Save Strawberry Canyon v. Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory et al
Plaintiff: Save Strawberry Canyon
Defendant: Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory, Steven Chu, Department of Energy, Samuel W. Bodman, Benjamin Allen, Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake and Debbie Cole
Case Number: 3:2008cv03494
Filed: July 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case C11-01564 EDL is related to C08-03494 WHA. The more recently filed case shall be reassigned to Judge Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/5/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 RESPONSE (re #204 MOTION to Relate Case - Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related ) filed bySteven Chu, Department of Energy. (Whitfield, Peter) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Save Strawberry Canyon re #204 MOTION to Relate Case - Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MOTION to Relate Case - Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR DISSOLUTION OF INJUNCTION by Judge Alsup granting #201 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Statement of Non-Opposition re #201 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Dissolution of Injunction filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #201 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Dissolution of Injunction filed by Department of Energy. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 3/1/2011) Modified on 3/2/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION ON ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Renotice motion hearing Continuing Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION on Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Steven Chu, Department of Energy, Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Renotice motion hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MANDATE of USCA - Appellants motion for voluntary dismissal is granted as to #181 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Chu, Department of Energy (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #185 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Renotice motion hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Proposed Order re #185 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum in Support Thereof by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Declaration of Stephan C. Volker in Support of #185 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #185 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Declaration of Kenneth B. Finney in Support of #185 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #185 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Declaration of Ellison Folk in Support of #185 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #185 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Declaration of Linda M. Dardarian in Support of #185 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #185 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Declaration of Sharon E. Duggan in Support of #185 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #185 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Declaration of Richard T. Drury in Support of #185 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #185 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of #185 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #185 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 USCA Case Number 09-17310 Ninth Circuit for #181 Notice of Appeal filed by Steven Chu, Department of Energy. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #181 Notice of Appeal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Copy of Notice of Appeal e-filed to all counsel (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE OF APPEAL (filing fee waived) as to #176 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #177 Judgment by Steven Chu, Department of Energy. (sis, COURT STAFF) USCA Case No. 09-17310(Filed on 10/16/2009) Modified on 10/23/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-30-09, before Judge Wiilliam Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of plaintiff's #147 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 17, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER RE: CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup denying #121 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #127 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #147 Motion for Summary Judgment (feriab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009) .
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Save Strawberry Canyon (Ramsey, Donald) (Filed on 8/10/2009) Modified on 8/12/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Letter from UC Defendants re Court's Request for Stipulation. (Smith, John) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Letter from Federal Defendants Re: Court's Request for Stipulation. (Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Letter from Plaintiff Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Letter from UC Defendants re Court's Request for Stipulation. (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 AMENDED Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 7/30/2009) re #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William De la Pena, et al., #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven Chu, Department of Energy, #147 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/30/2009)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 7/30/2009) re #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William De la Pena, et al., #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven Chu, Department of Energy, #147 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #122 , Notice of Motion and Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #122 , Notice of Motion and Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/30/2009)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof re #167 Objection,, #166 Reply Memorandum,, (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Offered in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Steven Chu, Department of Energy. (Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Offered in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Reply Memorandum #127 In Support of UC Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau #164 in Support of Plaintiff's Response to UC Defendants' Objections to Evidence filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 RESPONSE to #153 UC Defendants' Objections to Evidence Offered in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Reply Memorandum #147 in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Reply Memorandum #121 Federal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Energy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appendix 22)(Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 OBJECTIONS to #124 #125 #126 Federal Defendants' Objections to Evidence Offered in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Department of Energy. (Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 7/9/2009) Modified on 7/10/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Memorandum in Opposition #147 Federal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Energy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appendix 12-16, #2 Exhibit Appendix 17-21)(Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 7/9/2009) Modified on 7/10/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof re #152 #153 #154 #155 #156 #157 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/9/2009) Modified on 7/10/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Proposed Order re #152 Memorandum in Opposition,, by A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Request for Judicial Notice re #152 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #152 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Declaration of Katherine Yelick in Support of #152 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #152 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Declaration of Lynn Rippe in Support of #152 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #152 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Declaration of Michael Banda in Support of #152 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #152 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 OBJECTIONS to re #152 Memorandum in Opposition,, Objections to Evidence Offered in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Memorandum in Opposition #147 to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Smith, John) (Filed on 7/9/2009) Modified on 7/10/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of #149 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #149 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Memorandum in Opposition #127 to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2009) Modified on 7/10/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Letter