November 15, 2011 |
Filing
493
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATED MOTION BY VNUS AND TVS FOR DISMISSAL OF TVS AND PARTIAL VACATUR OF VERDICT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 15, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
|
October 20, 2011 |
Filing
485
ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR SHARI HEYEN, ESQ. TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
|
October 6, 2011 |
Filing
482
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD; VACATING HEARING. Jeremy M. Brodsky is terminated as attorney of record for plaintiff. The November 4, 2011 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
|
September 27, 2011 |
Filing
480
ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The hearing on VNUS's motion for summary judgment is continued to October 21, 2011, at 9:00 a.m.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
|
September 9, 2011 |
Filing
475
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF BIOLITEC AND PARTIAL VACATUR OF VERDICT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 9, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
|
September 2, 2011 |
Filing
467
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
|
June 17, 2011 |
Filing
458
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR VNUS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INEQUITABLE CONDUCT. Vnus's motion shall be filed no later than July 29, 2011, and a hearing shall be noticed for September 9, 2011. Opposition shall be filed no later than August 12, 2011, and the reply shall be filed no later than August 19, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 17, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
|
April 22, 2011 |
Filing
454
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE. The telephonic Case Management Conference is continued from April 29, 2011 to June 10, 2011. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than June 3, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 22, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
|
February 7, 2011 |
Filing
449
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO PERMIT COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR FEBRUARY 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
|
February 3, 2011 |
Filing
447
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANTHONY F. MATHENY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
|
November 23, 2010 |
Filing
407
ORDER WITHDRAWING CERTAIN EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing
377
ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 25, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing
368
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT NEW STAR LASERS, INC., d/b/a COOLTOUCH, INC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 19, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
|
October 15, 2010 |
Filing
364
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO ADMIT CERTAIN EXHIBITS INTO EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
|
October 12, 2010 |
Filing
361
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM FOR TRIAL; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 12, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
|
September 29, 2010 |
Filing
348
ORDER REGARDING ADDENDA TO STIPULATIONS REFLECTED IN JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 29, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
|
September 28, 2010 |
Filing
347
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 28, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing
333
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing
338
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)(Filed September 15, 2010)
|
September 10, 2010 |
Filing
306
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
|
August 23, 2010 |
Filing
259
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART BIOLITEC, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION LIMITING DAMAGES. To the extent biolitec seeks summary judgment on VNUS's claim of c ontributory infringement as it pertains to 810 consoles, 980 consoles, and bare tip laser fibers, the motion is granted. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
|
August 11, 2010 |
Filing
258
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART TOTAL VEIN SOLUTIONS, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO CONTRIBUTORY INFRINGEMENT. To the extent TVS seeks summary judgment on VNUS's claim of direct infringement, the motion is granted. To the extent TVS seeks summary judgment on VNUS's claim of contributory infringement as it pertains to (a) introducers other than those greater than 11 cm in length that have markers and/or a locking adapter, (b) laser fibers, and (c) laser consoles, the motion is granted. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing
257
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT ASSERTED '433 AND '970 CLAIMS ARE INVALID FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 3, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing
250
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION AND TVS'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing
248
CLARIFICATION ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE re 217 Stipulation, filed by Total Vein Solutions, LLC dba Total Vein Systems. Signed by Judge James Larson on 7/27/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing
244
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
|
July 12, 2010 |
Filing
213
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION AND AMENDED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 12, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010) Modified on 7/12/2010 (mmclc1, COURT STAFF).
