Hoye v. City of Oakland
Plaintiff: Walter B. Hoye, II
Defendant: City of Oakland
Case Number: 3:2007cv06411
Filed: December 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 223 Motion for Attorney Fees. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER re 219 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 212 MOTION Entry of Judgment , 213 MOTION for Attorney Fees to Continue Hearing Dates filed by Walter B. Hoye, II, Reset Deadlines as to 213 MOTION for At torney Fees. Amended Motion due by 6/20/2012.Responses due by 7/13/2012. Replies due by 7/27/2012. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/18/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 210 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER RE TRAINING MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 163 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER regarding extension of time to file bill of costs re 158 Stipulation, filed by City of Oakland. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/19/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 JUDGMENT in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/4/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009) Modified on 8/5/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 146 Motion re submission of case. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER allowing filing of second amended complaint re 71 Stipulation, filed by Walter B. Hoye, II. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/7/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER regarding case schedule re 69 Stipulation filed by City of Oakland Motions due by 5/1/2009. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/26/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER to continue motion proceedings re 66 Stipulation filed by Walter B. Hoye, II, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 66 Stipulation. Motions due by 3/6/2009.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/06/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoye v. City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter B. Hoye, II
Represented By: Catherine Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?