California Water Service Company v. PPG Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: California Water Service Company
Defendant: Columbia Drycleaning Machines, Legacy Vulcan Corp., PPG Industries, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Vulcan Materials Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Valero Energy Corporation, Stauffer Chemical Company, Bowe-Permac, Inc. individually doing business as Bowe Textile Cleaning, Inc., Hoyt Corporation, R.R. Street & Co., Inc., McGraw Edison Company individually doing business as American Laundry Machinery, Inc., American Laundry Machinery, Inc. individually doing business as Ajax Manufacturing Division and Martin Equipment, White Consolidated Industries, Inc. individually doing business as Washex Machinery Division, Electrolux Corporation, Lindus S.R.L. individually doing business as Lindus West, Columbia, Realstar, Inc. individually doing business as Realstar USA, Union Drycleaning Products USA, Firbimatic, Bergparma of America, LLC, AMA Universal, Fluormatic Midwest Ltd., Forenta LP, Western Multitex Corp., Marvel Manufacturing, Renzacci of America, Sail Star USA, Vic Manufacturing Corporation, M.B.L., Inc., Goss-Jewett Co. of Northern California, McGregor Supply Company, S.B. Supply Inc., Washex Machinery of California, Inc., Workroom Supply, Inc., Taylor Houseman, Inc., United Fabricare Supply, Inc., Echo Sales Inc., MW Equipment, Arthur Kajiwara Equipment Co., Inc., Kelleher Equipment Supply, Inc., US Machinery & Engineering Co., Inc., Wyatt-Bennett, Corbett Equipment, Fuller Supply Company, Sav-On Machinery Company, Inc., Bergparma of America, LLC, Mondial Drycleaning Products, Inc., Eco Dry of America, Inc. and Cooper Industries, LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv03267
Filed: July 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Energy Allocation Act Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Energy Allocation Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2008 Filing 162 Receipt/Acknowledgment of certified copy of docket entries and certified copy of remand order from San Mateo County Superior Court. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 161 CLERKS NOTICE : Certified copy of docket entries and certified copy of remand order mailed to Man Mateo County Superior Court. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND; DENYING ALL OTHER PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 159 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company Proof of Service on Cooper Industries, Inc. and Cooper Industries, Ltd. on Behalf of McGraw Edison Company, Individually and D/B/A American Laundry Machinery, Inc. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting substitution of attorneys (#153). Signed by Judge Illston on 10/30/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Protective ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/28/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 156 CLERKS NOTICE :YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the motions scheduled to be heard on Friday, October 31, 2008 have been taken off calendar and will be deemed submitted without oral argument.The initial case management conference previously scheduled to occur on Friday, October 31, 2008, shall be vacated and will be rescheduled if necessary. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference has been taken off calendar and will be rescheduled, if necessary, at a later date. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 155 Certificate of Interested Entities by Electrolux Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Powers, Michele) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 27, 2008 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Forenta LP re #153 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Deam, Ryan) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 27, 2008 Filing 153 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Ryan Mitchell Deam (Deam, Ryan) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company re #151 Joint Case Management Statement (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 151 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by California Water Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 150 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cooper Industries, LLC Defendant Cooper Industries, LLC's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Reyna, Kristin) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 149 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Dow Chemical Company (Valen, Stephen) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 148 STIPULATION Stipulation of Cooper Industries, LLC to Stipulated Protective Order by Cooper Industries, LLC. (Reyna, Kristin) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin N. Reyna Notice of Appearance of Cooper Industries, LLC, as Successor in Interest to McGraw Edison Company (Reyna, Kristin) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Renzacci of America, Kelleher Equipment Supply, Inc. (Spataro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 145 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 10/29/08 at 3:00 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 144 Certificate of Interested Entities by Renzacci of America, Kelleher Equipment Supply, Inc. (Spataro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 143 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric Grant (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 142 Certificate of Interested Entities by PPG Industries, Inc. (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER extending deadline for initial disclosures re #133 . Signed by Judge Illston on 10/20/08. (tsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company re #139 Reply (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Filing 139 Reply in suppot of #33 Plaintiff California Water Service Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Remand filed byCalifornia Water Service Company. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Filing 138 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Melton, David) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 137 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Melton, David) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc. Reply to Plaintiff California Water Service Company's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 135 Reply to #127 Plaintiff California Water Service Company's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal by PPG Industries, Inc.. (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2008 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Dudley Notice of Appearance of American Laundry Machinery, Inc, (Dudley, Matthew) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 133 STIPULATION re #78 Order Changing Deadline for Initial Disclosures by Eco Dry of America, Inc.. (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 132 NOTICE by Eco Dry of America, Inc. re #77 Order Agreement to Protective Order re Confidential Information (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company Proof of Service on Cooper Industries A/K/A Cooper US, Inc. (F/K/A McGraw Edison Company) (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Illston granting #123 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Illston granting #122 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company re #127 Memorandum in Opposition (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 127 Memorandum in Opposition re #58 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal filed byCalifornia Water Service Company. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc. re #124 Memorandum in Opposition, #125 Request for Judicial Notice, (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 125 Request for Judicial Notice re #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff California Water Service Company's Motion for Remand filed byPPG Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #124 ) (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff California Water Service Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Remand filed byPPG Industries, Inc.. (Related document(s) #33 ) (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 123 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Brian A. Abramson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611024245.) filed by R.R. Street & Co., Inc., Mondial Drycleaning Products, Inc., Eco Dry of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 receipt, #2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 122 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of John B. Thomas ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611024246.) filed by R.R. Street & Co., Inc., Mondial Drycleaning Products, Inc., Eco Dry of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 receipt, #2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Renzacci of America, Kelleher Equipment Supply, Inc. re: Motion for Joinder (Garrison, Gregg) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 120 Joinder to #24 Defendant Legacy Vulcan Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) filed by Renzacci of America, Kelleher Equipment Supply, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Garrison, Gregg) (Filed on 10/9/2008) Modified on 10/10/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2008 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company Proof of Service on Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc.) (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Renzacci of America, Kelleher Equipment Supply, Inc. re ADR documents (Spataro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 117 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Spataro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 116 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Spataro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electrolux Corporation re #114 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Powers, Michele) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 114 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Powers, Michele) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc. re #112 Joinder to Defendant Legacy Vulcan Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION for Joinder to Defendant Legacy Vulcan Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 10/7/2008) Modified on 10/8/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2008 Filing 112 Joinder to #24 Defendant Legacy Vulcan Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) filed by PPG Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 10/7/2008) Modified on 10/8/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2008 Filing 111 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 110 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 109 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Eco Dry of America, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Eco Dry of America, Inc.. (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Grant (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Legacy Vulcan Corp. of ADR Certification and Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (Attachments: #1 Signature)(Castro, Ruth Ann) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 106 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 105 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nichols, Daniel) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 104 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 103 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Forenta LP re #93 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options, #91 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Deam, Ryan) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 101 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McGregor Supply Company re #98 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), #97 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options by U.S. Mail (Greben, Jan) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Grant (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 98 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Greben, Jan) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 97 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Greben, Jan) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 96 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Gilhuly, R.) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 95 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel (Gilhuly, R.) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 94 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Phinney, Brian) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 93 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Deam, Ryan) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 92 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #89 (Castro, Ruth Ann) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 91 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Deam, Ryan) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company re #87 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), #86 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 89 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #92 . *** NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Castro, Ruth Ann) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/7/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 88 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Castro, Ruth Ann) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 87 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 86 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #84 . (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company re #84 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), #83 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 84 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #86 . *** NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/3/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 83 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 82 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mortl, Andrew) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 2, 2008 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc. re #80 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), #79 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options (Smith, Gary) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
