Toll Brothers, Inc v. Lin et al
Plaintiff: Toll Brothers, Inc
Defendant: Chang Su-o Lin, Hong Lien Lin and Hong Yao Lin
Case Number: 3:2008cv00987
Filed: February 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 287 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ON REMAND. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 05/23/2012. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/13/2012. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/19/2011. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 236 Motion for Attorney Fees (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 227 Motion to Amend/Correct (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/30/2009. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 STIPULATION AND ORDER To Admit Certain Exhibits. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/27/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Granting 187 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/23/2009. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER allowing equipment into the courtroom for trial. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 DISCOVERY ORDER re 94 Letter filed by Chang Su-o Lin. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/3/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude or Limit Expert Testimony of Charles Hansen (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 COURT TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/12/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 66 Motion for Summary Judgment (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER Withdrawl of Jury Demand. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/5/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009) Modified on 2/5/2009 (tdm, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER The discovery cut-off date for the taking of depositions is extended to 2/3/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/2/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 JURY TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/14/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Status Conference Order Re Exchange of Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/19/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER Discovery due by 1/23/2009. Expert Witness List due by 12/15/2008. Expert Witness Reports 12/23/08. Rebuttal Expert Witnesses and their Reports 1/9/09 Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/14/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/3/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Re 33 Stipulation Vacating Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toll Brothers, Inc v. Lin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toll Brothers, Inc
Represented By: Carl Lee McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chang Su-o Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Lien Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Yao Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?