May 22, 2017 |
Filing
264
ORDER DETERMINING MERITS OF ALL CLAIMS TO AND LIENS UPON SUBJECT PROPERTY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/22/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
|
March 27, 2017 |
Filing
235
CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Duty Judge Jon S. Tigar for Maxine M. Chesney on 03/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
|
November 1, 2016 |
Filing
211
ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' MOTION TO SERVE ESTATE BY PUBLICATION; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Notice shall be published in an approved newspaper for Washoe County and San Mateo County and shall appear in those newspapers not less than once per week for a period of not less than six consecutive weeks, the first such publication appearing no later than one week from the date of entry of this Order. The United States shall file with the Court a certification of publication upon completi on of such publication. The Estate of Lorraine Caraway and/or any heir, devisee, legatee, or any person or entity claiming an interest through the Estate of Lorraine Caraway shall appear or plead in this matter no later than eight weeks form the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/1/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
|
September 23, 2016 |
Filing
191
ORDER SETTING ASIDE JUDGMENT; DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF RE SERVICE ON NEW DEFENDANTS. The United States shall file a first amended complaint no later than September 30, 2016. The United Stat es shall serve Patrick R. Giles no later than October 7, 2016, and file proof thereof within seven days of effectuating service. No later than October 7, 2016, the United States shall either serve the Estate of Lorraine Caraway and file proof thereof within seven days of effectuating service, or, in the alternative, file a request for service by publication. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/23/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
|
July 28, 2016 |
Filing
174
THIRD AMENDED JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF SALE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing
171
ORDER RE: LETTER FROM DEFENDANT DOUGLAS CARAWAY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 17, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing
169
SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF SALE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 29, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
|
March 8, 2016 |
Filing
162
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. The Court construes Caraway's letter, filed March 2, 2016, as a motion for relief from judgment pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. So construed, the motion is denied, as it fails to state a cognizable ground for such relief. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 8, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
|
February 10, 2016 |
Filing
159
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 10, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
|
June 24, 2013 |
Filing
134
ORDER granting 133 Request for extension of time filed by Douglas R. Caraway. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/24/2013. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
|
December 19, 2012 |
Filing
112
ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 19, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
|
November 27, 2012 |
Filing
110
ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT CARAWAY'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 27, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
|
March 30, 2012 |
Filing
105
ORDER VACATING HEARING. The hearing on the motion to wtihdraw, presently scheduled for April 6, 2012, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 30, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
|
March 8, 2012 |
Filing
104
ORDER CONDITIONALLY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 8, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing
99
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL TO SERVE MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Sun Joo Chung is directed to serve, upon Douglas R. Caraway, the motion, such service to be made by mail with proof of service filed with the Court. If service is not accomplishe d and proof thereof filed at least 35 days before March 23, 2012, counsel is further directed to renotice the motion in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of this district. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 16, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
|
November 18, 2011 |
Filing
95
AMENDED JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF SALE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
|
November 16, 2011 |
Filing
91
JUDGMENT ESTABLISHING PRIORITY OF LIENS OF FREMONT BANK'S DEEDS OF TRUST. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 16, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
|
November 8, 2011 |
Filing
86
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Court deems the matters submitted on the moving papers and vacates the hearings scheduled for November 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 8, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
|
May 25, 2011 |
Filing
62
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
|
December 14, 2010 |
Filing
49
ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference is continued from December 17, 2010 to January 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/14/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
|
October 13, 2010 |
Filing
44
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Good cause appearing, the Case Management Conference is hereby CONTINUED from October 15, 2010 to December 17, 2010. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than December 10, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/13/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing
36
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 18, 2010 to August 6, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 9, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
|
May 6, 2010 |
Filing
34
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from May 14, 2010 to June 18, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 6, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
|
January 6, 2010 |
Filing
31
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 15, 2010 to May 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
|
October 6, 2009 |
Filing
26
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The October 9, 2009 Case Management Conference is continued to January 15, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
|
July 1, 2009 |
Filing
23
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to October 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 1, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
|
March 31, 2009 |
Filing
20
ORDER ON STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to July 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
|
February 6, 2009 |
Filing
18
ORDER ON STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to April 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
|
December 5, 2008 |
Filing
12
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to February 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 5, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
|