Mitchell Engineering v. City and County of San Francisco et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Mitchell Engineering
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan and Alan Wong
Case Number: 3:2008cv04022
Filed: August 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2010 Filing 370 Memorandum in Opposition to 364 Defendants' Administrative Motion to Correct the Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(A) filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2010) Modified on 10/19/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER granting 360 Motion for Extension of Time to File (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 Filing 368 AMENDED JUDGMENT (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 13, 2010 Filing 367 Proposed Order re 364 MOTION to Amend/Correct ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CORRECT THE JUDGMENT UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULE 60(a) [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 13, 2010 Filing 366 Proposed Order re 364 MOTION to Amend/Correct ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CORRECT THE JUDGMENT UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULE 60(a) by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 13, 2010 Filing 365 Declaration of Ronald P. Flynn in Support of 364 MOTION to Amend/Correct ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CORRECT THE JUDGMENT UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULE 60(a) filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Related document(s) 364 ) (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 13, 2010 Filing 364 MOTION to Amend/Correct ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CORRECT THE JUDGMENT UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULE 60(a) filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 13, 2010 Filing 363 Statement of Non-Opposition re 360 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a motion for attorneys' fees and costs filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Related document(s) 360 ) (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 362 Proposed Order re 361 Declaration in Support, 360 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a motion for attorneys' fees and costs by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 361 Declaration of Michael J. Betz in Support of 360 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a motion for attorneys' fees and costs filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 360 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 360 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a motion for attorneys' fees and costs filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 359 Trial Witness Photoes. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 358 JUDGMENT: Entered in favor of plaitniff Mitchell Engineering and against defendant City and County of San Francisco and Anthony Irons. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Trial Exhibit Location (plaintiff's 5 black binders, defendants 3 white binders + 1 reference drawings) Shelf 76. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 354 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/30/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2011. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 353 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/29/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2011. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 352 Minute Entry: Jury Trial completed on 9/30/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 10/1/2010). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 351 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/29/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 10/1/2010). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 350 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/28/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 349 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/27/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 357 Jury Notes. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 356 Defendants' Trial Exhibit List by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 355 Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List by Mitchell Engineering. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 348 Clerk's trial worksheet (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 347 JURY VERDICT (IN FAVOR OF PLTF. AND AGAINST DEFT.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 346 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/28/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/29/2010). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 345 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/27/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/29/2010). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 344 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/22/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/29/2010). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 343 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/21/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/29/2010). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 342 VERDICT FORM (FINAL) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 341 VERDICT (COURT DRAFT) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 340 INSTRUCTIONS TO JURY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 339 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 329 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Plaintiff's Failure to Present Reliable, Admissible Evidence of Damages (FRCP 50), 338 Errata, Corrected Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of Defendants Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3A, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 329 , 338 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 338 ERRATA re 329 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Plaintiff's Failure to Present Reliable, Admissible Evidence of Damages (FRCP 50) Errata to Defendants Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Plaintiffs Failure to Present Reliable, Admissible Evidence of Damages (FRCP 50) by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 337 Memorandum in Opposition To Defendant's Proposed Modification To The Court's "Damages" Instruction filed byMitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER GRANTING JMOL TO 327 DEFENDANT IRONS ON THE PROCEDURAL DUE PROCESS CLAIM (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010) Modified on 9/29/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2010 Filing 335 Proposed Jury Instructions by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED MODIFICATION TO THE COURT'S PROPOSED DAMAGES INSTRUCTION. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 334 Brief re 326 Order (Supplemental Briefing Re Procedural Due Process Instruction) filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 326 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 333 Proposed Jury Instructions by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons Defendants Further Proposed Limiting Instructions. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 332 INSTRUCTIONS - DRAFT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 331 Proposed Order re 329 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Plaintiff's Failure to Present Reliable, Admissible Evidence of Damages (FRCP 50) by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 330 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 329 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Plaintiff's Failure to Present Reliable, Admissible Evidence of Damages (FRCP 50) filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 329 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 329 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Plaintiff's Failure to Present Reliable, Admissible Evidence of Damages (FRCP 50) filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 328 Declaration of Ronald P. Flynn in Support of 327 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Related to Procedural Due Process filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 327 ) (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 327 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Related to Procedural Due Process filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 326 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE INSTRUCTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 23, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 298 Clerks Notice. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 325 Transcript of Trial Proceedings held on 9/22/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 324 Transcript of Trial Proceedings held on 9/21/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 323 Transcript of Trial Proceedings held on 9/20/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 322 Transcript of Trial Proceedings held on 9/16/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 321 Transcript of Trial Proceedings held on 9/15/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 320 Transcript of Trial Proceedings held on 9/14/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 319 Transcript of Trial Proceedings held on 9/13/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 318 Transcript of Trial Proceedings held on 9/09/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 21, 2010 Filing 317 Request for Judicial Notice of San Francisco Administrative Code Section 28 filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 21, 2010 Filing 316 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 310 Brief to Defendants' Brief in Support of Admitting Arch and Gallagher Business Records into Evidence at Trial filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 310 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 21, 2010 Filing 315 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/20/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/21/2010). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2010: # 1 Errata) (tf, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2010 Filing 314 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/16/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/21/2010). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2010)
