Ross v. Independent Living Resource of Contra Costa County

Plaintiff: Derrick Ross
Defendant: Independent Living Resource of Contra Costa County
Case Number: 3:2008cv00854
Filed: February 8, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/9/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
September 30, 2010 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER delaying briefing schedule for proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/30/10. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
August 31, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court Jury Instructions (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 23, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER re Jury Trial 134 138 137 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/23/10. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 18, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: jury trial. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/18/10. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010) Modified on 8/18/2010 (tehlc2, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2010 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing defendants to bring materials to the courtroom for trial. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/17/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
July 21, 2010 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Granting in Part and Denying in Part 85 Motion for Summary Judgment. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 15, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Hearing on 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Independent Living Resource of Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/15/10. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
June 18, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 101 Objection to Reply Brief filed by Derrick Ross; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/12/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2010. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 6/18/10.(tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
April 1, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Granting in Part and Denying in Part 74 Motion to Dismiss (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
December 14, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DATES FOR TRIAL. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
November 2, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Trial Rules and Procedures(tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
April 29, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 31 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/27/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
March 10, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER rescheduling the Case Management Conference to 5/11/2009 at 01:30 PM and extending the mediation deadline to 04/17/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/10/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
October 10, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 10/20/08 is continued to 12/15/2008 01:30 PM. ADR Deadline continued to 2/2/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/9/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Independent Living Resource of Contra Costa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Ross
Represented By: Harvey Sohnen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Living Resource of Contra Costa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?