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing
196
DISCOVERY ORDER re 174 Statement filed by Vnus Medical Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/29/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
|
April 26, 2010 |
Filing
171
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ALLEN S. RUGG PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 26, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
|
April 19, 2010 |
Filing
168
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO PERMIT COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 19, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing
164
ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DEFENDANT TOTAL VEIN SOLUTIONS, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 8, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
|
February 23, 2010 |
Filing
162
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRENT R. BELLOW PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing
155
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing
152
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND CERTAIN DISCOVERY DEADLINES. The Pretrial Preparation Order is amended to set new discovery deadlines and obligations, as set forth in the parties' stipulation filed November 18, 2009. Further, a status conference is scheduled for May 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
|
November 17, 2009 |
Filing
148
ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES. The stipulated request is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing
144
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO PERMIT COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR NOVEMBER 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing
140
ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
139
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SUBSTITUTING TYCO HEALTHCARE GROUP LP D/B/A VNUS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES AS PLAINTIFF AND COUNTER-CLAIM DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
|
September 2, 2009 |
Filing
136
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
|
August 6, 2009 |
Filing
132
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CHANGE DATE OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. The technology tutorial and claim construction hearing currently scheduled for August 17, 2009 is rescheduled for September 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 5, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing
125
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 31, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
|
May 8, 2009 |
Filing
110
ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. The Clerk is directed to file under seal the unredacted version of the Joint Statement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
|
March 30, 2009 |
Filing
105
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND PATENT L.R. 4-2 DEADLINE FOR EXCHANGE OF PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE. The deadline for the parties to exchange their Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence is extended from April 3, 2009 to April 8, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 30, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
|
March 3, 2009 |
Filing
103
ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE. The deadline to complete mediation is continued from May 1, 2009 to May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing
100
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO BIFURCATE AND STAY THE EIGHTH THROUGH ELEVENTH COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT TOTAL VEIN SOLUTIONS, LLC. TVS's Eighth, Ninth, Tenth, and Eleventh Counterclaims are bifurcated and stayed pending resolution of the remainder of the parties' claims and counterclaims. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
|
January 23, 2009 |
Filing
99
ORDER RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. The Court informs the parties the Court will construe no more than ten terms in connection with the claim construction hearing, i.e., the terms identified by the parties as the "most significant" pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4-3(c). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 23, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing
98
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TOTAL VEIN SOLUTIONS, LLC TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
|
December 16, 2008 |
Filing
93
ORDER RE: SCHEDULING OF PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS, PRELIMINARY INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS, AND PROPOSED TERMS FOR CONSTRUCTION. The deadline for VNUS to serve Asserted Claims and Preliminary Infringement Contentions is continued to February 12 , 2009. The deadline for defendants to serve Preliminary Invalidity Contentions is continued to March 13, 2009. The deadline to exchange proposed terms for construction and to meet and confer is continued to March 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
|
December 12, 2008 |
Filing
91
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO ADJOURN DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS OF TOTAL VEIN SOLUTIONS, LLC. Plaintiff's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to TVS's counterclaims is adjourned to January 12, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing
87
ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE. The appearances of Jerry R. Selinger, Henry M. Pogorzelski, and John C. Carey, on behalf of Total Vein Solutions LLC d/b/a Total Vein Systems, are withdrawn. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
|
November 18, 2008 |
Filing
82
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS DAVID S. CENTANNI AND TYRELL L. SCHIEK AND CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED CASES. Defendants David S. Centanni and Tyrell L. Schiek are dismissed with prejudice. VNUS v. biolitec et al., C-08-3129, is consolidated for all pu rposes with VNUS v. TVS, C-08-4234. The caption of every pleading filed in these consolidated actions shall denote lead case number C-08-3129, and all papers filed and served to date in either of the foregoing cases are deemed a part of the record in the consolidated actions. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
|
October 30, 2008 |
Filing
63
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD W. MILLER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
|
September 30, 2008 |
Filing
48
RELATED CASE ORDER. Vnus Medical Technologies, Inc. v. Biolitec, Inc., C-08-3129, is related to Vnus Medical Technologies, Inc. v. Total Vein Solutions, Inc., 08-4234. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
|
September 22, 2008 |
Filing
45
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE TO SERVE DEFENDANT DORNIER MEDTECH AMERICA, INC. The Case Management Conference is continued from October 17, 2008 to November 14, 2008. Plaintiff is ordered to serve defendant Dornier Medtech America, Inc., no later than October 27, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 22, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
|
September 17, 2008 |
Filing
38
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT BIOLITEC, INC. TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 17, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
|
September 15, 2008 |
Filing
36
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL N. RADER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
|