Hawthorne v. Ayers et al
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Hawthorne
Defendant: R. Ayers, Jr., A. Cota, R. W. Fox, J. Pickett, D. Lee, T. Holt, S. Robinson and R. Cruz
Case Number: 3:2008cv01473
Filed: March 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES re 103 Notice (Other) filed by S. Robinson, A. Cota, J. Pickett, D. Lee, R. Cruz, T. Holt, R. W. Fox. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 10, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT re 99 Notice (Other) filed by Carlos A. Hawthorne, II. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 9, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (5/21/2012) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (5/14/2012). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/14/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup denying 85 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS re 94 Stipulation, filed by S. Robinson, A. Cota, J. Pickett, D. Lee, R. Cruz, T. Holt, R. W. Fox. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 11, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS re 91 Stipulation filed by S. Robinson, A. Cota, J. Pickett, D. Lee, R. Cruz, T. Holt, R. W. Fox. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 14, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re 82 Stipulation filed by Carlos A. Hawthorne, II (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER LIFTING STAY, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins for Mediation/Settlement. Discovery due by 2/29/2012. Jury Trial set for 5/21/2012 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco be fore Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 4/5/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/11/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 WRIT of ad testificandum issued for presence of Carlos Anthony Hawthorne at settlement conference at San Quentin State Prison on February 24, 2011, at 9:00 a.m.Signed by Judge Vadas on 2/22/11. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER resetting date and place of settlement conference to 2/24/11 at 9:00 a.m. at San Quentin State Prison. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/4/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawthorne v. Ayers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Ayers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Cota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?