September 19, 2010 Filing 313 Declaration of Andrew Giacomini in Support of 312 Defendants' Brief Regarding Misleading Representations by Mitchell Engineering's Attorney Robert Moore and Curtis Mitchell filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2)(Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 9/19/2010) Modified on 9/20/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2010 Filing 312 Brief Re Misleading Representations by Mitchell Engineering's Attorney Robert Moore and Curtis Mitchell to Court and Jury filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 9/19/2010)
September 19, 2010 Filing 311 Declaration in Support of 310 Brief Admitting Arch and Gallagher Business Records into Evidence at Trial [FRE 803 and 902 (11)] filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Exh. A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Exh. B, # 4 Exhibit Exh. C, # 5 Exhibit Exh. D)(Related document(s) 310 ) (Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 9/19/2010)
September 19, 2010 Filing 310 Brief in Support of Admitting Arch and Gallagher Business Records into Evidence at Trial [FRE 803 and 902 (11).] filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 9/19/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 309 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/15/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/16/2010). (Court Reporter S. McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/16/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 308 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/14/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/14/2010). (Court Reporter S. McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 307 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/13/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/14/2010). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 306 Minute Entry: Jury Trial began on 9/9/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/14/2010). (Court Reporter S. McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 304 Pretrial Conference Statement by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong Defendants' 9/13/10 Supplement to Attachment D-4 to Joint Pretrial Conference Statement. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 13, 2010 Filing 303 SUPPLEMENTAL FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 302 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 9/8/10 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 301 Pretrial Conference Statement by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong Defendants' Further Supplement to Attachment D-4 to Joint Pretrial Conference Statement. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 300 Notice and Order Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 9/8/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement Conference statements due by 9/5/10 at 5:00 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/03/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 299 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Settlement (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 298 CLERKS NOTICE Jury Selection set for 9/9/2010 08:30AM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 297 Proposed Jury Instructions by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons Partial Joinder in Jury Instruction Packet filed at docket 296-1. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 296 Proposed Jury Instructions by Mitchell Engineering (Jury Instruction Packet Pursuant to Court's August 24, 2010 Order). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Betz, Michael) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 295 Declaration of Michael J. Betz in Support of 293 Brief,, (Supplemental Briefing Ordered By Court) filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) 293 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 294 Statement (Supplemental) Pursuant to Court Order) by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 293 Brief re 200 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Prohibit Defendants From Introducing Any Testimony From Witnesses They Failed to Disclose During Discovery, 191 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Testimony and Argument Re Alleged Misrepresentations in Obtaining City Contracts, 198 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Newly Produced Documents (Supplemental Briefing Pursuant to Court's August 24, 2010 Order) filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 200 , 191 , 198 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 292 Pretrial Conference Statement by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons Defendants Supplemental Deposition Designations to Attachment D-5 to Joint Pretrial Conference Statement. (Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 291 OBJECTIONS to Deposition/Anticipated Testimony of Tom Farnham, Kevin Barteaux and Daniel Helminiak by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 290 FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 289 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 288 Brief, Defendants' Supplemental Brief iso Their Motion in Limine No. 1 filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 288 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 288 Brief re 186 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude the DRB Report and all Other Evidence Relating to the Fourth Street Bridge Project Defendants' Supplemental Brief iso Their Motion In Limine No. 1 to Exclude, Inter Alia, The DRB Report filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Related document(s) 186 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 287 Pretrial Conference Statement by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong Defendants' Supplement to Attachment D-4 to Joint Pretrial Conference Statement. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM in Opposition (Supplemental) to ME's MIL's No. 6 Seeking to Exclude Testimony And Argument re Alleged Misrepresentations in Obtaining City Contracts filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Norman, David) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER allowing equipment (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
September 1, 2010 Filing 284 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/24/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 283 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong re 282 Order Requiring Attendance at Facilitated Mandatory Settlement Conference (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER requiring attendance at settlement conference (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 281 CORRECTED ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER Dismissing All Claims Against Defendants Michael Quan And Alan Wong (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 26, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 9/7/2010 08:30 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 279 Reply to 276 Opposition by Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering to Defendants' Proposed Order Dismissing All Claims Against Defendants Michael Quan and Alan Wong With Prejudice filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/26/2010) Modified on 8/27/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2010 Filing 278 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 8/26/2010). TRIAL CONTINUED TO 9/7/10 @ 8:30 A.M.(Court Reporter S. McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 277 Declaration of Michael J. Betz, Esq. in Support of 276 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Proposed Order filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 276 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 276 Memorandum in Opposition to 275 Defendants' Proposed Order filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 275 Proposed Order Dismissing All Claims Against Defendants Michael Quan And Alan Wong With Prejudice by City and County of San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 274 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong of Order Requiring Attendance at Faciliated Mandatory Settlement Conference (Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 273 Proposed Form of Verdict by Mitchell Engineering Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering's Proposed Verdict and Voir Dire Forms. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 272 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 255 Pretrial Conference Statement, Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering's Objection and Response to Defendants' "Supplement" to Joint Pre-Trial Statement Regarding Matters Appropriate for Determination by Court/Bifurcation filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 255 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 271 Proposed Form of Verdict by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons Proposed Special Verdict Form and Proposed Juror Questionnaire. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER REQUIRING ATTENDANCE AT FACILITATED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 269 Proposed Order Requiring Attendance at Facilitated Mandatory Settlement Conference by City and County of San Francisco. (Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting 180 Motion to Relate Case (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 267 Memorandum in Opposition re 213 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude All Evidence Offered by Mitchell that the City Attorneys Office Improperly Investigated Non-PUC Projects or "Traded Testimony" filed byMitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 266 Memorandum in Opposition re 211 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude All "Animus" Evidence Offered by Mitchell on the Grounds that All Such Evidence is Irrelevant to 1st or 14th Amendment Violations and Can Only Serve to Prejudice Defendants filed byMitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 265 Memorandum in Opposition re 186 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude the DRB Report and all Other Evidence Relating to the Fourth Street Bridge Project filed byMitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 264 EXHIBITS re 263 Declaration in Support,, of Opposition to Plf MIL No. 10 filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17, # 4 Exhibit 18, # 5 Exhibit 19, # 6 Exhibit 20, # 7 Exhibit 21, # 8 Exhibit 22, # 9 Exhibit 23, # 10 Exhibit 24)(Related document(s) 263 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 263 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 259 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 10 filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Related document(s) 259 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 262 Proposed Jury Instructions by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons with Plaintiff's Objections and Defendants' Responses. