October 10, 2019 |
Filing
256
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES OF TAX ADMINISTRATOR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 10, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
|
March 13, 2017 |
Filing
251
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES OF TAX ADMINISTRATOR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
|
January 24, 2017 |
Filing
249
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING SEC'S MOTION AND VACATING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The evidentiary hearing set for January 30 and 31, 2017, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
|
November 28, 2016 |
Filing
247
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF DECEMBER 12 AND 13, 2016 EVIDENTIARY HEARING. The hearing is continued to January 30 and 31, 2017. The parties will submit individual trial briefs on or before January 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
|
July 19, 2016 |
Filing
243
JOINT STIPULATION RE: JULY 22, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER. The July 22, 2016 status conference shall be continued to September 2, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. The parties will submit a joint statement on or before August 26, 2016. The September 2, 2016 status conference shall be a telephonic conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
|
March 31, 2016 |
Filing
240
JOINT STIPULATION RE APRIL 8, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER. Good cause appearing and per the parties' stipulation, the April 8, 2016 status conference shall be continued to July 15, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. The parties will submit a joint statement on or before, July 8, 2016, advising the Court of the status of the criminal case in the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
|
March 14, 2016 |
Filing
238
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES OF TAX ADMINISTRATOR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
|
February 4, 2016 |
Filing
236
JOINT STIPULATION RE FEBRUARY 12, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER. Per the parties' stipulation, the February 12, 2016, status conference is continued to April 8, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
|
December 10, 2015 |
Filing
234
JOINT STIPULATION RE DECEMBER 18, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER. The December 18, 2015, status conference is continued to February 12, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. The parties will submit a joint statement on or before February 5, 2016, advising the Court of the status of the criminal case in the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2015. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
|
August 27, 2015 |
Filing
225
ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court hereby continues the hearing on the SEC's motion to September 21, 2015, and schedules a Case Management Conference for September 4, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 27, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
222
ORDER REGARDING AMENDED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. The Court hereby directs plaintiff to file its response to defendant's motion no later than August 27, 2015, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 26, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
|
March 16, 2015 |
Filing
214
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES OF TAX ADMINISTRATOR Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 16, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
|
March 3, 2015 |
Filing
211
ORDER ON STIPULATION RE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE The evidentiary hearing, currently set for March 23 and 24, 2015, is vacated and continued until July 6 and 7, 2015. Mr. Olins must be present. The parties shall file a joint prehearing statement no later than June 22, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 3, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing
208
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant Robert Olins shall appear on March 23, 2015, at 9:00 a.m., and show cause why he should not be held in civil contempt. The parties shall file, no later than March 9, 2015, a Joint Prehearing Statement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 26, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
|
July 7, 2014 |
Filing
189
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
184
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY FEES AND EXPENSES OF TAX ADMINISTRATOR. The Clerk of Court shall issue a check on CRIS account number 07-cv-6423 under the case name designation "SEC v. Robert Olins, et al.," for the amount of $1,959.05 payable to "Damasco & Associates," for the payment of fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 25, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
|
October 23, 2012 |
Filing
175
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO PAY PAST DUE TAXES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
|
September 7, 2012 |
Filing
169
ORDER APPOINTING TAX ADMINISTRATOR. Damasco & Associates LLP is appointed as Tax Administrator and is designated as administrator of the Distribution Fund.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 7, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing
160
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MONETARY REMEDIES. Correcting clerical error on page 10 of the order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/25/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing
159
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MONETARY REMEDIES. Granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
|
January 19, 2011 |
Filing
156
ORDER VACATING JANUARY 21, 2011 HEARING ON SECS MOTIONS FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND MONETARY REMEDIES. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the motion, the Court deems the matter suitable for decision thereon, and vacates the hearing scheduled for January 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/19/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
|
November 10, 2010 |
Filing
151
ORDER. The SEC's motion returnable December 3, 2010 is hereby adjourned to the motion date of January 21, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. The applicable time period for opposition and response submissions is likewise adjourned for the relevant period. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/10/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
|
September 2, 2010 |
Filing
149
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE. Defendants' request to continue the hearing on the SEC's motion for injunctive relief to December 3, 2010 is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing
147
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON REMEDIAL RELIEF. The parties' stipulation to continue the August 27, 2010 hearing on plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief and monetary remedies to October 1, 2010 is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
|
June 10, 2010 |
Filing
136
INJUNCTIVE AND MONETARY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT OLINS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
|
March 12, 2010 |
Filing
134
AMENDED ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 12, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing
124
ORDER GRANTING 118 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR ORDER PERMITTING INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL; VACATING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
|
November 2, 2009 |
Filing
117
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 92 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 107 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 2, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
|
October 28, 2009 |
Filing
116
ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 30, 2009 HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CONTINUING OCTOBER 30, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 13, 2009 AT 10:00 A.M. Counsel for all parties shall appear by telephone for the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 28, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
|
October 5, 2009 |
Filing
109
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS ROBERT OLINS AND ARGYLE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT CORP. TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 5, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
|
September 10, 2009 |
Filing
100
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. The hearing on plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is continued to October 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing
98
ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
|
May 11, 2009 |
Filing
88
ORDER [AS MODIFIED] re 82 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/11/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
|
April 14, 2009 |
Filing
81
ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration 73 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
|
April 1, 2009 |
Filing
71
ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion to Quash 65 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
|
February 13, 2009 |
Filing
64
NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/12/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
|
February 5, 2009 |
Filing
59
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
|
January 30, 2009 |
Filing
56
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT SPATIALIGHT, INC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 30, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing
54
ORDER DEFERRING RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM; CONTINUING HEARING. The SEC may file, no later than January 30, 2009, a supplemental memorandum in support of it s motion, which memorandum shall not exceed five pages in length, independent of any declarations and/or exhibits. The hearing is continued to February 20, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing
48
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF; ADVANCING DATE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference presently set for June 5, 2009 is advanced to February 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 14, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
|
October 22, 2008 |
Filing
46
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Christopher W. Kinum is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
|