Walker v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey E. Walker
Defendant: John Jones and DOE Jane
Case Number: 3:2008cv00757
Filed: January 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Telephone Conference set for 4/3/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/27/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER of DISMISSAL, CMC vacated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/13/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 203 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER and Joint Request for Relief from Order Setting Case Management Conference filed by Jeffrey E. Walker. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 1/17/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/5/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER graning 198 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Asucion Bendebel, Cabebe, Jones. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2013. Further Case Management Conference reset for 5/3/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/19/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case Not Settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/18/12. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/31/2012. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 AMENDED ORDER continuing CMC re 187 Order, Further Case Management Conference reset for 9/28/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/6/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 06/08/2012. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER vacating writ issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. 177 (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER re 178 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND JOINT REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Asucion Bendebel, et al. Further Case Management Conference reset for 8/10/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Mediation Hearing set for 7/12/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/29/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/10/12. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER re 169 Writ Issued for attendance of plaintiff at settlement conference. Writ vacated. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/25/2012. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER continuing CMC re 163 Stipulation filed by Asucion Bendebel, Cabebe, Jones Further Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/13/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER setting CMC re 160 Stipulation filed by Jeffrey E. Walker Further Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/1/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 AMENDED WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Issued to Reflect Plaintiff's Transfer from California Men's Colony to CSP-SAC. Signed by Judge Vadas on November 16, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Jane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?