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 261 Memorandum in Opposition to City and County of San Francisco's Motion in Limine No. 4 filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 260 Memorandum in Opposition to City and County of San Francisco's Motion in Limine No. 11 filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 259 Memorandum in Opposition re 197 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Certain Evidence Concerning Mitchell's Termination from the Central Project filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 258 Declaration of Michael J. Betz in Support of 251 Memorandum in Opposition, 248 Memorandum in Opposition, 246 Memorandum in Opposition, 247 Memorandum in Opposition, 249 Memorandum in Opposition, 252 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D (Part 1), # 5 Exhibit D (Part 2), # 6 Exhibit D (Part 3), # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H (Part 1), # 11 Exhibit H (Part 2), # 12 Exhibit H (Part 3), # 13 Exhibit H (Part 4), # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J (Part 1), # 16 Exhibit J (Part 2), # 17 Exhibit J (Part 3), # 18 Exhibit J (Part 4), # 19 Exhibit K, # 20 Exhibit L (Part 1), # 21 Exhibit L (Part 2), # 22 Exhibit M, # 23 Exhibit N, # 24 Exhibit O, # 25 Exhibit P, # 26 Exhibit Q, # 27 Exhibit R, # 28 Exhibit S, # 29 Exhibit T, # 30 Exhibit U, # 31 Exhibit V, # 32 Exhibit W, # 33 Exhibit X, # 34 Exhibit Y, # 35 Exhibit Z, # 36 Exhibit AA, # 37 Exhibit BB, # 38 Exhibit CC, # 39 Exhibit DD, # 40 Exhibit EE, # 41 Exhibit FF, # 42 Exhibit GG, # 43 Exhibit HH, # 44 Exhibit II, # 45 Exhibit JJ)(Related document(s) 251 , 248 , 246 , 247 , 249 , 252 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 257 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 256 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 12 filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5a, # 6 Exhibit 5b, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 256 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 256 Memorandum in Opposition re 200 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Prohibit Defendants From Introducing Any Testimony From Witnesses They Failed to Disclose During Discovery filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 255 Pretrial Conference Statement by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong Defendants' Supplement to Joint Pre-Trial Statement Regarding Matters Appropriate For Determination by Court/Bifurcation. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 254 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 253 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 11 filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 253 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 253 Memorandum in Opposition re 198 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Newly Produced Documents filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 252 Memorandum in Opposition re 219 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Undisclosed Expert Testimony and Lay Opinion Testimony About Mitchell Engineering's 2004-2009 Business Plan, and to Exclude the Plan Itself filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 251 Memorandum in Opposition re 216 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Limit the Trial Testimony of Plaintiff Expert William Cheatham filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 250 Declaration of David L. Norman in Support of 244 Memorandum in Opposition, 245 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering's MIL 6 Seeking to Exclude Testimony and Argument re Alleged Misrepresentations in Obtaining City Contracts filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Part 1 of 5), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Part 2 of 5), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Part 3 of 5), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Part 4 of 5), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Part 5 of 5), # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 9 (Part 1 of 2), # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 9 (Part 2 of 2), # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 11 (Part 1 of 2), # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 11 (Part 2 of 2), # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 17 (Part 1 of 5), # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 17 (Part 2 of 5), # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 17 (Part 3 of 5), # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 17 (Part 4 of 5), # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 17 (Part 5 of 5), # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) 244 , 245 ) (Norman, David) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 249 Memorandum in Opposition re 209 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Opinions of James W. Howard filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 248 Memorandum in Opposition re 206 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Lay Opinion Testimony of Curtis Mitchell and Mike Silva filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 247 Memorandum in Opposition re 199 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Testimony by Terry Lloyd on Causation and Amount of Damages filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 246 Memorandum in Opposition re 193 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Plaintiff From Asserting That Any Act(s) or Omission(s) Prior to August 22, 2006 Were Wrongful MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Plaintiff From Asserting That Any Act(s) or Omission(s) Prior to August 22, 2006 Were Wrongful filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 245 Declaration of David L. Norman in Support of 244 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Finbarr Jewell in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering's MIL 6 Seeking to Exclude Testimony and Argument re Alleged Misrepresentations in Obtaining City Contracts filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) 244 ) (Norman, David) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 244 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering's MIL 6 Seeking to Exclude Testimony and Argument re Alleged Misrepresentations in Obtaining City Contracts filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Norman, David) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 243 Declaration of David L. Norman in Support of 242 Memorandum in Opposition to Mitchell Engineering's MIL No. 4 to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Hugh Vassar filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 242 ) (Norman, David) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 242 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Mitchell Engineering's MIL No. 4 to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Hugh Vassar filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Norman, David) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 241 Declaration of David L. Norman in Support of 240 Objection to Mitchell's MIL No. 3 to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Kevin Berry filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Part 1 of 3, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Part 2 of 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Part 3 of 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 240 ) (Norman, David) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 240 OBJECTIONS to Mitchell's MIL No. 3 to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Kevin Berry by City and County of San Francisco. (Norman, David) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 239 Declaration of Ronald P. Flynn in Support of 238 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 238 ) (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 238 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Mitchell Engineering's Motion in Limine No. 9 to Exclude any Evidence Concerning Mitchell's Failure to Seek Prequalification or Appeal Prequalification Determination filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 237 Declaration of Ronald P. Flynn in Support of 236 Memorandum in Opposition filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 236 ) (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 236 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Mitchell Engineering's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Alan Johanson filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 235 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 234 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 8 filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Supplement 8)(Related document(s) 234 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 234 Memorandum in Opposition re 194 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Wesley Nutten and Howard Silverstone That is Cumulative and/Or Not Timely Disclosed filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 233 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 232 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 7 filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 232 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 232 Memorandum in Opposition re 192 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Wesley L. Nutten and Howard Silverstone filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 231 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 230 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 230 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 230 Memorandum in Opposition re 189 