United States of America et al v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii, State of California and United States of America
Defendant: Northwest Permanente, PC, Kaiser Permanente of Northern California, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Ohio Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Northwest, Kaiser Permanente Ventures, Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, PC, Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Oregon, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Hawaii, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Colorado, Group Health Cooperative, Kaiser Permanente of Southern California, Group Health Permanente, PC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Georgia, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Ohio, Colorado Permanente Medical Group, PC, The Permanente Federation, LLC, The Permanente Company, The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company and The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Jacquelyn Finney and Robert Finney
Case Number: 3:2008cv02411
Filed: May 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE: #46 GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 06/22/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 15, 2010 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Jacquelyn Finney, Robert Finney. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 28, 2010 Filing 45 Letter dated 5/20/10 from Robert D. Finney re #44 Letter, #41 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service, MOTION to Appoint a Special Investigator, MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION to Hold Evidentiary Hearing, MOTION to Postpone Qui Tam Status Conference, MOTION to Conduct Telephonic Conferences and Hearings, MOTION for Disability Accommodation in Scheduling State Conference and Other Dates/Deadlines. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 Filing 44 Transmittal Letter dated 5/11/10 from Robert D. Finney re #41 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service, MOTION to Appoint a Special Investigator, MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION to Hold Evidentiary Hearing, MOTION to Postpone Qui Tam Status Conference, MOTION to Conduct Telephonic Conferences and Hearings, MOTION for Disability Accommodation in Scheduling State Conference and Other Dates/Deadlines. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 43 Reply to the United States Response re #41 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service MOTION to Appoint Special Investigator MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION to Hold Evidentiary Hearing MOTION to Postpone Qui Tam Status Conference MOTION to Conduct Telephonic Conferences and Hearings MOTION for Disability Accommodation in Scheduling State Conference and Other Dates/Deadlines filed by Jacquelyn Finney, Robert Finney. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 24, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference continued to 6/24/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE: #41 RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE AND DENYING REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION OF RECUSAL AND APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL INVESTIGATOR. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 05/24/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #39 Response ( Non Motion ), #26 Response ( Non Motion ) (Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Relators' Motion to Extend Time for Service, Etc. with Attachment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Olsen, Edward) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time for Service, MOTION to Appoint a Special Investigator, MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION to Hold Evidentiary Hearing, MOTION to Postpone Qui Tam Status Conference, MOTION to Conduct Telephonic Conferences and Hearings, MOTION for Disability Accommodation in Scheduling State Conference and Other Dates/Deadlines filed by Jacquelyn Finney, Robert Finney. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
March 23, 2010 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re ( #37 ) Reply to Response to Motion to Schedule Case Management Conference, Motion to Extend Time for Service Pursuant to F. R. Civ, P 4(m) and (Proposed) Order; Request for Recusal due to Perception of Bias and Conflict of Interest; Request fo r Extention of Time to Hold Staus Conference; Request for Disability Accommodation and Interactive Process in Scheduling Status Conference by Jacquelyn Finney, Robert Finney (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 Filing 37 Reply to Response to Motion to Schedule Case Management Conference, Motion to Extend Time for Service Pursuant to F. R. Civ, P 4(m) and (Proposed) Order; Request for Recusal due to Perception of Bias and Conflict of Interest; Request for Extention of Time to Hold Staus Conference; Request for Disability Accommodation and Interactive Process in Scheduling Status Conference filed by Jacquelyn Finney, Robert Finney. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE AND DENYING REQUEST FOR RECUSAL:Status Conference set for 5/27/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/23/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 35 CLERKS NOTICE RE: #33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #30 MOTION to Schedule Case Management Conference, to Extend Time for Service, and for Reassignement to a U.S. District Judge by United States of America. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 33 CLERKS NOTICE: Status Conference set for 4/1/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/26/10. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010) (slh, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION to Schedule CMC and Decline to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. filed by Jacquelyn Finney, Robert Finney. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010) (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2009 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #28 Order (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge James Larson DENYING Request for Case Management Conference and for Order Tolling Extension of Time for Service. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge James Larson DENYING plaintiff's denying #25 Motion to Schedule Case Management Conference and to Toll Extension of Time for Service. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2009 Filing 26 RESPONSE to re #25 MOTION for Hearing by United States of America. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2009 Filing 25 MOTION to Schedule CMC to toll extension of time for service filed by Jacquelyn Finney, Robert Finney. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER extending time for service. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/20/09. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time re Service filed by Robert Finney. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2009 Filing 22 Mail sent to Leland B. Altschuler returned as undeliverable re #21 Order. