Williams v. Potter
Plaintiff: Katherine Williams
Defendant: John E. Potter
Case Number: 3:2008cv00026
Filed: January 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE OF LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/6/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Upon review, the Court does not find good cause to vacate Plaintiff's settlement, as the Ninth Circuit has affirmed the district court's order denying Plaintiff's motion for relief from the settlement. Further, the Court finds that Plaintiff's contentions that she has been taken advantage of by court officials are unfounded. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
October 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 64 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Case removed from arbitration Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/24/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR PLAINTIFF'S DISPUTES ON SEPTEMBER 19, 2008, AT 2:00 P.M. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/9/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?