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Exclude Expert Testimony of Patrick Collins filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 229 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 228 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 228 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 228 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 184 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Non-Retained Experts filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Related document(s) 184 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 227 Letter from David L. Norman to the Hon. Susan Illston. (Norman, David) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 226 ERRATA re 223 Pretrial Conference Statement,, Errata to Defendants' Attachment D-6 to Joint Pretrial Conference Statement by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 225 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mitchell Engineering re 224 Memorandum in Opposition Regarding City and County's Administrative Motion to Relate Cases (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 224 Memorandum in Opposition re 180 MOTION to Relate Case City and County of San Francisco's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 223 Pretrial Conference Statement by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong Joint Pretrial Conference Statement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-1, # 2 Exhibit D-2, # 3 Exhibit D-3, # 4 Exhibit D-4, # 5 Exhibit D-5, # 6 Exhibit P-1, # 7 Exhibit P-2 and P-3, # 8 Exhibit P-4, # 9 Exhibit P-5A, # 10 Exhibit P-5B, # 11 Exhibit P-5C, # 12 Exhibit P-5D, # 13 Exhibit P-5E, # 14 Exhibit P-5F, # 15 Exhibit P-5G, # 16 Exhibit D-6)(Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 222 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson iso Motion in Limine No. 11 filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 221 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 221 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude the Admission of Any Evidence or Any Reference to: 1) the Alleged Emotional Toll, Morale and Impact of Litigation on Mitchell; and 2) Curt Mitchell's Family Background or History in the Construction Business filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 220 Declaration of Ronald Flynn in Support of 219 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Undisclosed Expert Testimony and Lay Opinion Testimony About Mitchell Engineering's 2004-2009 Business Plan, and to Exclude the Plan Itself filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 219 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 219 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Undisclosed Expert Testimony and Lay Opinion Testimony About Mitchell Engineering's 2004-2009 Business Plan, and to Exclude the Plan Itself filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 218 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 216 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Limit the Trial Testimony of Plaintiff Expert William Cheatham filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 216 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 217 Proposed Jury Instructions by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 216 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Limit the Trial Testimony of Plaintiff Expert William Cheatham filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 215 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 209 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Opinions of James W. Howard filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) 209 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 214 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 213 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude All Evidence Offered by Mitchell that the City Attorneys Office Improperly Investigated Non-PUC Projects or "Traded Testimony" filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 213 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 213 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude All Evidence Offered by Mitchell that the City Attorneys Office Improperly Investigated Non-PUC Projects or "Traded Testimony" filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 212 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 211 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude All "Animus" Evidence Offered by Mitchell on the Grounds that All Such Evidence is Irrelevant to 1st or 14th Amendment Violations and Can Only Serve to Prejudice Defendants filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 211 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 211 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude All "Animus" Evidence Offered by Mitchell on the Grounds that All Such Evidence is Irrelevant to 1st or 14th Amendment Violations and Can Only Serve to Prejudice Defendants filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 210 DECLARATION of Ronald P Flynn Is Support of Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed Separate Jury Instructions filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 209 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Opinions of James W. Howard filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 208 Proposed Jury Instructions by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Mitchell Engineering (Proposed Joint Jury Instructions). (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 207 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 206 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Lay Opinion Testimony of Curtis Mitchell and Mike Silva filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 206 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 206 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Lay Opinion Testimony of Curtis Mitchell and Mike Silva filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 205 Declaration of Michael J. Betz in Support of 185 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Alan Johanson, 192 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Wesley L. Nutten and Howard Silverstone, 191 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Testimony and Argument Re Alleged Misrepresentations in Obtaining City Contracts, 198 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Newly Produced Documents, 197 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Certain Evidence Concerning Mitchell's Termination from the Central Project, 188 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Hugh Vassar, 189 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Exclude Expert Testimony of Patrick Collins, 200 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Prohibit Defendants From Introducing Any Testimony From Witnesses They Failed to Disclose During Discovery, 184 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Non-Retained Experts, 194 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Wesley Nutten and Howard Silverstone That is Cumulative and/Or Not Timely Disclosed, 187 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Kevin Barry, 195 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Any Evidence Concerning Mitchell's Failure to Seek Prequalification or Appeal Prequalification Determination filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D (Part 1), # 5 Exhibit D (Part 2), # 6 Exhibit D (Part 3), # 7 Exhibit D (Part 4), # 8 Exhibit D (Part 5), # 9 Exhibit D (Part 6), # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Exhibit K (Part 1), # 17 Exhibit K (Part 2), # 18 Exhibit K (Part 3), # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Exhibit M, # 21 Exhibit N, # 22 Exhibit O, # 23 Exhibit P (Part 1), # 24 Exhibit P (Part 2), # 25 Exhibit Q, # 26 Exhibit R, # 27 Exhibit S, # 28 Exhibit T, # 29 Exhibit U (Part 1), # 30 Exhibit U (Part 2), # 31 Exhibit U (Part 3), # 32 Exhibit V, # 33 Exhibit W (Part 1), # 34 Exhibit W (Part 2), # 35 Exhibit W (Part 3), # 36 Exhibit W (Part 4), # 37 Exhibit X)(Related document(s) 185 , 192 , 191 , 198 , 197 , 188 , 189 , 200 , 184 , 194 , 187 , 195 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 204 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson iso Motion in Limine No. 4 filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) 202 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 203 Proposed Jury Instructions by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong with Plaintiff's Objections. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 202 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude: 1) References to Speech Unknown to Anyone at the PUC; 2) References to Speech that was a Matter of Private Versus Public Concern; and 3) "Evidence" iso Any Argument that the PUC's Conduct Prior to the Earliest Identified Speech was Wrongful filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 201 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 199 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Testimony by Terry Lloyd on Causation and Amount of Damages filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 199 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 200 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Prohibit Defendants From Introducing Any Testimony From Witnesses They Failed to Disclose During Discovery filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 199 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Testimony by Terry Lloyd on Causation and Amount of Damages filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 198 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Newly Produced Documents filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 197 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Certain Evidence Concerning Mitchell's Termination from the Central Project filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 196 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 193 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Plaintiff From Asserting That Any Act(s) or Omission(s) Prior to August 22, 2006 Were Wrongful MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Plaintiff From Asserting That Any Act(s) or Omission(s) Prior to August 22, 2006 Were Wrongful filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 193 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 195 