Mead v. Hyvarinen
Case Number: 3:2008cv03234
Filed: July 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/23/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/27/2011 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/17/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/9/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mead v. Hyvarinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?