Pagtakhan et al v. Burlingame Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Marlon E. Pagtakhan, Joanna E. Pagtakhan, Sara Marie French and Puri E. Pagtakhan
Defendant: Burlingame Police Department, Steve Wagstaffe, Eric M. Hove, Jatinder K. Singh, Thomas E. Samuels, Jack Grandsaert and County of San Mateo
Case Number: 3:2008cv02188
Filed: April 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE: BRIEFING ON PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENSE ATTORNEY AND PSYCHOLOGISTS, AND GRANTING PARTIAL LEAVE TO AMEND CLAIMS AGAINST WITT AND BPD 43 46 55 59 66 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER PERMITTING FURTHER WRITTEN OPPOSITION TO PENDING MOTIONS, AND VACATING HEARING DATES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF SERVICE ON SOME DEFENDANTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR AMENDMENT OF CONSPIRACY-BASED CLAIMS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY WRESTLING DEFENDANTS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER LIFTING STAY, RE-OPENING ACTION, AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT 29 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pagtakhan et al v. Burlingame Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon E. Pagtakhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna E. Pagtakhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Marie French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puri E. Pagtakhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlingame Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric M. Hove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jatinder K. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Grandsaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?