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Any Evidence Concerning Mitchell's Failure to Seek Prequalification or Appeal Prequalification Determination filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 194 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Wesley Nutten and Howard Silverstone That is Cumulative and/Or Not Timely Disclosed filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 193 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Plaintiff From Asserting That Any Act(s) or Omission(s) Prior to August 22, 2006 Were Wrongful filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 192 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Wesley L. Nutten and Howard Silverstone filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 191 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Testimony and Argument Re Alleged Misrepresentations in Obtaining City Contracts filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 190 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 186 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude the DRB Report and all Other Evidence Relating to the Fourth Street Bridge Project filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 186 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 189 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Exclude Expert Testimony of Patrick Collins filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 188 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Hugh Vassar filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 187 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Kevin Barry filed by Mitchell Engineering. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 186 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude the DRB Report and all Other Evidence Relating to the Fourth Street Bridge Project filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 185 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Alan Johanson filed by Mitchell Engineering. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 184 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Non-Retained Experts filed by Mitchell Engineering. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of San Francisco re 180 MOTION to Relate Case City and County of San Francisco's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related (Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 182 Proposed Order re 180 MOTION to Relate Case City and County of San Francisco's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by City and County of San Francisco. (Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 181 Declaration of Miles C. Holden in Support of 180 MOTION to Relate Case City and County of San Francisco's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) 180 ) (Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 180 MOTION to Relate Case City and County of San Francisco's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Giacomini, Andrew) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL re 174 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 19, 2010 Filing 178 DECLARATION of Matthew Schultz in Support of 174 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Letter Brief - Motion to Compel Production of Financial Information, Emails, and Deponents by Matthew R. Schultz filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G - Q, # 5 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 174 ) (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 7/19/2010) Modified on 7/20/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2010 Filing 177 Memorandum in Opposition re 174 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Letter Brief - Motion to Compel Production of Financial Information, Emails, and Deponents filed byMitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 126 , 130 , 131 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 175 Declaration of Miles C. Holden in Support of 174 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Letter Brief - Motion to Compel Production of Financial Information, Emails, and Deponents filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 174 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 174 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Letter Brief - Motion to Compel Production of Financial Information, Emails, and Deponents filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 169 Motion for leave to file Sur-Reply (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 172 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 7/7/2010). (Court Reporter Columbini.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2010 03:30 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 171 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/2/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 7/7/2010). Pretrial continued to 8/24/10Expert discovery cutoff extended to 7/29/10 () (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2010)
June 30, 2010 Filing 170 Proposed Order re 169 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re 161 Reply Memorandum, 163 Reply Memorandum, 162 Reply Memorandum, MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re 161 Reply Memorandum, 163 Reply Memorandum, 162 Reply Memorandum, by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 Filing 169 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re 161 Reply Memorandum, 163 Reply Memorandum, 162 Reply Memorandum, filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 168 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 167 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 166 OBJECTIONS to Defendants Michael Quan's and Alan Wong's Objections to Mitchell Engineering's Opposition to Their Respective Motions for Summary Judgment or, Altternatively, Partial Summary Judgment and Objections to Mitchell Engineering's Motion to Dismiss by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 165 OBJECTIONS to Defendants City and County of San Francisco's and Anthony Irons' Objections to Evidence Offered in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 164 Declaration of Andrew G. Giacomini in Support of 163 Reply in support of 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Anthony Irons' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and in support of Michael Quan's and Alan Wong's Motions for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 130 , 131 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 6/25/2010) Modified on 6/28/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2010 Filing 163 Reply Memorandum Defendants Michael Quan's and Alan Wong's Reply Memo of P&A's iso 130 Their Motions for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 6/25/2010) Modified on 6/28/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2010 Filing 162 Reply Memorandum re 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Anthony Irons' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 161 Reply Memorandum re 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 18, 2010 Filing 160 OBJECTIONS to re 147 Declaration in Support,, (Objections To Evidence) by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 18, 2010 Filing 159 Declaration of Nicholas A. Subias in Support of 158 Reply filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 158 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 158 Reply in support of 126 motion for partial summary judgment filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 Filing 157 EXHIBITS DD and HH (CD-ROM) to 149 Declaration of Michael J. Betz in Support, filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 149 ) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 156 ERRATA re 149 Declaration in Support,, by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 155 NOTICE by Mitchell Engineering re 149 Declaration in Support,, (Notice of Manual filing of CD's Containing Exhibits DD and HH to the Declaration of Michael J. Betz) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 154 OBJECTIONS to re 151 Memorandum in Opposition, 148 Memorandum in Opposition, 152 Memorandum in Opposition, (Objections to Defendants' Evidence) by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 153 Declaration of Michael J. Betz in Support of 152 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 152 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 152 Memorandum in Opposition re 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Alan Wong's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Michael Quan's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 151 Memorandum in Opposition re 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Anthony Irons' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 150 Declaration of Curtis Mitchell in Support of 148 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 148 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 149 Declaration in Support of 148 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E, # 2 Exhibit F - M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O - U, # 5 Exhibit V (Part 1), # 6 Exhibit V (Part 2), # 7 Exhibit V (Part 3), # 8 Exhibit V (Part 4), # 9 Exhibit V (Part 5), # 10 Exhibit V (Part 6), # 11 Exhibit V (Part 7), # 12 Exhibit V (Part 8), # 13 Exhibit V (Part 9), # 14 Exhibit V (Part 10), # 15 Exhibit V (Part 11), # 16 Exhibit W - AA, # 17 Exhibit BB - FF, # 18 Exhibit GG - PP)(Related document(s) 148 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 148 Memorandum in Opposition re 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 147 Declaration in Support of 145 Memorandum in Opposition,, Declaration of Johnson iso Defts Opposition to Plf Motion for Parital SJ; Request for Judicial Notice filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 145 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 146 OBJECTIONS to re 145 Memorandum in Opposition,, Defts City and County of San Francisco and Anthony Irons Objections to Evidence Offered iso Plf Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 145 Memorandum in Opposition re 126 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the City and Country of San Francisco's and Anthony Irons' Liability for Violating the Federal Civil Rights Act 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 Defendants City and County of San Francisco's and Anthony Irons Memo of P&A's in Opposition to Plaintiff MItchell Engineering's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 144 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING Further Settlement Conference set before Judge Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 25, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 8/30/2010 08:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2010 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2010 03:30 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER changing trial schedule (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 142 STIPULATION re 141 Letter Regarding Pretrial Deadlines and Trial Date (And Proposed Order) by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Mitchell Engineering, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 141 Letter from Robert R. Moore and S. Anne Johnson Regarding Pretrial Deadlines and Trial Date. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL [Docket No. 114]. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 139 Appendix re 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Alan Wong's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Michael Quan's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Anthony Irons' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 132 , 133 , 130 , 131 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 138 Request for Judicial Notice re 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Alan Wong's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Michael Quan's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Anthony Irons' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 132 , 133 , 130 , 131 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 137 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Michael Quan's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Alan Wong's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Anthony Irons' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22)(Related document(s) 133 , 130 , 132 , 131 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 136 Declaration of Alan Johanson in Support of 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Michael Quan's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Alan Wong's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Anthony Irons' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 133 , 130 , 132 , 131 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 135 Declaration of Alan Wong in Support of 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Alan Wong's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Michael Quan's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Anthony Irons' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Related document(s) 132 , 133 , 130 , 131 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 134 Declaration of Ivy Fine in Support of 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Alan Wong's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Michael Quan's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Anthony Irons' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Related document(s) 132 , 133 , 130 , 131 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Michael Quan's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Michael Quan. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 5/14/2010) Modified on 5/17/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2010 Filing 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Alan Wong's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 5/14/2010) Modified on 5/17/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2010 Filing 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Anthony Irons' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Anthony Irons. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 5/14/2010) Modified on 5/17/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2010 Filing 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by City and County of San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 5/14/2010) Modified on 5/17/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2010 Filing 129 Declaration of Michael J. Betz in Support of 127 Brief, 126 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the City and Country of San Francisco's and Anthony Irons' Liability for Violating the Federal Civil Rights Act 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E, # 2 Exhibit F - M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O - U, # 5 Exhibit V (Part 1), # 6 Exhibit V (Part 2), # 7 Exhibit V (Part 3), # 8 Exhibit V (Part 4), # 9 Exhibit V (Part 5), # 10 Exhibit V (Part 6), # 11 Exhibit V (Part 7), # 12 Exhibit V (Part 8), # 13 Exhibit V (Part 9), # 14 Exhibit V (Part 10), # 15 Exhibit V (Part 11), # 16 Exhibit W - AA, # 17 Exhibit BB)(Related document(s) 127 , 126 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 128 Declaration of James Alex Clark in Support of 127 Brief, 126 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the City and Country of San Francisco's and Anthony Irons' Liability for Violating the Federal Civil Rights Act 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 127 , 126 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 127 Brief re 126 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the City and Country of San Francisco's and Anthony Irons' Liability for Violating the Federal Civil Rights Act 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 126 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 126 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the City and Country of San Francisco's and Anthony Irons' Liability for Violating the Federal Civil Rights Act 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 filed by Mitchell Engineering. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 125 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Defendants Michael Quan and Alan Wong) by Mitchell Engineering (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 10, 2010 Filing 124 NOTICE OF FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 5/28/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/10/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 111 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 121 Declaration of Michael J. Betz in Support of 120 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' April 19, 2010, Letter Brief filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 120 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 120 Memorandum in Opposition to April 19, 2010 Letter Brief filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 119 Declaration of S. Anne Johnson in Support of 118 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plf's Motion to Compel filed April 16, 2010 {Doc 111} filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Johnson Decl, # 2 Exhibit B to Johnson Decl, # 3 Exhibit C to Johnson Decl, # 4 Exhibit D to Johnson Decl, # 5 Exhibit E to Johnson Decl)(Related document(s) 118 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 118 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' letter brief in Opposition to 111 PLaintiff's Motion to Compel filed on April 16, 2010 [Doc No. 111] filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 4/23/2010) Modified on 4/26/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2010 Filing 117 DECLARATION of Matthew R. Schultz in Opposition to 108 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order re Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Electronic Documents filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 108 ) (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 20, 2010 Filing 116 Memorandum in Opposition re 108 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order re Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Electronic Documents filed byMitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 115 Declaration of Ronald P. Flynn in Support of 114 Letter Brief filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 114 ) (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 114 Letter Brief filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 113 Proposed Order Granting Motion by Mitchell Engineering to Compel the Production of Documents by Mitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 112 Declaration of Matthew R. Schultz in Support of Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering's Letter Brief to Compel Depositions and Documents filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D (1 of 3), # 3 Exhibit D (2 of 3), # 4 Exhibit D (3 of 3), # 5 Exhibit E (1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit E (2 of 2), # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H-I, # 10 Exhibit J-N, # 11 Exhibit O (1 of 2), # 12 Exhibit O (2 of 2), # 13 Exhibit P-R, # 14 Exhibit S-T, # 15 Exhibit U)(Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 111 Letter Brief filed byMitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 110 Proposed Order re 108 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order re Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Electronic Documents by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 109 Declaration in Support of 108 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order re Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Electronic Documents , and Motion for Reconsideration of Order re Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Electronic Documents filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 108 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order re Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Electronic Documents filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Defts [Proposed] Ntc of and Motion for Reconsideration)(Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 106 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion To Compel by Mitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 105 EXHIBITS re 101 Declaration in Opposition, D - J filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 101 ) (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 104 EXHIBITS re 101 Declaration in Opposition, Ex C Part 2 filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 101 ) (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 103 EXHIBITS re 101 Declaration in Opposition, C part 1 filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 101 ) (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 102 EXHIBITS re 101 Declaration in Opposition, A-B filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 101 ) (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Matthew R. Schultz in support of 100 Opposition to 98 MOTION to Compel Production of Email and other Electronic Documents from Plaintiff, 99 Declaration in Support, filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 98 , 99 ) (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/7/2010) Modified on 4/8/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2010 Filing 100 Memorandum in Opposition re 98 MOTION to Compel Production of Email and other Electronic Documents from Plaintiff filed byMitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
