Jewel et al v. National Security Agency et al Featured Case

The plaintiffs are suing the government for illegally wiretapping their phones and internet. This is the companion case to Hepting vs. AT&T, which accuses the telecom of illegally helping with the same surveillance.

Plaintiff: Carolyn Jewel, Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Erik Knutzen and Joice Walton
Defendant: National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, United States of America, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, David S. Addington, Department of Justice, Alberto R. Gonzales, John D. Ashcroft, John M. McConnell and John D. Negroponte
Case Number: 3:2008cv04373
Filed: September 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER of USCA as to 61 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Hicks, Tash Hepting, Erik Knutzen, Carolyn Jewel, Joice Walton (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 65 USCA Case Number 10-15616 9th Circuit for 61 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Hicks, Tash Hepting, Erik Knutzen, Carolyn Jewel, Joice Walton. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 22, 2010 Filing 64 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/12/09, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2010. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
March 23, 2010 Filing 63 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 61 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet, # 2 cover letter, # 3 USCA appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 62 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 58 Judgment, 57 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 34611043712.(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 57 1/21/2010 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 2/4/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
January 28, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard R. Wiebe (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 25, 2010 Filing 58 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's January 21, 2010 Order, judgment is hereby entered in this case in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R. Walker granting 18 Motion to Dismiss; granting motion to dismiss in MDL Docket No. 3:06-cv-1791 VRW (member case no. 3:07-cv-0693 VRW) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 56 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Carolyn Jewel. Amendment to Substitute Yoo & Goldsmith for Does 1 & 2. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
December 23, 2009 Filing 55 NOTICE by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton re 18 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment , Plaintiffs' Local Rule 7-13 Notice That Government Defendants' Motion Has Been Under Submission More Than 120 Days (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 17, 2009 Filing 54 NOTICE by David S. Addington, Keith B. Alexander, John D. Ashcroft, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael V. Hayden, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, John D. Negroponte re 51 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Notice of Manual Filing (Whitman, James) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 15, 2009 Filing 53 NOTICE by United States of America re 51 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Notice of Manual Filing (Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton of Manual Filing (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker GRANTING doc [#50] JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE. Counsel representing each party shall, not later than 12/15/2009, submit to the Court under seal and pursuant to FRCP 11, a statement that the directive in paragraph D, has been carried out. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 10, 2009 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding Preservation of Evidence filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Dkt. 393 in 06-cv-1791-VRW, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE by United States of America Withdrawal of Appearance (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
October 28, 2009 Filing 48 NOTICE by United States of America of Order by Court of Appeals Granting Rehearing En Banc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
September 17, 2009 Filing 47 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re doc #s 32 and 33 held on 9/17/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker, the court submitted the matter. (Date Filed: 9/17/2009). (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/17/2009)
September 4, 2009 Filing 46 Reply Memorandum Government Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief (Dkt. 38-1) filed byDennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 3, 2009 Filing 45 Statement of Non-Opposition re 32 MOTION Individual capacity defendants' motion for relief from the Court's Orders of April 27, 2009, and May 8, 2009 Statement in Support of Individual Capacity Defs.' Motion for Relief from Court Orders filed byKeith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
September 3, 2009 Filing 44 Reply in support re 32 MOTION Individual capacity defendants' motion for relief from the Court's Orders of April 27, 2009, and May 8, 2009 filed byDavid S. Addington, Keith B. Alexander, John D. Ashcroft, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael V. Hayden, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, John D. Negroponte. (Whitman, James) (Filed on 9/3/2009) Modified on 9/4/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2009 Filing 43 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Supplemental Brief (Dkt. 38-1) and Proposed Order by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 24, 2009 Filing 42 Memorandum in Opposition to Individual Capacity Defendants' Motion for Relief filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 5, 2009 Filing 41 STIPULATION to Set Briefing Schedule by David S. Addington, Keith B. Alexander, John D. Ashcroft, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael V. Hayden, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, John D. Negroponte. (Whitman, James) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 38 motion for leave to file post-hearing brief. Defendants may file a brief on the same subject and of no greater length on or before 9/3/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 3, 2009 Filing 39 Declaration of Cindy A. Cohn in Support of 38 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief on the Scope of FISA Act Preemption filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Blizzard, Paula) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief on the Scope of FISA Act Preemption filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supplemental Memorandum on the Scope of FISA Act Preemption, # 2 Affidavit Wiebe Declaration ISO Supplemental Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit A to Wiebe Decl., # 4 Exhibit B to Wiebe Decl., # 5 Exhibit C to Wiebe Decl., # 6 Exhibit D to Wiebe Decl., # 7 Exhibit E to Wiebe Decl., # 8 Proposed Order Allowing Supplemental Memorandum)(Blizzard, Paula) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 31, 2009 Filing 37 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/15/2009, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Radovich Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 15, 2009 Filing 36 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. 1. Def's Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment (Doc 18). 2. Motion for Relief filed by Individual Capacity Defendants (Doc 32)-not argued. 3. Plas' Motion for Administrative Relief (Doc 33). The Court heard argument from counsel. The Court submitted the matter. The court to issue written ruling. Hearing on Government Individual Capacity Defendants motion for relief (doc 32) set for 9/17/2009 at 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/15/2009)
July 13, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE by Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO GOVERNMENT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Blizzard, Paula) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 13, 2009 Filing 34 Declaration of Cindy A. Cohn in Support of 33 MOTION Administrative Relief from Improper Motion for Reconsideration by Individual Capacity Defendants filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s) 33 ) (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 13, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION Administrative Relief from Improper Motion for Reconsideration by Individual Capacity Defendants filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 32 MOTION Individual capacity defendants' motion for relief from the Court's Orders of April 27, 2009, and May 8, 2009 filed by David S. Addington, Keith B. Alexander, John D. Ashcroft, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael V. Hayden, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, John D. Negroponte. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Whitman, James) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
