Securities and Exchange Commission v. Olins et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Robert Olins, Spatialight, Inc and Argyle Capital Management Corp
Case Number: 3:2007cv06423
Filed: December 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES OF TAX ADMINISTRATOR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 10, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES OF TAX ADMINISTRATOR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING SEC'S MOTION AND VACATING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The evidentiary hearing set for January 30 and 31, 2017, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF DECEMBER 12 AND 13, 2016 EVIDENTIARY HEARING. The hearing is continued to January 30 and 31, 2017. The parties will submit individual trial briefs on or before January 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 JOINT STIPULATION RE: JULY 22, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER. The July 22, 2016 status conference shall be continued to September 2, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. The parties will submit a joint statement on or before August 26, 2016. The September 2, 2016 status conference shall be a telephonic conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 JOINT STIPULATION RE APRIL 8, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER. Good cause appearing and per the parties' stipulation, the April 8, 2016 status conference shall be continued to July 15, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. The parties will submit a joint statement on or before, July 8, 2016, advising the Court of the status of the criminal case in the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES OF TAX ADMINISTRATOR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 JOINT STIPULATION RE FEBRUARY 12, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER. Per the parties' stipulation, the February 12, 2016, status conference is continued to April 8, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 JOINT STIPULATION RE DECEMBER 18, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER. The December 18, 2015, status conference is continued to February 12, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. The parties will submit a joint statement on or before February 5, 2016, advising the Court of the status of the criminal case in the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2015. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court hereby continues the hearing on the SEC's motion to September 21, 2015, and schedules a Case Management Conference for September 4, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 27, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER REGARDING AMENDED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. The Court hereby directs plaintiff to file its response to defendant's motion no later than August 27, 2015, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 26, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES OF TAX ADMINISTRATOR Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 16, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER ON STIPULATION RE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE The evidentiary hearing, currently set for March 23 and 24, 2015, is vacated and continued until July 6 and 7, 2015. Mr. Olins must be present. The parties shall file a joint prehearing statement no later than June 22, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 3, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant Robert Olins shall appear on March 23, 2015, at 9:00 a.m., and show cause why he should not be held in civil contempt. The parties shall file, no later than March 9, 2015, a Joint Prehearing Statement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 26, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES OF TAX ADMINISTRATOR. The Clerk of Court shall issue a check on CRIS account number 07-cv-6423 under the case name designation "SEC v. Robert Olins, et al.," for the amount of $1,959.05 payable to "Damasco & Associates," for the payment of fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 25, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY PAST DUE TAXES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER APPOINTING TAX ADMINISTRATOR. Damasco & Associates LLP is appointed as Tax Administrator and is designated as administrator of the Distribution Fund.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 7, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MONETARY REMEDIES. Correcting clerical error on page 10 of the order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/25/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MONETARY REMEDIES. Granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER VACATING JANUARY 21, 2011 HEARING ON SECS MOTIONS FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MONETARY REMEDIES. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the motion, the Court deems the matter suitable for decision thereon, and vacates the hearing scheduled for January 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/19/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER. The SEC's motion returnable December 3, 2010 is hereby adjourned to the motion date of January 21, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. The applicable time period for opposition and response submissions is likewise adjourned for the relevant period. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/10/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE. Defendants' request to continue the hearing on the SEC's motion for injunctive relief to December 3, 2010 is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON REMEDIAL RELIEF. The parties' stipulation to continue the August 27, 2010 hearing on plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief and monetary remedies to October 1, 2010 is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 INJUNCTIVE AND MONETARY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT OLINS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 AMENDED ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 12, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING 118 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR ORDER PERMITTING INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL; VACATING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 92 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 107 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 2, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 30, 2009 HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CONTINUING OCTOBER 30, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 13, 2009 AT 10:00 A.M. Counsel for all parties shall appear by telephone for the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 28, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS ROBERT OLINS AND ARGYLE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT CORP. TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 5, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. The hearing on plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is continued to October 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER [AS MODIFIED] re 82 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/11/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration 73 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion to Quash 65 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/12/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT SPATIALIGHT, INC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 30, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DEFERRING RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM; CONTINUING HEARING. The SEC may file, no later than January 30, 2009, a supplemental memorandum in support of it s motion, which memorandum shall not exceed five pages in length, independent of any declarations and/or exhibits. The hearing is continued to February 20, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF; ADVANCING DATE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference presently set for June 5, 2009 is advanced to February 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 14, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Christopher W. Kinum is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Olins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Olins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spatialight, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argyle Capital Management Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?