March 31, 2010 Filing 99 Declaration in Support of 98 MOTION to Compel Production of Email and other Electronic Documents from Plaintiff filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 98 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 31, 2010 Filing 98 MOTION to Compel Production of Email and other Electronic Documents from Plaintiff filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER re 92 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 24, 2010 Filing 96 Answer to Amended Complaint DEFENDANT ANTHONY IRONS' ANSWER TO 31 PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL byAnthony Irons. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 3/24/2010) Modified on 3/25/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2010 Filing 95 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/12/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 3/18/2010). Case continued to 6/18/10 @ 3 pm () (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/18/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 94 Memorandum in Opposition re 92 First MOTION for Protective Order Against Defendant's Subpoena To Moss-Adams filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 10, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2010 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 93 Declaration of Matthew R. Schultz in Support of 92 First MOTION for Protective Order Against Defendant's Subpoena To Moss-Adams filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 92 ) (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 92 First MOTION for Protective Order Against Defendant's Subpoena To Moss-Adams filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 83 Motion to modify pretrial deadlines (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO COMPEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS re 68 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 8, 2010 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Matthew R. Schultz In Support Of 87 Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Compel filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2010) Modified on 3/9/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2010 Filing 87 Memorandum in Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Compel filed byMitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 86 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mitchell Engineering and filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 1, 2010 Filing 85 Letter Brief re 80 Letter CCSF Opposition Letter Brief re Discovery filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 80 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 84 Reply Memorandum re 68 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 83 MOTION Approval of Stipulation and entry of Order re 39 Case Management Conference - Initial,,, Motion for Administrative Relief re Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Modifying Pretrial Deadlines filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stip and proposed Order Modifying Pretrial Deadlines, # 2 Exhibit Email 2-4-10)(Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 82 Declaration of Matthew R. Schultz in Support of 80 Letter filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 80 ) (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 81 Proposed Order re 80 Letter by Mitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 80 Letter from Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering re Motion to Compel. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 79 Memorandum in Opposition re 68 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL [Docket Nos. 52, 58] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Filing 77 Proposed Order re 52 MOTION to Compel (Amended) by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 22, 2010 Filing 75 Declaration of Matthew R. Schultz in Support of 73 Reply Memorandum, 74 Reply Memorandum filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 73 , 74 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 22, 2010 Filing 74 Reply Memorandum In Support of 58 Motion by Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified on 1/26/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2010 Filing 73 Reply Memorandum re 58 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Production of Documents filed byMitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 20, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 68 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2010 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2010 03:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 72 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2010 09:00 AM. continuing cmc to 3/12/10 @ 3 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 71 Proposed Order re 68 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho [proposed] Order Granting Defendant City and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan and Alan Wong's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 70 Proposed Order re 68 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho [proposed] Order Granting Defendnat Anthony Irons' Motion to Dismiss by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 69 Request for Judicial Notice re 68 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Autho filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 68 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Motion to Dismiss Under 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Anthony Irons; and (2) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under 12(c) by Defendants CCSF, Michael Quan, and Alan Wong; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 67 Request for Judicial Notice re 58 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Production of Documents filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 58 ) (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 66 Declaration of Ronald P. Flynn re 52 MOTION to Compel, 58 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Production of Documents Declaration of Ronald P. Flynn in support of Deft CCSF Opposition to Plf Mitchell Engineering's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories and Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2010 Filing 65 Declaration of Ivy Fine in support re 52 MOTION to Compel, 58 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Production of Documents Declaration of Ivy Fine in support of Deft CCSF Opposition to Plf Mitchell Engineering's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories and Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2010 Filing 64 Declaration of George M. Cothram in support re 52 MOTION to Compel, 58 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Production of Documents Declaration of George M. Cothran in suport of Deft CCSF Opposition to Plf Mitchell Engineerng's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories and Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2010 Filing 63 Memorandum in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Production of Documents Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 62 Memorandum in Opposition re 52 MOTION to Compel Defendant CCSF Opposition to Plaintiff MItchell Engineering's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Johnson, Sally) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 8, 2010 Filing 76 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held with Judge Laporte on 1/8/2010. Case did not settle. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2010)
January 4, 2010 Filing 61 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by City and County of San Francisco. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 16, 2009 Filing 60 Declaration of Matthew R. Shultz, Esq. in Support of 58 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Production of Documents, 59 Brief filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Related document(s) 58 , 59 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 59 Brief re 58 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Production of Documents filed byMitchell Engineering. (Related document(s) 58 ) (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 58 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Production of Documents filed by Mitchell Engineering. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER continuing cmc to 2/5/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 10, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 52 MOTION to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 10, 2009 Filing 56 NOTICE by Mitchell Engineering [Notice of Manual Filing Regarding Exhibit X to the Declaration of Matthew R. Schultz in Support of Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories] (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 10, 2009 Filing 55 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 09:00 AM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 9, 2009 Filing 54 Declaration of Matthew R. Schultz in Support of 52 Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories filed byMitchell Engineering. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D-E, # 3 Exhibit F-S, # 4 Exhibit T-Z, # 5 Exhibit AA-DD)(Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 12/9/2009) Modified on 12/10/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2009 Filing 53 Proposed Order Granting Motion By Mitchell Engineering to Compel The Production of Documents and Responses To Interrogatories by Mitchell Engineering. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 9, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE of Motion to Compel by Mitchell Engineering [Notice of Motion and Motion by Mitchell Engineering to Compel The Production of Documents, Responses to and Interrogatories, and the Deposition of a 30(b)(6) Representative (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 12/9/2009) Modified on 12/10/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2009 Filing 51 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of 52 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses filed by Mitchell Engineering. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 12/9/2009) Modified on 12/10/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2009 Filing 50 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gilbert Whitney Leigh (Leigh, Gilbert) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 7, 2009 Filing 49 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Mitchell Engineering. (Betz, Michael) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTIING Further Settlement Conference for 1/8/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/20/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 47 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held with Judge Laporte on 11/19/2009. Case did not settle. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2009)