from All Parties re ADR Status and re Agreement to Bench Trial. (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #122 , Notice of Motion and Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof re #132 Declaration in Support, #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #142 Declaration in Support,, #138 Declaration in Support,, #134 Declaration in Support,, #140 Declaration in Support,, #145 Proposed Order,, #143 Request for Judicial Notice,, #137 Declaration in Support,, #139 Declaration in Support,, #128 Brief,, #144 Proposed Order,, #131 Declaration in Support,, #136 Declaration in Support,,, #135 Declaration in Support,, #141 Declaration in Support,,, #130 Declaration in Support, #129 Declaration in Support,, #133 Proposed Order (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Proposed Order re #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Proposed] Judgment by A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Proposed Order re #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Proposed] Order Granting UC Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment by A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Request for Judicial Notice re #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Declaration of John Lynn Smith in Support of #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Declaration of Diane Griffiths in Support of #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Declaration of Katherine Yelick in Support of #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Declaration of Carol Sypher in Support of #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Declaration of Horst Simon in Support of #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Declaration of Jerome O'Hearn in Support of #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Declaration of Ronald Nelson in Support of #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Declaration of Jeffrey Fernandez in Support of #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Declaration of Bruce B. Darling in Support of #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Proposed Order re #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 EXHIBITS #124 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Volume 5 (Exhibits 91 through 118) filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 100 through 118)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2009) Modified on 6/29/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Declaration of Anne Broome in Support of #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 EXHIBITS #124 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Volume 4 (Exhibits 45 through 90) [out of 118 exhibits] filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 48 through 60, #2 Exhibit 61 through 90)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2009) Modified on 6/29/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Declaration of Michael Banda in Support of #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Brief re #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of UC Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byA. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. (Related document(s) #127 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Richard C. Blum, Debbie Cole, William De la Pena, John Garamendi, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Jack O'Connell, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Debbie Shewmake, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Mark G. Yudof. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Smith, John) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 EXHIBITS #124 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Vol. 3 (Exhibits 23 through 44) [out of 118 exhibits] filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34 through 41, #2 Exhibit 42 through 44)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2009) Modified on 6/29/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 EXHIBITS #124 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Exhibits 7 (pt. 2) through 22 [out of 118 Exhibits] filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 through 22)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2009) Modified on 6/29/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Exhibits 1 through 7 (part 1) [out of 118 exhibits] filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, 6, and 7, Pt. 1)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 *** FILED IN ERROR. NO NEW DOCUMENT. *** Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2009) Modified on 6/26/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #147 . *** MOTION for Summary Judgment , Notice of Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2009) Modified on 6/26/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven Chu, Department of Energy. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Tabs 1-5, #2 Appendix Tabs 6-11, #3 Proposed Order)(Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER APPROVING REQUEST TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION Requesting to Extend Pages for Memoranda Relating to Motions for Summary Judgment by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (9/14/2009) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (8/31/2009 AT 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/12/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held with Judge Laporte on 5/28/2009. Parties shall provide an update to the Court by joint letter or separate letters by 6/19/2009. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/28/2009)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION STANDARD (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake, Debbie Cole, Benjamin Allen re #112 Response,,, #113 Declaration in Support,,, (Smith, John) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Brief - Plaintiff's Reply to #111 #112 Defendants' Supplemental Briefs filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 4/1/2009) Modified on 4/2/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Declaration in Support of #112 Response,,, DECLARATION OF JOHN LYNN SMITH IN SUPPORT OF UC DEFENDANTS BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO MARCH 20, 2009 ORDER SOLICITING PARTIES VIEWS ON IMPORT OF American Trucking Assns V. City of Los Angeles on Preliminary Injunction Order with Exhs A - E attached filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake, Debbie Cole, Benjamin Allen. (Related document(s) #112 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Response re #108 Response,,, UC DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO MARCH 20, 2009 ORDER SOLICITING PARTIES VIEWS ON IMPORT OF AMERICAN TRUCKING ASSNS v. CITY OF LOS ANGELES ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake, Debbie Cole, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RESPONSE to re #107 Brief Federal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Department of Energy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1)(Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake, Debbie Cole, Benjamin Allen re #108 Response,,, (Smith, John) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau #107 in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 3/30/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Response re #105 Order UC Defendants' Brief in Response to March 20, 2009 Order Soliciting Parties' Views on Import of American Trucking Ass'ns v City of LA on Preliminary Injunction Order byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake, Debbie Cole, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Brief in Response to Order Regarding Recent Ninth Circuit Decision filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE to re #105 Order Federal Defendants' Brief in Response to the Court's March 20, 2009 Order by Department of Energy. (Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER REGARDING RECENT NINTH CIRCUIT DECISION (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Alsup finding as moot #18 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #18 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot #45 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting #46 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake, Debbie Cole, Benjamin Allen re #101 Letter PROOF OF SERVICE RE LETTER FROM JOHN LYNN SMITH RE NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Smith, John) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Letter from John Lynn Smith re Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Smith, John) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake, Debbie Cole, Benjamin Allen re #99 Stipulation,, PROOF OF SERVICE (Smith, John) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS AND POST-PRODUCTION ASSERTION OF CLAIMS OF PRIVILEGE OR ATTORNEY WORK PRODUCT PROTECTION by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake, Debbie Cole, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/19/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 2/19/2009) re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Save Strawberry Canyon, #45 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Samuel W. Bodman, Department of Energy, Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory, #90 MOTION for Leave to File filed by William De la Pena, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Russell S. Gould, Bonnie Riess, Monica C. Lozano, Leslie Tang Schilling, Karen Bass, A. Paul Alivisatos, Odessa P. Johnson, Debbie Cole, Frederick Ruiz, Sherry L. Lansing, Debbie Shewmake, Richard C. Blum, John Hotchkis, Mark G. Yudof, Bruce D. Varner, Norman J. Pattiz, John Garamendi, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Paul D. Wachter, Eddie Island, Jack O'Connell, Judith L. Hopkinson, George M. Marcus. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 5/28/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/13/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Reply Memorandum #46 in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2009) Modified on 2/6/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Proposed Order #18 Denying UC Defendants' Motion to Strike by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2009) Modified on 2/6/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Memorandum in Opposition #78 to UC Defendants' Evidentiary Objections filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2009) Modified on 2/6/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING UC DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OUT OF TIME by Judge Alsup granting #90 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Jack O'Connell, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake, Debbie Cole re #76 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Proposed Order re #76 Memorandum in Opposition,, #90 MOTION for Leave to File UC Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Out of Time by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Jack O'Connell, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake, Debbie Cole. (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to File UC Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Out of Time filed by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Jack O'Connell, A. Paul Alivisatos, Karen Bass, Debbie Shewmake, Debbie Cole. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, John) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Proposed Order Denying #46 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Declaration of Katherine A. Yelick in Support of #76 UC Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Declaration of Henry Martinez in Support of #76 UC Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Declaration of Edward Denton in Support of #76 UC Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Declaration of Jerome O'Hearn in Support of #76 UC Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Declaration of Anne C. Broome in Support of #76 UC Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Declaration of Michael J. Bocchicchio in Support of #76 UC Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Request for Judicial Notice #76 In Support of UC Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Smith, John) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Fernandez in Support of #76 Memorandum in Opposition,, To Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #76 ) (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Declaration of Bruce B. Darling in Support of #76 Memorandum in Opposition,, To Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #76 ) (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Declaration of Ronald A. Nelson in Support of #76 Memorandum in Opposition,, To Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #76 ) (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OBJECTIONS to re #46 Memorandum in Opposition,, UC Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to, and Motion to Strike, Declarations Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/29/2009) Modified on 1/30/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Declaration of Michael J. Banda in Support of #76 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #76 ) (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Memorandum in Opposition re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UC Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Memorandum in Opposition re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byLawrence Berkeley National Laboratory, Department of Energy, Samuel W. Bodman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A-Richards 2nd Decl, #2 Exhibit Exh B-Marshall Decl, #3 Exhibit Exh C-Hitchcock Decl, #4 Exhibit Exh D-Samford Decl)(Samford, Barclay) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Statement of Nonopposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Suggestion of Mootness by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/28/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/29/2009). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/29/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Mediation/Settlement. Discovery due by 5/22/2009. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2009 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 6/25/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/28/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by DB on 1/26/09. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen re #66 Joint Case Management Statement,, (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2009 10:00 AM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Certificate of Interested Entities by Save Strawberry Canyon (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing Time. Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2009 02:30 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 1/26/09 at 3:00 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Proposed Order re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 EXHIBITS re #60 Declaration in Support, Exhibits K (Part 3 of 3) through N filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K (Part 3 of 3), #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit M, #4 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #60 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 EXHIBITS re #60 Declaration in Support, Exhibit K (Part 2 of 3) filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Exhibits #51 Declaration in Support Volume 5 of 5, Exhibit K (Part 1 of 3) filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K (Part 1 of 3))(Related document(s) #51 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009) Modified on 1/16/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 EXHIBITS re #51 Declaration in Support Volume 4 of 5 (cont'd), Exhibits D (Part 2 of 2) through J filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D (Part 2 of 2), #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #51 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Exhibits #51 Declaration in Support Volume 4 of 5 (Exhibits C and D [Part 1 of 2]) filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D (Part 1 of 2))(Related document(s) #51 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009) Modified on 1/16/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 EXHIBITS re #53 Declaration in Support, Exhibit B (Part 5 of 5) filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 EXHIBITS re #53 Declaration in Support, Exhibit B (Part 4 of 5) filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 EXHIBITS re #53 Declaration in Support, Exhibit B (Part 3 of 5) filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 EXHIBITS re #53 Declaration in Support, Exhibit B (Part 2 of 5) filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Exhibits #51 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #51 Declaration in Support Volume 3 of 5 (Exhibit B - Part 1 of 5) filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 5))(Related document(s) #46 , #51 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009) Modified on 1/16/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Exhibits #51 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #51 Declaration in Support Volume 2 of 5 (Exhibit A-1) filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1)(Related document(s) #46 , #51 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009) Modified on 1/16/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Declaration of Michael R. Lozeau in Support of #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Volume 1 of 5 (Exhibit A) filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #46 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Declaration of Janice Thomas in Support of #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Declaration of Garniss H. Curtis, Ph.D. in Support of #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Declaration of Patricia Runo in Support of #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Brief re #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed bySave Strawberry Canyon. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Save Strawberry Canyon. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lozeau, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings seeking to dismiss Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory as a party filed by Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory, Department of Energy, Samuel W. Bodman. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of Audra Richards, #2 Exhibit Minute Order in Local 73 v. Univ. of Illinois)(Whitfield, Peter) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 1/27/09 at 11:00 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Whitfield, Peter) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Whitfield, Peter) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chermak, Douglas) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Chermak, Douglas) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2008 08:00 AM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #36 #37 by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen PROOF OF SERVICE OF ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL and NOTICE OF NEED FOR ADR PHONE CONFERENCE (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 1/7/2009) Modified on 1/8/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2009 08:00 AM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen re #32 Amended Answer to Complaint,, (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. *** ORDER RE BRIEFING FOR MOTION TO DISMISS; ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009) Modified on 1/6/2009 (whalc2, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen re #29 Proposed Order,, #28 Renotice motion hearing,, #30 Proposed Order,, (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Proposed Order re #28 Renotice motion hearing,, #18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Strike by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Proposed Order re #28 Renotice motion hearing,, #18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Strike by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Renotice motion hearing for Partial Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion to Strike filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #26 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2009 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2009. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Thelton E. Henderson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/18/08. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/17/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Strike (Smith, John) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen re #17 Answer to Complaint,, (Smith, John) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Proposed Order re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Strike by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Proposed Order re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Strike by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Declaration of Dr. Steven Chu in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION to Strike filed byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Smith, John) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, MOTION to Strike filed by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Smith, John) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint byRichard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint byLawrence Berkeley National Laboratory, Department of Energy, Samuel W. Bodman. (Whitfield, Peter) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to complaint. Initial Case Management Conference is continued to 1/26/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/14/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen re #13 Proposed Order,, #12 Stipulation,, SECOND STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Smith, John) (Filed on 11/11/2008)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Proposed Order re #12 Stipulation,, GRANTING SECOND STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 11/11/2008)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION SECOND STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 11/11/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for defendants to respond to complaint. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 1/5/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/25/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen re #8 Stipulation,, PROOF OF SERVICE (Smith, John) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Proposed Order re #8 Stipulation,, [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Smith, John) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of time for U.C. Defendants to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/20/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen re #5 Stipulation,, (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for UC Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory, Steven Chu, Benjamin Allen. (Standifer, Rose) (Filed on 8/19/2008) Modified on 8/19/2008 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 10/20/2008 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2008 at 1:30 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory, Steven Chu, Department of Energy & Samuel W. Bodman. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Samuel W. Bodman & Benjamin Allen. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory & Injunctive Relief - [Summons Issued] against Richard C. Blum, William De la Pena, Russell S. Gould, Judith L. Hopkinson, John Hotchkis, Eddie Island, Odessa P. Johnson, Joanne Corday Kozberg, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica C. Lozano, George M. Marcus, Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Riess, Frederick Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul D. Wachter, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mark G. Yudof, John Garamendi, Fabian Nunez, Jack O'Connell, Eleanor V. Brewer, Philip J. Bugay, Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory, Steven Chu, Department of Energy, Samuel W. Bodman & Benjamin Allen, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 44611002428] Filed by Plaintiff Save Strawberry Canyon. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Save Strawberry Canyon v. Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Save Strawberry Canyon
Represented By: Michael Robert Lozeau
Represented By: Donald Thomas Ramsey
Represented By: Douglas Jonathan Chermak
Represented By: Richard Toshiyuki Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Peter Christopher Whitfield
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Chu
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Peter Christopher Whitfield
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Energy
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Represented By: Peter Christopher Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel W. Bodman
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Represented By: Peter Christopher Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Allen
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Blum
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William De la Pena
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell S. Gould
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith L. Hopkinson
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hotchkis
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Island
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odessa P. Johnson
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Corday Kozberg
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry L. Lansing
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica C. Lozano
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M. Marcus
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman J. Pattiz
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Riess
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Ruiz
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Tang Schilling
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D. Varner
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D. Wachter
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark G. Yudof
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Garamendi
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabian Nunez
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack O'Connell
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor V. Brewer
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip J. Bugay
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Paul Alivisatos
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Bass
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Shewmake
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Cole
Represented By: John Lynn Smith
Represented By: Rose L. Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?