E&E Co., Ltd. v. Kam Hing Enterprises, Inc et al
Plaintiff: E&E Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Kam Hing Enterprises, Inc, Sunham Home Fashions, LLC, JJ International Trading Company, Howard Yung and Arthur Courbanou
Case Number: 3:2008cv00871
Filed: February 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 3, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference re-set for 8/2/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/12/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/21/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/18/2011. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER VACATING MAY 29, 2009 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 26, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to June 19, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 3, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Any Fourth Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than March 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to April 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 2, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Any Third Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than December 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 19, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to February 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 14, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E&E Co., Ltd. v. Kam Hing Enterprises, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E&E Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Charles Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kam Hing Enterprises, Inc
Represented By: Garth Tyler Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunham Home Fashions, LLC
Represented By: Garth Tyler Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJ International Trading Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Yung
Represented By: Garth Tyler Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Courbanou
Represented By: Garth Tyler Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?