Realnetworks, Inc. et al v. DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. et al Featured Case

jukebox to store dvds as DMCA violation

Plaintiff: Realnetworks, Inc. and Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.
Defendant: DVD Copy Control Association, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. and Viacom, Inc.
Counter-claimant: Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Realnetworks, Inc. and Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv04548
Filed: September 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Copyright Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2010 Filing 488 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 487 MANDATE of USCA as to 468 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
March 3, 2010 Filing 486 CONSENT JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO STIPULATION; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/3/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 485 Proposed Order PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO STIPULATION by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.(a Deleware nonprofit corporation), Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Realnetworks, Inc.(a Washington corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 484 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Defendants'/counter-complainants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED. Declaratory judgment plaintiff's claims for violations of the federal Sherman Act, the California Cartwright Act and the California Unfair Competition Law are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
November 12, 2009 Filing 483 Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA re 463 Notice of Appeal filed by Realnetworks, Inc., et al (Attachments: # 1 certificate of record) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2009: # 2 Docket Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2009 Filing 482 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/26/09, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2010. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 26, 2009 Filing 481 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2009 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 10/26/2009) re 454 444 MOTIONS to Dismiss (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (awb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/26/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF REALNETWORKS, INC. AND REALNETWORKS HOME ENTERTAINMENT, INC. TO BRING CERTAIN EQUIPMENT AND MATERIALS INTO THE COURTROOM; re 479 Notice (Other) filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc., Realnetworks, Inc. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/23/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 21, 2009 Filing 479 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Realnetworks, Inc. MOTION To Bring Certain Equipment and Materials Into The Courtroom (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hesse, Renata) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 478 USCA Case Number 09-16996 re 463 Notice of Appeal filed by Realnetworks, Inc., et al (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 12, 2009 Filing 477 RESPONSE in Support re 454 MOTION to Dismiss Motion Picture Studio Parties' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Real's Antitrust Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/12/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 476 Memorandum in Opposition re 454 MOTION to Dismiss Motion Picture Studio Parties' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Real's Antitrust Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc., Realnetworks, Inc.. (Hesse, Renata) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 1, 2009 Filing 475 RESPONSE to re 474 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) MOTION PICTURE STUDIO PARTIES' AND DVD CCA'S RESPONSE TO REAL'S OPPOSITION TO CHANGES TO PROPOSED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 28, 2009 Filing 474 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Realnetworks, Inc. RealNetworks' Opposition to Motion Picture Studio Parties' and DVD CCA's Submission of Changes to Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 473 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. MOTION PICTURE STUDIO PARTIES' AND DVD CCA'S SUBMISSION OF CHANGES TO PROPOSED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 471 (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 24, 2009 Filing 472 Proposed Order re 471 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 24, 2009 Filing 471 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 473 . *** NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. MOTION PICTURE STUDIO PARTIES' AND DVD CCA'S SUBMISSION OF CHANGES TO PROPOSED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 9/24/2009) Modified on 9/25/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part 133 defendants' Motion to Seal Document (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 12 defendants' Ex Parte Application to seal AS AMENDED BY COURT (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 23, 2009 Filing 468 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Filing fee $ 455. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 17, 2009 Filing 467 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 10/03/2008; 10/07/2008; 12/22/2008; 02/03/2009; 03/23/2009; 04/24/2009; 04/28/2009; 04/29/2009; 05/07/2009; 05/21/2009 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel, re 464 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement to USCA, Transcript due by 9/18/2009. (Lane, Tracy) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 16, 2009 Filing 466 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/22/08, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2009. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 16, 2009 Filing 465 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by William Sloan Coats, III (Coats, William) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 464 RECEIVED: Civil Appeals Docketing Statement forwarded to 9th Circuit US Court of Appeals by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc., Realnetworks, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order, # 2 Exhibit Notice of Appeal)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 463 NOTICE of APPEAL by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc., Realnetworks, Inc. re 448 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for TRO. Fee Paid $455.00, Receipt Number 34611036529. