James et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Isabella Antonia Hughes James and Jennifer Hardy
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv02726
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/10/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SECOND AMENDED ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED MINOR'S CLAIM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/16/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING re 47 Letter filed by Ford Motor Company for Sara Tropea to appear telephonically on 12/4/9 at 1:30 PM. Court will initiate the phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/30/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING re 42 Joint Request to Vacate Case Management Conference filed by Isabella Antonia Hughes James, Jennifer Hardy. Case management conference date of 11/13/9 at 1:30 PM has been vacated. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/5/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2009 at 01:30 PM. Updated joint case management statement due by 11/6/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/27/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOLLOWING NOVEMBER 24, 2008, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 11/25/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 GRANTING STIPULATION selecting Private ADR and REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 9/11/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella Antonia Hughes James
Represented By: Michael Winston Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hardy
Represented By: Michael Winston Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Michael Winston Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?