United States of America v. Caraway et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Douglas R. Caraway, Fremont Bank, State of California Franchise Tax Board, State of California Employment Development Department, San Joaquin County District Attorney's Office, Family Support Division, Chester J. Gilbert, Collectronics, Inc., John Eggli, Collection Bureau of California, Amanda Hummel, Fred Hummel, Stephen Caraway, Florence Linor Rege and C. Thomas Biscardi
Case Number: 3:2008cv04371
Filed: September 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1340 IRS: Custom Duties
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER DETERMINING MERITS OF ALL CLAIMS TO AND LIENS UPON SUBJECT PROPERTY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/22/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Duty Judge Jon S. Tigar for Maxine M. Chesney on 03/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' MOTION TO SERVE ESTATE BY PUBLICATION; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Notice shall be published in an approved newspaper for Washoe County and San Mateo County and shall appear in those newspapers not less than once per week for a period of not less than six consecutive weeks, the first such publication appearing no later than one week from the date of entry of this Order. The United States shall file with the Court a certification of publication upon completi on of such publication. The Estate of Lorraine Caraway and/or any heir, devisee, legatee, or any person or entity claiming an interest through the Estate of Lorraine Caraway shall appear or plead in this matter no later than eight weeks form the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/1/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER SETTING ASIDE JUDGMENT; DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF RE SERVICE ON NEW DEFENDANTS. The United States shall file a first amended complaint no later than September 30, 2016. The United Stat es shall serve Patrick R. Giles no later than October 7, 2016, and file proof thereof within seven days of effectuating service. No later than October 7, 2016, the United States shall either serve the Estate of Lorraine Caraway and file proof thereof within seven days of effectuating service, or, in the alternative, file a request for service by publication. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/23/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 THIRD AMENDED JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF SALE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER RE: LETTER FROM DEFENDANT DOUGLAS CARAWAY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 17, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF SALE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 29, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. The Court construes Caraway's letter, filed March 2, 2016, as a motion for relief from judgment pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. So construed, the motion is denied, as it fails to state a cognizable ground for such relief. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 8, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 133 Request for extension of time filed by Douglas R. Caraway. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/24/2013. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 19, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT CARAWAY'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 27, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER VACATING HEARING. The hearing on the motion to wtihdraw, presently scheduled for April 6, 2012, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 30, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER CONDITIONALLY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 8, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL TO SERVE MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Sun Joo Chung is directed to serve, upon Douglas R. Caraway, the motion, such service to be made by mail with proof of service filed with the Court. If service is not accomplishe d and proof thereof filed at least 35 days before March 23, 2012, counsel is further directed to renotice the motion in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of this district. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 16, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AMENDED JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF SALE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 JUDGMENT ESTABLISHING PRIORITY OF LIENS OF FREMONT BANK'S DEEDS OF TRUST. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 16, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Court deems the matters submitted on the moving papers and vacates the hearings scheduled for November 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 8, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference is continued from December 17, 2010 to January 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/14/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Good cause appearing, the Case Management Conference is hereby CONTINUED from October 15, 2010 to December 17, 2010. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than December 10, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/13/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 18, 2010 to August 6, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 9, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from May 14, 2010 to June 18, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 6, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 15, 2010 to May 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The October 9, 2009 Case Management Conference is continued to January 15, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to October 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 1, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to July 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to April 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to February 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 5, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Caraway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David L. Denier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R. Caraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Employment Development Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin County District Attorney's Office, Family Support Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester J. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collectronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Eggli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collection Bureau of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Caraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence Linor Rege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Thomas Biscardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?