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that Joel M. Androphy, the firm of Berg & Androphy and Leland B. Altschuler, are withdrawn from this case as counsel of record for Relators. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/9/09. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge James Larson granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Leland Bruce Altschuler terminated (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2009 Filing 19 Declaration of Joel M. Androphy in Support of #18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed byRobert Finney, Jacquelyn Finney. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2009 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Robert Finney, Jacquelyn Finney. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/22/09. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2009 Filing 16 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by State of California. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge James Larson granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joel M. Androphy terminated (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 14 Declaration of Joel M. Androphy in Support of #13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed byRobert Finney, Jacquelyn Finney. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Robert Finney, Jacquelyn Finney. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER The Complaint be unsealed and served upon the defendant by relator. All other contents of the Court's file remain under seal and not be made public. The seal be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order.. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/4/09. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009) (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2009 Proposed Order re Notice of Election to Decline Intervention by United States of America. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/4/08. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009) (filed UNDER SEAL) Modified on 3/11/2010 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/12/09. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009) (filed UNDER SEAL) Modified on 3/11/2010 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge James Larson that the United States shall have up to and including 1/5/09 to inform this Court of its decision whether to intervene in this matter. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008) (filed UNDER SEAL) Modified on 3/11/2010 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge James Larson granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2008) (filed UNDER SEAL) Modified on 3/11/2010 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge James Larson granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2008) (filed UNDER SEAL) Modified on 3/11/2010 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge James Larson granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2008)(filed UNDER SEAL) Modified on 3/11/2010 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2008 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Kathryn E. Nelson leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611019034.) filed by State of Hawaii, United States of America, State of California. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008) (filed UNDER SEAL) Modified on 3/11/2010 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2008 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Joel M. Androphy leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611019034.) filed by State of Hawaii, United States of America, State of California. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008) (filed UNDER SEAL) Modified on 3/11/2010 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2008 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Sarah M. Frazier leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611019034.) filed by State of Hawaii, United States of America, State of California. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008) (filed UNDER SEAL) Modified on 3/11/2010 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2008. Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2008 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/9/08. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008) (filed UNDER SEAL) Modified on 3/11/2010 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /no process against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, The Permanente Federation, LLC, The Permanente Company, Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente of Northern California, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Permanente of Southern California, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Colorado, Colorado Permanente Medical Group, PC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Georgia, Inc., The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Hawaii, Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, PC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Ohio, Ohio Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Oregon, Northwest Permanente, PC, Group Health Cooperative, Group Health Permanente, PC, Kaiser Permanente Ventures ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 3461109032.). Filed byState of Hawaii, United States of America, State of California. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2010: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (slh, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Permanente, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente of Northern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Permanente Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of The Northwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Ventures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Health Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente of Southern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Health Permanente, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Georgia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Permanente Medical Group, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Federation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Southeast Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jacquelyn Finney
Represented By: Joel M. Androphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Robert Finney
Represented By: Joel M. Androphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Leland Bruce Altschuler
Represented By: Kathryn E. Nelson
Represented By: Joel M. Androphy
Represented By: Sarah M. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Leland Bruce Altschuler
Represented By: Kathryn E. Nelson
Represented By: Joel M. Androphy
Represented By: Sarah M. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Edward A. Olsen
Represented By: Leland Bruce Altschuler
Represented By: Kathryn E. Nelson
Represented By: Joel M. Androphy
Represented By: Sarah M. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?