Rodden v. Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Lois Rodden
Defendant: Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company and Sanyo Semiconductor Corporation Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2007cv06489
Filed: December 27, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Jefferson Pilot. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/15/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
December 30, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 26 , 34 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
November 19, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting extension to file reply. Signed by Judge Illston on 11/18/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
October 21, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adjusting litigation schedule. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/20/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
September 4, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 . Signed by Judge Illston on 9/3/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (ga, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodden v. Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Rodden
Represented By: Lisa Sue Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Semiconductor Corporation Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?