October 2, 2008 Filing 80 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Smith, Gary) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
October 2, 2008 Filing 79 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Smith, Gary) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re: initial disclosures. Signed by Judge Illston on 9/22/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 protective order. Signed by Judge Illston on 9/22/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bowe-Permac, Inc. Opposition to Stipulated Protective Order #75 (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 9/22/2008) Modified on 9/23/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2008 Filing 75 Memorandum in Opposition to #69 proposed stipulated protective order submitted by Defendant Vulcan filed byBowe-Permac, Inc.. (Weyand, Alexander) (Filed on 9/22/2008) Modified on 9/23/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Illston granting #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Illston granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Illston granting #64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Illston granting #63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Legacy Vulcan Corp. re #69 Stipulation, #68 Stipulation (Colopy, James) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 69 STIPULATION STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE PROTECTION OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Legacy Vulcan Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colopy, James) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 68 STIPULATION AND STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING DEADLINE FOR INITIAL DISCLOSURES (CIVIL L.R. 6-2) by Legacy Vulcan Corp.. (Colopy, James) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company Proof of Service on Western Multitex Corp. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 66 MOTION of Richard S. Baron for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611023432) filed by Hoyt Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 65 MOTION of Marc Lawrence for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611023432) filed by Hoyt Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 64 MOTION of Brian H. Phinney for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611023432) filed by Hoyt Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 63 MOTION of Scott Summy for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611023431) filed by California Water Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 62 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff California Water Service Company's Complaint by Electrolux Corporation. (Powers, Michele) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company on Firbimatic; AMA Universal; US Machinery & Engineering Co., Inc. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
August 27, 2008 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc. re #58 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal, #59 Declaration in Support of Kenneth D. Kan (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
August 27, 2008 Filing 59 Declaration of Kenneth D. Kan in Support of #58 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal filed byPPG Industries, Inc.. (Related document(s) #58 ) (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
August 27, 2008 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal filed by PPG Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting PPG Industries, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal)(Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Scott Summy Notice of Appearance of Celeste A. Evangelisti (Summy, Paul) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 18, 2008 Filing 56 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Daniel J. Nichols by Daniel James Nichols (Nichols, Daniel) (Filed on 8/18/2008) Modified on 8/20/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2008 Filing 55 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Forenta LP. (Deam, Ryan) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 14, 2008 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Anthony Spataro and Co-counsel (Spataro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER continuing motion to dismiss to 11/21/08. Signed by Judge Illston on 8/13/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 13, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f). Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 13, 2008 Filing 52 CLERK'S NOTICE, CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2008 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 09:00 AM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 13, 2008 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company re #50 Objection, (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 13, 2008 Filing 50 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Submitted by Defendant Legacy Vulcan Corp. in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Enlarge Time for Responding to and Hearing Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by California Water Service Company. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 49 Declaration of Ruth Ann Castro in Support of #48 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed byVulcan Materials Company, Legacy Vulcan Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #48 ) (Castro, Ruth Ann) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 48 Memorandum in Opposition re #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff filed byVulcan Materials Company, Legacy Vulcan Corp.. (Castro, Ruth Ann) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by Occidental Chemical Corporation (Lewis, Stephen) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Morgan Gilhuly (Gilhuly, R.) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 8, 2008 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Joseph Valen on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company (Valen, Stephen) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
August 8, 2008 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Gennaro August Filice on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
August 8, 2008 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Crawford Lewis (Lewis, Stephen) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
August 8, 2008 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Lucille King (King, Maureen) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
August 8, 2008 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Evan Sobelman (Sobelman, Donald) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
August 8, 2008 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company re #33 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff California Water Service Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Remand, #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff, #37 Declaration in Support,, #38 Proposed Order,, #35 Proposed Order, #34 Declaration in Support, (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by California Water Service Company identifying Corporate Parent California Water Service Company for California Water Service Company. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
