Network Appliance Inc. v. Sun Microsystems Inc
Plaintiff: Network Appliance Inc.
Defendant: Sun Microsystems Inc
Counter-defendant: Network Appliance Inc.
Counter-claimant: Sun Microsystems Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv06053
Filed: November 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER re 691 Stipulation filed by Network Appliance Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/15/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER GRANTING IN PART & DENYING IN PART REQUESTS TO SEAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFS AND RELATED DOCUMENTS Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/10/2010. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/22/2010 Denying re 638 Administrative Request to File Under Seal Documents Relating To Sun's Reply to Opposition to Notice of Renewed Motion for Partial State of the Case Pending Reexamination of NetApp's United States Patent No. 5,819,292 [Document Unsealed]. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re 628 Motion for Partial Stay Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 5,819,292; Granting in part & Denying in part re 637 Motion to Seal. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER UN-SEALING COURT'S NOVEMBER 17, 2009 SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDERS. Signed by Judge Laporte on 11/30/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER GRANTING Withdrawal of Aaron M. Nathan as Counsel for NetApp Inc. re 613 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/24/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER REGARDING REQUESTS TO SEAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFS AND RELATED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Laporte on 11/16/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER re 591 Letter filed by Network Appliance Inc., Sun Microsystems Inc. Signed by Judge Laporte on 11/12/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL of David J. Healey ass counsel for Network Appliance re 564 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/18/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 517 STIPULATED ADDENDUM TO FIRST AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 501 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/31/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 491 STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING NetApp to File a Second Amended Reply re 475 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/18/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 432 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motion Re U.S. Patent No. 5,459,857 re 415 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/31/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 394 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING Briefing Schedule for Motions to Amend Infringement and/or Invalidity Contentions re 393 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/15/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER Re Sun's Application to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Laporte on 6/18/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 355 STIPULATED ADDENDUM To First Amended Protective Order re 334 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/15/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 295 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING Deadline for File Motions to Compel re 293 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/5/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER re 194 Joint Report re: Claim Construction filed by Network Appliance Inc., Sun Microsystems Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 03/02/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Granting re 210 Stipulation Allowing Sun To Amend Its Infringement Contentions For U.S. Patent No. 6,873,630 filed by Sun Microsystems Inc. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D.Laporte on 2/26/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER re 200 Stipulation filed by Network Appliance Inc., Sun Microsystems Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/18/2008. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 146 Motion to Stay (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER re 177 October 10, 2008 Joint Letter Brief filed by Network Appliance Inc., Sun Microsystems Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/22/2008. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting Sun's Request for Extension of Time to Respond to NetApp's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/7/08. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER re 167 MOTION for Leave to File A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT RE U.S. PATENT NO. 7,200,715 filed by Network Appliance Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/6/08. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 166 FURTHER ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/29/08. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS; setting case management conference for October 3, 2008. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/10/08. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER STRIKING DOCKET NO. 149. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/9/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINE for Patents Not Selected for Claim Construction re 139 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/5/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Network Appliance Inc. v. Sun Microsystems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Network Appliance Inc.
Represented By: Claude Edward Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Microsystems Inc
Represented By: Yakov M. Zolotorev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Network Appliance Inc.
Represented By: Claude Edward Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Sun Microsystems Inc
Represented By: Yakov M. Zolotorev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?