June 26, 2009 Filing 31 Reply to Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Government Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byKeith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Government Defendants' Reply)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Cindy Cohn in Opposition to 29 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Cindy Cohn Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) in Opposition to Government Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and For Summary Judgment filed byGregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Opposition to Government Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byGregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 2, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Elizabeth Meny Paula A. Blizzard, Michael S. Kwun, and Audrey Walton-Hadlock (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
May 8, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Opposition due: 6/3/2009. Govt's Reply due: 6/26/2009. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER approving 26 Stipulation, filed by United States of America, at al. In addition, date established by 25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by which individual government defendants shall answer or otherwise respond is also hereby extended to July 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/8/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 26 STIPULATION to Revise Hearing Date and to Set Briefing Schedule by Barack Obama, Eric Holder, Dennis C Blair, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, Department of Justice. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker denying without prejudice 22 motion to enlarge time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Individual defendants shall have until June 25, 2009 within which to answer or otherwise respond. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 8, 2009 Filing 24 Proposed Order re 23 Memorandum in Opposition, to Individual Capacity Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief to Enlarge the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 8, 2009 Filing 23 Memorandum in Opposition to Individual Capacity Defendants' 22 Motion for Administrative relief to Enlarge the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 4/8/2009) Modified on 4/9/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2009 Filing 22 MOTION Individual capacity defendants' motion for administrative relief to enlarge the time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint filed by Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, David S. Addington, Alberto R. Gonzales, John D. Ashcroft, John M. McConnell, John D. Negroponte, Michael B. Mukasey. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James R. Whitman, # 2 Proposed Order)(Whitman, James) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE by Barack Obama, Eric Holder, Dennis C Blair, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, Department of Justice re 18 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of Classified In Camera Ex Parte Supplemental Memorandum of Government Defendants in Support of Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 20 NOTICE by Barack Obama, Eric Holder, Dennis C Blair, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, Department of Justice re 18 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of Classified In Camera Ex Parte Declaration of Deborah A. Bonanni, National Security Agency (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE by Barack Obama, Eric Holder, Dennis C Blair, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, Department of Justice re 18 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of Classified In Camera Ex Parte Declaration of Dennis C. Blair, Director of National Intelligence (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Barack Obama, Eric Holder, Dennis C Blair, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Affidavit Public Declaration of DNI Dennis C. Blair, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Deborah A. Bonanni, National Security Agency)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker GRANTING Docs #15, 16, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 4/3/2009. The 3/26/2009 hearing is vacated. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (CORRECTED VERSION) filed by National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, United States of America, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, David S. Addington, Department of Justice, Alberto R. Gonzales, John D. Ashcroft, John M. McConnell, John D. Negroponte, Michael B. Mukasey. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, United States of America, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, David S. Addington, Department of Justice, Alberto R. Gonzales, John D. Ashcroft, John M. McConnell, John D. Negroponte, Michael B. Mukasey. (Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Gerald Freeborne on behalf of federal defendants sued in their official capacity and the other agency defendants (Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Whitman on behalf of the individual capacity defendants (Whitman, James) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
December 15, 2008 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting of Summons and Complaint (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 11 STIPULATION by National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, George W. Bush, Department of Justice, John M. McConnell. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Kenneth Haas (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
October 29, 2008 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker. Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 28, 2008 Cases associated: Create association to 3:06-cv-00672-VRW. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 7 Motion to Relate Case. C06-0672 and C08-4373 are related. LR3-12. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 8 Proposed Order re 7 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion by Plaintiffs to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; Declaration of Kevin S. Bankston; Proof of Service ; Deeming Cases Related and Assigning Jewel to MDL Docket No. 06-1791 VRW, In Re National Security Agency Telecommunications Records Litigation by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion by Plaintiffs to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; Declaration of Kevin S. Bankston; Proof of Service filed by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 6 Letter dated 9/21/08 from James Alfred Miller, Jr. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 18, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2008 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, United States of America, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, David S. Addington, Department of Justice, Alberto R. Gonzales, John D. Ashcroft, John M. McConnell, John D. Negroponte, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2008 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2009. Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2009 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Order setting CMC, # 2 Standing Order, # 3 CM Standing Order for All Judges)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2008 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611023512.) SUMMONS ISSUED. Filed byGregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008) (mcl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jewel et al v. National Security Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Jewel
Represented By: Richard Roy Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tash Hepting
Represented By: Richard Roy Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hicks
Represented By: Richard Roy Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Knutzen
Represented By: Richard Roy Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joice Walton
Represented By: Richard Roy Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Security Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith B. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael V. Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto R. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Ashcroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Negroponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?