United States of America v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: F. Anthony Edwards and Sharon de Edwards
Case Number: 3:2007cv06447
Filed: December 21, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RELATED CASE ORDER. C 14-2852 VC Edwards v. IRS is not related to C 07-6447 MMC United States v. Edwards. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 23, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2011. The Court orders that the case management conference scheduled for September 30, 2011 is vacated. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference re-set for 8/29/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/6/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to stipulation, the parties may reschedule the settlement conference to August 29, 2011. It is further ordered that the Case Management Conference scheduled for August 12, 2011 is continued to September 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/2/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE: RE-NOTICE OF HEARING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to defendants' unopposed motion, the case management conference is continued to March 25, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/8/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE: APPLICATION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for February 18, 2011 is continued to March 11, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/15/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Pursuant to the stipulation of parties, Count III of the Amended Complaint, seeking foreclosure of the federal tax liens, is dismissed, and Defendants Contra Costa County Tax Collector, California Service Bureau, Inc., Atkinson-B aker, Inc, Mullin Law Firm, Sternberg & Coad-Hermelin, LLP, Just Water Heaters, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans, California State Franchise Tax Board, Barry R. Thompson, Sun-Brite Professional Service, Inc., Javier Sanchez and Community Fund LLC, are dismissed as parties to this action. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/22/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REOPENING CASE; GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT; VACATING HEARING; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Plaintiff's motion to amend its complaint is granted and plaintiff is directed to file its Amended Complaint no later than August 18, 2010; the hearing scheduled for August 20, 2010 is vacated. A status conference is scheduled for September 17, 2010, and the parties shall file a joint status conference statement no later than September 10, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Anthony Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon de Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?