. Zimmerman Under Seal by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Declaration of Kenneth A. Zimmerman Under Seal; Supplemental Declaration of Kenneth A. Zimmerman in Support Thereof, filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 42 Declaration of Kenneth A. Zimmerman [Unredacted] in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 41 Declaration of Kenneth A. Zimmerman [Public Redacted Version] in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 40 Declaration of John Ahrendt in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 39 Declaration of David M. Jolley in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byWells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion, & Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 37 Request for Judicial Notice re 36 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED VERSION filed byVeronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1 to RJN, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2 to RJN, # 3 Exhibit Exh. 3 to RJN)(Related document(s) 36 ) (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 35 MOTION to Seal and Administrative Request to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion filed by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Administrative Request)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 8, 2008 Filing 34 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Dismiss Defendant Wells Fargo & Company by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REMOVE PLAINTIFF TIM FOX AS CLASS REPRESENTATIVE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 30, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2008)
June 24, 2008 Filing 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Remove Plaintiff Tim Fox as Putative Class Representative by Veronica Gutierrez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
May 13, 2008 Filing 31 Answer to Amended Complaint Answer of Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo & Co. to Plaintiffs' [Adjusted] First Amended Class Action Complaint byWells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
April 24, 2008 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. Filed byClaudia Sanchez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 4/24/2008)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting # 19 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 17, 2008 Filing 28 Reply to Opposition re # 19 MOTION for Leave to File A First Amended Complaint filed byClaudia Sanchez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Reply, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Reply, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support of Reply)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 4/17/2008)
April 14, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 9/17/2008 09:30 AM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting # 21 , Stipulation filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, et al. The Settlement Conference previously set for 4/23/2008 is continued until 9/17/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/14/2008. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 10, 2008 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Margaret G. May # 25 Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint filed byWells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to May Declaration)(May, Margaret) (Filed on 4/10/2008) Modified on 4/11/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2008 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition # 19 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint filed byWells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 4/10/2008) Modified on 4/11/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITION. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 8, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 23 STIPULATION Amended Stipulated Protective Order by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 22 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 21 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order To Amend Date of Settlement Conference by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 3, 2008 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 02/27/08 before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter: Katherine Powell. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
March 20, 2008 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File A First Amended Complaint filed by Claudia Sanchez, Erin Walker, William Smith. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard D. McCune in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Richard D. McCune, # 3 Proposed Order For Motion For Leave To File First Amended Complaint)(McCune, Richard) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. A Settlement Conference is set for 4/23/2008, at 9:30 a.m. Settlement Conference Statements shall be LODGED with Chambers no later than 4/9/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/3/2008. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
February 29, 2008 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (May, Margaret) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 Filing 16 Answer of Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo & Co. to Complaint ANSWER to Complaint byWells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (May, Margaret) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 29, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
February 27, 2008 Filing 15 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/27/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 2/27/2008), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2009 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2009 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Kathy Powell.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2008)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER LIFTING STAY, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Mediation/Settlement. Motion for class certification due 7/10/2008. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2009 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Discovery due by 10/17/2008. Motions due by 11/20/2008. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/27/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2008)
February 25, 2008 Filing 13 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re # 11 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/7/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 20, 2008 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2008 09:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2008. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Martin J. Jenkins no longer assigned to case. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting # 7 Stipulation filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 2/15/2008. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 8 Declaration of RICHARD D. McCUNE in Support of # 7 Stipulation To Set Case on Active Status filed byClaudia Sanchez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Richard McCune)(Related document(s) # 7 ) (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 7 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order To Set Case on Active Status by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Jolley, David) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
January 8, 2008 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Claudia Sanchez, Erin Walker, William Smith. Wells Fargo Bank NA served on 12/11/2007, answer due 12/31/2007. Answer Due Date stayed per Court's Order filed 12/28/2007 (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
January 8, 2008 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Claudia Sanchez, Erin Walker, William Smith. Wells Fargo & Company served on 12/11/2007, answer due 12/31/2007. Answer due date stayed per Court's Order filed 12/28/2007. (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
December 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE pending final entry of order re GIC 802664 Smith v Wells Fargo Bank; CMC of 3/4/2008 vacated; Signed by Judge Martin J Jenkins on 12/21/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2007)
December 21, 2007 Filing 3 STIPULATION and [proposed] Order to Stay Case by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Claudia Sanchez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
November 21, 2007 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2008. Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2008 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 MJJ Standing Order; # 2 MJJ Standing Order (re Sealed)#; (3) Case Management Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 21, 2007 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; summons issued against Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank NA (Filing fee $ 350; receipt number 34611012761). Filed by Claudia Sanchez, Erin Walker, William Smith. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2007) (sv, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Gutierrez
Represented By: Mikaela Bernstein
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Roger Norton Heller
Represented By: Barry R. Himmelstein
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Adam Kent Shea
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Adam Kent Shea,
Represented By: Brian Joseph Panish
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Smith
Represented By: Mikaela Bernstein
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Barry R. Himmelstein
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Walker
Represented By: Mikaela Bernstein
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Roger Norton Heller
Represented By: Barry R. Himmelstein
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Adam Kent Shea
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Adam Kent Shea,
Represented By: Brian Joseph Panish
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sanchez
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Emily Johnson Henn
Represented By: David M. Jolley
Represented By: Margaret G. May
Represented By: Bryanne Jeanette Schmitt
Represented By: Philip Andrew Scarborough
Represented By: Sonya Diane Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: David M. Jolley
Represented By: Margaret G. May
Represented By: Sonya Diane Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Donna McMillian
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wachovia Corporation
Represented By: James R. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kristy Dagenhart
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Terry Dagenhart
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Gilardi & Co. LLC
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?