Quezada et al v. Responsible Roofing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federico Quezada, Antonio Quezada, Porfirio Zamora, Mario Nieves, Felipe Quezada, Ciriaco Salina and Jose Garcia
Defendant: Responsible Roofing, Inc., Paul Marvin Elmore, Jr., David Landeros and Eduardo Pena
Mediator: Suzanne Nusbaum
Case Number: 3:2008cv00821
Filed: January 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Re Violation of Court Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/16/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 151 Stipulation filed by Felipe Quezada, Porfirio Zamora, Federico Quezada, Antonio Quezada, Ciriaco Salina. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/2/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER ASSESSING JURY COSTS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/15/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Overruling Plaintiffs' Objections to Court's Proposed Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/7/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER RE REFRESHMENTS FOR JURY. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Directing Defendants to File Response (re 135 ). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file Sur-Reply (re 126 and 127 ). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/31/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE TRIAL DATE re 128 Stipulation filed by David Landeros, Paul Marvin Elmore, Jr., Eduardo Pena. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE AND ORDER Regarding Proposed Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Court's Proposed Jury Instructions)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/6/2010. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/2010. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY CUT OFF re 82 Stipulation filed by Jose Garcia. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/3/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/19/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting request for plaintiffs to attend the mediation telephonically. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/15/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010) Modified on 4/16/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 Amended Complaint, filed by Antonio Quezada. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/13/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting (50) Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:08-cv-00821-EMC; Granting (44) Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:08-cv-04905-EMC. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re 60 Stipulation of Substitution of Counsel filed by David Landeros, Paul Marvin Elmore, Jr.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 43 Defense Counsel's Motion to Withdraw; Staying Proceedings; and Vacating Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/10/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER setting case management conference. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/31/09. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT OF THESE TWO RELATED CASES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 20, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 31 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re c-08-4905 CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/9/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 23 That These Two Related Cases Be Transferred to the San Francisco/Oakland Division of this Court. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/3/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to Show Cause Why Related Cases Should Not Be Transferred to the San Francisco/Oakland Division. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 2/9/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quezada et al v. Responsible Roofing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federico Quezada
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Quezada
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porfirio Zamora
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Nieves
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Quezada
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciriaco Salina
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Garcia
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Responsible Roofing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Marvin Elmore, Jr.
Represented By: Edward Hung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Landeros
Represented By: Edward Hung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Suzanne Nusbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?