August 6, 2008 Filing 38 Proposed Order re #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff (Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Enlarge Time) by California Water Service Company. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 6, 2008 Filing 37 Declaration of Marnie E. Riddle in Support of #36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff filed byCalifornia Water Service Company. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 6, 2008 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) (Motion to Enlarge Time) filed by California Water Service Company. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 6, 2008 Filing 35 Proposed Order re #33 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff California Water Service Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Remand by California Water Service Company. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 6, 2008 Filing 34 Declaration of Marnie E. Riddle in Support of #33 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff California Water Service Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Remand filed byCalifornia Water Service Company. (Related document(s) #33 ) (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 6, 2008 Filing 33 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff California Water Service Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Remand filed by California Water Service Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 6, 2008 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by David Allen Melton (Melton, David) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
July 22, 2008 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Legacy Vulcan Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Vulcan Materials Company (formerly known as Virginia Holdco, Inc.) for. Legacy Vulcan Corp. (Castro, Ruth Ann) (Filed on 7/22/2008)
July 17, 2008 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Vulcan Materials Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Bergparma of America, LLC, Valero Energy Corporation, Stauffer Chemical Company, Bowe-Permac, Inc., Hoyt Corporation, R.R. Street & Co., Inc., McGraw Edison Company, American Laundry Machinery, Inc., White Consolidated Industries, Inc., Electrolux Corporation, Lindus S.R.L., Columbia Drycleaning Machines, Realstar, Inc., Union Drycleaning Products USA, Firbimatic, Bergparma of America, LLC, AMA Universal, Fluormatic Midwest Ltd., Forenta LP, Western Multitex Corp., Marvel Manufacturing, Renzacci of America, Sail Star USA, Vic Manufacturing Corporation, M.B.L., Inc., Goss-Jewett Co. of Northern California, McGregor Supply Company, S.B. Supply Inc., Washex Machinery of California, Inc., Workroom Supply, Inc., Taylor Houseman, Inc., United Fabricare Supply, Inc., Echo Sales Inc., MW Equipment, Arthur Kajiwara Equipment Co., Inc., Kelleher Equipment Supply, Inc., US Machinery & Engineering Co., Inc., Wyatt-Bennett, Corbett Equipment, Fuller Supply Company, Sav-On Machinery Company, Inc., PPG Industries, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
July 17, 2008 Filing 29 NOTICE by California Water Service Company of Service of Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) (Original Jurisdiction); Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; Case Management Conference Order; Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge Form; and U.S. District Court Northern California ECF Registration Information Handout (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
July 17, 2008 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Water Service Company Summons to Complaint and Proof of Service on Defendants (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
July 16, 2008 Filing 27 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff California Water Service Company's Complaint by California Water Service Company. (Riddle, Marnie) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
July 11, 2008 Filing 26 EXHIBITS re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) PROPOSED ORDER filed byVulcan Materials Company. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Colopy, James) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 11, 2008 Filing 25 Request for Judicial Notice re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) filed byVulcan Materials Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #24 ) (Colopy, James) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 11, 2008 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike Certain Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) filed by Vulcan Materials Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colopy, James) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc. re #22 Certificate of Service by Mail to Plaintiff's Attorney, Marnie E. Riddle, Re Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal on Known Co-Defendants.pdf (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc. of Notice of Removal on Known Co-Defendants (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McGregor Supply Company re #20 Notice of Appearance Proof of Service by U.S. Mail (Greben, Jan) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan Adam Greben On Behalf of Defendant McGregor Supply Company (Greben, Jan) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 9, 2008 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc. re #18 Notice (Other) Submission of Remaining Documents from State Court File (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
July 9, 2008 Filing 18 NOTICE by PPG Industries, Inc. Submission of Remaining Documents from State Court File (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
July 9, 2008 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc. re #16 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice Regarding Completion of Service and Filing Requirements for Removal Petition (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
July 9, 2008 Filing 16 NOTICE by PPG Industries, Inc. Notice Regarding Completion of Service and Filing Requirements for Removal Petition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit A, Part 3 of 3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
July 9, 2008 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc. re #14 Notice (Other) Supplement to Notice to Plaintiff California Water Service Company of Removal (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
July 9, 2008 Filing 14 NOTICE by PPG Industries, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Supplement to Notice of Removal to Plaintiff California Water Service Company of Removal (Tacorda, Ryan) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
July 7, 2008 Filing 13 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2008. Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2008 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 standing orders and cmc order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
