Jones et al v. Foresight Management Services LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Jones and Melecio Arciosa
Defendant: Foresight Management Services LLC. and Jeremy Grimes
Case Number: 3:2008cv00938
Filed: February 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL re 64 Proposed Order filed by Foresight Management Services LLC. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/21/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING re 55 Stipulation filed by Ronnie Jones, Melecio Arciosa. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/27/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RESCHEDULING FOR JULY 29, 2009 re 39 Stipulation filed by Ronnie Jones, Melecio Arciosa. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/18/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 37 Stipulation filed by Foresight Management Services LLC., Jeremy Grimes. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/17/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING SEVENTH CLAUSE OF ACTION re 35 Stipulation filed by Foresight Management Services LLC. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/2/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 32 Stipulation filed by Foresight Management Services LLC. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/27/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 27 Stipulation filed by Foresight Management Services LLC. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/9/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 22 Stipulation filed by Foresight Management Services LLC., Jeremy Grimes. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/29/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Foresight Management Services LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Jones
Represented By: David Sohn Zelenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melecio Arciosa
Represented By: David Sohn Zelenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foresight Management Services LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?