Advanced Micro Devices Inc. et al v. Samsung Electronics Co Ltd et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Advanced Micro Devices Inc. and ATI Technologies ULC
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Telecommunications America LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv00986
Filed: February 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER DENYING AMD'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,559,990 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER granting leave to bring equipment re 733 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010) Modified on 10/25/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER dismissing certain claims (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER WITHDRAWING MOTION #435 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER withdrawing motion #569 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 705 ORDER withdrawing Motion #455 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ORDER allowing equipment (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER re: scheduling (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER adjusting briefing on '893 patent (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER continuing motion #455 to 7/23/10 @ 9:00 a.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER RE: OBJECTION TO CERTAIN EVIDENCE OFFERED BY AMD(Docket No. 471) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER ALLOWING EQUIPMENT (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 473 SEALING ORDER re 463 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 462 sealing ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 453 sealing order (#444) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER adjusting briefing schedule (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER re: exemplar products (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER re: exemplar products (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER re: answers and counterclaims. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/6/10. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER GRANTING SAMSUNG'S REQUEST TO ALLOW DEPOSITION OF WILLIAM TRIGGS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER extending deadline (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER re: Memory Chips (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER RE: SAMSUNG'S MOTION TO ALLOW DEPOSITION OF WILLIAM TRIGGS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 389 STIPULATION AND ORDER reagarding certain facts related to VLSI Technology and NXP Semiconductors. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 03/22/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER DENYING AMD'S MOTION TO COMPEL LICENSE AGREEMENTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER RE: SALE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER RE: TO PATENT 5,623,434 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER sealing documents ( see 02/23/2010 337 STIPULATION ) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting leave to seal Defts. Exhibit A Re: Inequitable Conduct (#328) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 SEALING ORDER (#311) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER allowing equipment re 307 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 302 SEALING ORDER (Manning's office shall submit a chambers copy of it's 2/4/10 letter.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 SEALING ORDER re 290 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER re: exemplar products (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 286 SEALING Order re 279 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER re: exemplar Products (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 SEALING ORDER ; Plaintiff shall provide the original documents in sealed form and a working chambers copy. This court has not received any document that this order applies to. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Order Regarding The Production of Documents that Contain Confidential Information of TSMC Entities by Samsung Electronics Co Ltd(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (tf, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER substituting Samsung Digital Imaging (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER re: filing of the 1st amended complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER continuing trial schedule. See order for changes (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER re: discovery (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER allowing equipment (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER GRANTING SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWERS AND COUNTERCLAIMS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER allowing equipment. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/23/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 SEALING ORDER (#192) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 186 Ex Parte Application to seal (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 sealing order. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/9/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER /second addendum to joint stipulated protective order. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/1/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER GRANTING SAMSUNG'S MOTION TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS 104 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009) Modified on 4/2/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 SEALING ORDER re 147 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting request to file materials under seal. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/17/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 123 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER RE: AMD'S RECENT DISCOVERY REQUESTS (Docket Nos. 103 and 114). Samsung must produce discovery documents within 21 days of the issuance of this order. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting pro hac. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/4/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER re: page lengths. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/23/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 96 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER setting 4/7/09 tutorial and 4/8/09 markman hrg.. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re 88 . Signed by Judge Illston on 12/15/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re: Addendum to protective order (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611025422.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611025422.) filed by Advanced Micro Devices Inc., ATI Technologies ULC. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/13/08. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re: Discovery Protocol. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/14/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re: exemplar products re 80 . Signed by Judge Illston on 10/9/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Micro Devices Inc. et al v. Samsung Electronics Co Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Micro Devices Inc.
Represented By: David P. Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATI Technologies ULC
Represented By: David P. Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Austin Semiconductor LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telecommunications America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?