October 13, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE by Mitchell Engineering [Association of Counsel] (Leigh, Gilbert) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 11/19/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/31/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 18, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2009 03:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 Filing 44 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/14/2009 before Illston (Date Filed: 8/18/2009). case continued to 12/18/09 @ 3 p.m. () (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2009) Modified on 8/19/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 10, 2009 Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FURTHER JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
July 15, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Gilbert Whitney Leigh (Leigh, Gilbert) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/28/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 14, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 5/14/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2009 03:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 8/2/2010 08:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2010 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2010 03:30 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/13/09. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 39 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/11/2009 before Illston (Date Filed: 5/14/2009). Case continued to 8/14/09 @ 3:00 p.m.. for Further Case Management ConferenceCase continued to 6/18/10 @ 9:00 a.m. for Motions(Motion due 5/14/10, Opposition 5/28/10 Reply 6/4/10)Case continued to 7/20/10 @ 3:30 p.m. for Pretrial ConferenceCase continued to 8/2/10 @ 8:30 a.m. for Trial (JURY: Days)Discovery Cutoff: 2/26/10 Designate Experts by: 3/8/10, Rebuttal Experts:3/31/10, Expert Discovery Cutoff: 4/30/10ORDERED AFTER HEARING: An ADR procedure shall be designated at the next case management conference.Counsel shall submit an agreed upon protective order within a week, otherwise the Court will enter the standard version on the Courts website. () (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 38 AMENDED CLERKS NOTICE (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 29, 2009 Filing 37 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2009 02:30 PM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
March 23, 2009 Filing 36 Answer to Amended Complaint Answer to 31 2nd Amended Complaint for Damanges; Demand for Jury Trial byCity and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/23/2009) Modified on 3/24/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2009 Filing 35 Judge Illston's response to question re: stay on discovery (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 34 Letter from Kathleen S. Morris. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 33 Letter from Mitchell re discovery dispute. (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 32 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2009 02:30 PM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 9, 2009 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT , Second, against all defendants. Filed byMitchell Engineering. (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended complaint is due 3/9/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 20, 2009 Filing 29 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 20, 2009 Filing 28 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2009 02:30 PM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 20, 2009 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2009 02:30 PM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 13, 2009 Filing 26 Reply Memorandum re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND MICHAEL QUAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ALAN WONG'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 25 Memorandum in Opposition To 17 , 19 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byMitchell Engineering. (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 2/6/2009) Modified on 2/9/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2009 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mitchell Engineering (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, First Amended Complaint, Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering, Case Management Conferene Order, Plaintiff Mitchell Engineering's Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interest Entities or Persons, Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Continuance of the Case Management Conference, Reassignment Order served on Substituted Serve with Angela Chan on 12/29/2008, filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mitchell Engineering by Mail to Alan Wong (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mitchell Engineering Substitute Service on Angela Chan (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 16, 2009 Filing 20 Proposed Order re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ALAN WONG'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by City and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 16, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ALAN WONG'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by City and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan, Alan Wong. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 8, 2009 Filing 18 Proposed Order re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND MICHAEL QUAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by City and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 8, 2009 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND MICHAEL QUAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by City and County of San Francisco, Michael Quan. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 6, 2009 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mitchell Engineering re 10 Amended Complaint, (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 6, 2009 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mitchell Engineering re 10 Amended Complaint, (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 6, 2009 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mitchell Engineering re 10 Amended Complaint, (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 16, 2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2009 02:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 11 Ex Parte Application to continue cmc to 2/27/09 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 12 Proposed Order to Continue CMC by Mitchell Engineering. (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 11 Ex Parte Application for a Continuance of the CMC filed by Mitchell Engineering. (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) VIOLATION OF FEDERAL CIVIL RIGHTS ACT [42 U.S.C. SECTION 1983]; 2) INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONSHIPS; 3) INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH PROSPECTIVE ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE; 4) NEGLIGENT INTERFERENCE WITH PROSPECTIVE ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE; AND 5) CONSPIRACY DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against all defendants. Filed byMitchell Engineering. (Bannon, Alexander) (Filed on 12/9/2008) Modified on 12/10/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting substitution. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/5/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 8 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Damon M. Fisk (Fisk, Damon) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
September 26, 2008 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2008 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/16/08. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 16, 2008 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Mitchell Engineering. (Fisk, Damon) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 22, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2008. Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2008 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mitchell Engineering identifying Other Affiliate Curt Mitchell, Other Affiliate Michael Silva for Mitchell Engineering. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; summons issued against City and County of San Francisco, Anthony Irons, Michael Quan, Alan Wong (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611022684). Filed by Mitchell Engineering. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008) (ys, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell Engineering v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Engineering
Represented By: Richard L. Seabolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Irons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Quan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?