July 7, 2008 Filing 12 Consent to Removal of Forenta, LP by PPG Industries, Inc.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 Filing 11 Consent to Removal of Valero Energy Corporation by PPG Industries, Inc.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 Filing 10 Consent to Removal of Corbett Equipment by PPG Industries, Inc.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 Filing 9 Consent to Removal of Arthur KAjiwara Equipment Company, Inc. by PPG Industries, Inc.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 Filing 8 Consent to Removal of Washex Machinery of California, Inc. by PPG Industries, Inc.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 Filing 7 Declaration of Gary J. Smith in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed byPPG Industries, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 Filing 6 Declaration of Sarah F. Peterman in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed byPPG Industries, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 Filing 5 Declaration of Maureen L. King in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed byPPG Industries, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 Filing 4 Declaration of Ryan R. Tacorda in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed byPPG Industries, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 Filing 3 Declaration of Stephen J. Valen in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed byPPG Industries, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 Filing 2 Joinder in #1 Notice of Removal by E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Vulcan Materials Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Bowe-Permac, Inc., Hoyt Corporation, R.R. Street & Co., Inc., American Laundry Machinery, Inc., Columbia Drycleaning Machines, Renzacci of America, Sail Star USA, Vic Manufacturing Corporation, M.B.L., Inc., McGregor Supply Company, S.B. Supply Inc., Workroom Supply, Inc., Taylor Houseman, Inc., United Fabricare Supply, Inc., Kelleher Equipment Supply, Inc., Wyatt-Bennett, The Dow Chemical Company. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV 473093. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611020953). Filed byPPG Industries, Inc.. (No Process) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Water Service Company v. PPG Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Drycleaning Machines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Vulcan Corp.
Represented By: James H. Colopy
Represented By: Ruth Ann Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Gary John Smith
Represented By: Robert Brager
Represented By: Ryan Reside Tacorda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Gennaro August Filice
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Valen
Represented By: Daniel James Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Mortl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vulcan Materials Company
Represented By: James H. Colopy
Represented By: Ruth Ann Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Donald Evan Sobelman
Represented By: Maureen Lucille King
Represented By: R. Morgan Gilhuly
Represented By: Stephen Crawford Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stauffer Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowe-Permac, Inc. individually doing business as Bowe Textile Cleaning, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Michael Weyand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyt Corporation
Represented By: Brian H Phinney
Represented By: Marc P. Lawrence,
Represented By: Richard S. Baron,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.R. Street & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Eric Grant
Represented By: Brian A. Abramson
Represented By: John B. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGraw Edison Company individually doing business as American Laundry Machinery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Laundry Machinery, Inc. individually doing business as Ajax Manufacturing Division and Martin Equipment
Represented By: Kelly Jean Lack
Represented By: Matthew G. Dudley
Represented By: Robert N. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Consolidated Industries, Inc. individually doing business as Washex Machinery Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Corporation
Represented By: Michele Annette Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindus S.R.L. individually doing business as Lindus West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realstar, Inc. individually doing business as Realstar USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Drycleaning Products USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firbimatic, Bergparma of America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMA Universal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluormatic Midwest Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forenta LP
Represented By: Thomas H. Clarke, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Mitchell Deam
Represented By: Susan Lauren Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Multitex Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renzacci of America
Represented By: Stephen Anthony Spataro
Represented By: Gregg Scott Garrison
Represented By: Herman Ira Kalfen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sail Star USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vic Manufacturing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.B.L., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goss-Jewett Co. of Northern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGregor Supply Company
Represented By: Jan Adam Greben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.B. Supply Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washex Machinery of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workroom Supply, Inc.
Represented By: David Allen Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Houseman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fabricare Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo Sales Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Kajiwara Equipment Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelleher Equipment Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Anthony Spataro
Represented By: Gregg Scott Garrison
Represented By: Herman Ira Kalfen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Machinery & Engineering Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyatt-Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corbett Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuller Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sav-On Machinery Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergparma of America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mondial Drycleaning Products, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Grant
Represented By: Brian A. Abramson
Represented By: John B. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eco Dry of America, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Grant
Represented By: Brian A. Abramson
Represented By: John B. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, LLC
Represented By: Kristin N. Reyna
Represented By: Matthew Paul Nugent
Represented By: Paul Gerhardt Zacher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Water Service Company
Represented By: Victor Marc Sher
Represented By: Marnie Erica Riddle,
Represented By: Paul Scott Summy
Represented By: Todd E. Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?