Lapiner v. Camtek, Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Yuval Lapiner
Defendant: Camtek, Ltd, Rafi Amit and Ronit Dulberg
Case Number: 3:2008cv01327
Filed: March 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Camtek, Ltd, Moshe Amit, Rafi Amit, Ronit Dulberg, Yotam Stern against Yuval Lapiner, Defendants motion to dismiss is hereby GRANTED, and the above-titled action is hereby DISMISSED. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER RE: STIPULATION ON: (A) THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; AND (B) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff shall filed his third amended complaint no later than April 1, 2011; defendants shall respond no later than May 16, 2011. The case management conference is continued to September 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/9/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having ruled on the defendants' motion to dismiss, and provided plaintiff leave to amend, the case management conference is continued from March 11 to May 13, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/3/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Granting 70 Motion to Dismiss; denying 89 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed no later than March 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for January 14, 2011 is continued until March 11, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/8/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for November 5, 2010 shall be continued until January 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/8/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties' stipulation to continue the case management conference from September 10, 2010 to November 5, 2010 is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 12, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from July 9, 2010 to September 10, 2010. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than September 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 4, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Continuing CMC currently scheduled for May 14, 2010 to July 9, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 21, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Re: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 28, 2010. Moving CMC to May 14, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 13, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the motion, the Court deems the matters suitable for decision thereon, and vacates the hearing scheduled for November 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for November 13, 2009 shall be continued until January 8, 2010. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than December 31, 2009. In light of the continuance ordered herein, the date for filing the ADR Certification, with Stipulation and Notice, is extended from October 23, 2009 to December 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 3, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The hearing on defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint, currently scheduled for October 30, 2009, shall be rescheduled for November 13, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. Opposition papers shall be filed no later than October 16, 2009 and reply papers no later than October 23, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 13, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Defendants shall file their motion by August 17, 2009. Plaintiff shall file his opposition by September 17, 2009. Defendants shall file their reply by October 16, 2009. The motion shall be heard on October 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff shall file any second consolidated amended class action complaint by no later than July 10, 2009. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond thereto by no later than August 14, 2009. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for July 10, 2009 is continued to November 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 1, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 23, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's opposition brief shall be filed on April 10, 2009. Defendants' reply brief shall be filed on May 11, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. Defendants shall have 30 pages for their motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the CAC no later than February 17, 2009, and the schedule set by the Court in its January 5, 2009 order shall otherwise remain the same. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE RESPONSE TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to any amended consolidated complaint no later than February 16, 2009. If defendants' response to the amended consolidated complaint is a motion to dismiss, plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss no later than April 2, 2009. If such motion to dismiss is filed, defendants' reply in support of the motion to dismiss shall be filed no later than May 4, 2009, and the hearing thereon shall be on June 5, 2009. The Case Management Conference is continued to July 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 5, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SELECTION AS LEAD COUNSEL. Plaintiff shall file his Consolidated Amended Complaint no later than January 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP and The Law Office of Jacob Sabo are ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than November 7, 2008, as to why the Court should not reconsider its order filed October 6, 2008 and/or sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 27, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS LEAD COUNSEL; NOTICE TO LEAD PLAINTIFF RE: NEED TO OBTAIN NEW COUNSEL; GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. The motion is granted on condition that counsel file a statement no later than October 17, 2008 and that counsel continue to receive documents filed in the instant action and to forward such documents to plaintiff. Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint, if any, no later than October 17, 2008. If plaintiff does not move for approval of his choice of Lead Counsel by October 31, 2008, the Court will strike the class action allegations in the Complaint and the action will thereafter proceed as an individual action. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 24 MOTION PERMITTING DOCUMENT TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lapiner v. Camtek, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuval Lapiner
Represented By: Jacob Sabo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camtek, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafi Amit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronit Dulberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?