Jefferson v. Kellogg USA, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Latosha Jefferson
Defendant: Kellogg USA, Inc, Keebler, Jim Hess and Tim Rodriguez
Case Number: 3:2008cv04132
Filed: August 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice as to all defendants. Party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs of suit. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/28/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER continuing cmc to 5/15/09 @ 2:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/25/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant's Answer to the complaint is due no later than 11/21/08. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER dismissing and substituting defendants. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/28/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. Kellogg USA, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latosha Jefferson
Represented By: Kay E. Tuazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg USA, Inc
Represented By: Sara Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keebler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Rodriguez
Represented By: Sara Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?