Northern California Watch v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: Northern California Watch
Defendant: West Coast Metals Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv01256
Filed: November 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DISMISSING CROSS-CLAIM AND CROSS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 22, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CONSENT DECREE AND ORDER. The proposed consent decree between plaintiff and defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company is approved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 13, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/3/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER RE: ADDITIONAL PARTIES. The deadline to add additional parties is held in abeyance and will be reset, if necessary, at the case management conference scheduled for July 17, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 2, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/18/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR CASE STATUS CONFERENCE. A case management conference shall take place on May 22, 2009. The deadline to amend the pleadings is extended to May 29, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 24, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/14/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/7/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE: ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS. The deadline to amend the pleading is continued to May 1, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 26, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE: ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS. The deadline to amend the pleadings is extended from January 2, 2009 to February 28, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 19, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT WEST COAST METALS, INC.'S ANSWER TO CODEFENDANT'S CROSS-ACTION. WCM's Answer to Codefendant Union Pacific Railroad's Cross-Action is stricken, without prejudice to WCM's refiling said document and timely providing a chambers copy thereof. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT WEST COAST METALS, INC. TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 15, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME TO ANSWER AND FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued from September 26, 2008 to October 17, 2008. A Joint Case Manag ement Statement shall be filed no later than October 10, 2008. The deadline for defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to October 6, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 19, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern California Watch v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Watch
Represented By: Joseph Jerry Bernhaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Metals Inc
Represented By: Karin Patricia Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?