Kilgore et al v. Keybank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Matthew C. Kilgore, William Bruce Fuller and Kevin Wilhelmy
Defendant: Keybank, National Association, Key Education Resources, Great Lakes Education Loan Services, Inc., Student Loan Xpress and American Education Services
Case Number: 3:2008cv02958
Filed: June 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson GRANTING 132 Motion to Dismiss (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing on re 132 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, on or before 3/15/2010. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Motion Hearing to 3/29/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/29/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time to respond to third amended complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/04/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 120 Motion to Amend/Correct; Plaintiffs is required to E-FILE the amended document by Monday, December 21, 2009; granting 120 Motion for Leave to File.(tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER dismissing defendants AES and SLX only without prejudice. American Education Services and Student Loan Xpress terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/27/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting re 109 Stipulation Extending Time To Respond to Complaint And To Continue Case Management Conferene filed by Student Loan Xpress Answer due: 10/27/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2009 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/13/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re 97 Letter filed by Keybank, National Association, 98 Letter, filed by Kevin Wilhelmy, Matthew C. Kilgore, William Bruce Fuller.(tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to complaint and continuing the Initial Case Management Conference to 10/19/09 at 1:30 PM as to defendants SLX and AES only. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/07/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 64 Motion to Compel; granting 79 Motion to Strike. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to complaint and continuing the case management conference to 08/17/09 at 1:30 PM as to dfts SLX and AES. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/29/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER continuing hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on May 22, 2009. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Initial Case Management Conference for defendants SLX and AES only to 6/8/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/16/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to complaint and continuing the Initial Case Management Conference to 4/27/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/15/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 1/20/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/8/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (PRIVATE MEDIATION) re 46 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Matthew C. Kilgore, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/6/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilgore et al v. Keybank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew C. Kilgore
Represented By: Kevin Francis Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bruce Fuller
Represented By: Kevin Francis Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wilhelmy
Represented By: Kevin Francis Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keybank, National Association
Represented By: Todd C. Toral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Education Resources
Represented By: W. Scott O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Education Loan Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Student Loan Xpress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Education Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?