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 9/10/2009). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2009: # 1 Civil Appeal Docketing Statement) (gba, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2009: # 2 Memorandum and Order) 09-16996 (gba, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2009 Filing 462 Declaration of William Way Re: Compliance with August 11, 2009 Memorandum and Order Granting Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Realnetworks, Inc.. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 461 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Realnetworks, Inc. Statement of Compliance with August 11, 2009 Memorandum and Order Granting Preliminary Injunction (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 460 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc. re 458 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 459 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting Hearing on Motions 444 454 MOTION to Dismiss for 10/26/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/10/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 456 defendants Viacom and Paramount's Motion for attorney Kenneth R Logan to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 9, 2009 Filing 457 STIPULATION re 454 MOTION to Dismiss Motion Picture Studio Parties' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Real's Antitrust Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule for Motion Picture Studio Parties' Motion to Dismiss Real's Antitrust Claims by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 8, 2009 Filing 456 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Kenneth R. Logan to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611036410) filed by Paramount Pictures Corp., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 8, 2009 Filing 455 Proposed Order re 454 MOTION to Dismiss Motion Picture Studio Parties' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Real's Antitrust Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 8, 2009 Filing 454 MOTION to Dismiss Motion Picture Studio Parties' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Real's Antitrust Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 4, 2009 Filing 453 Reply Memorandum re 444 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS filed byDVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 4, 2009 Filing 452 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV Kenneth R. Logan, and Kevin Arquit (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 451 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING Hearing on Motion 444 MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS TO 10/26/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Replies to be filed by 9/4/2009; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/1/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 31, 2009 Filing 450 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO SET HEARING ON MOTION OF DVD CCA TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS FOR OCTOBER 26, 2009 AND EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DVD CCA'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF REALNETWORKS TO MOTION TO DISMISS TO SEPTEMBER 4, 2009 by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.(a Deleware nonprofit corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 24, 2009 Filing 449 Memorandum in Opposition re 444 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Realnetworks, Inc.. (Hesse, Renata) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: the court GRANTS the Studio plaintiffs' and DVD CCA's motion for a preliminary injunction against Real. RealNetworks is hereby preliminarily enjoined from engaging in, or facilitating others in, manufacturing, importing, offering to the public, providing or otherwise trafficking in the product known as RealDVD, whether termed Vegas, Facet or another internal name, or any substantially similar software application or other product, service, device, component or part thereof that circumvents or otherwise fails to protect against access to, duplication of, and/or redistribution of CSS-protected and copyrighted DVD content. The Studios and DVD CCA may submit a proposed order for injunctive relief if anything further is sought, or if the parties can reach a stipulated proposed order for injunctive relief, they may submit it, without waiving any rights to appeal the injunction. RealDVD makes a permanent copy of copyrighted DVD content and by doing so breaches its CSS License Agreement with DVD CCA and circumvents a technological measure that effectively controls access to or copying of the Studios' copyrighted content on DVDs. Had Real's products been manufactured differently, i.e., if what happened in Vegas really did stay in Vegas, this might have been a different case. But, it is what it is. Once the distributive nature of the copying process takes hold, like the spread of gossip after a weekend in Vegas, whats done cannot be undone. The court hereby converts the Studios' temporary restraining order bond, posted in the sum of $1,000,000.00 on October 6, 2008, to a preliminary injunction bond, to compensate Real for its losses in the event that this injunction is reversed or vacated. Real will be ordered to file a report in writing and under oath setting forth in detail the manner and form in which Real has complied with the injunction, within thirty (30) days after the entry of the order that confirms the bounds of this injunction. Until such time the injunction remains in full force and effect as described (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 324 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File 2nd amended complaint. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 4, 2009 Filing 446 CLERKS NOTICE submitting plaintiffs' motion for leave to file 2nd amdended complaint as unopposed. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 15, 2009 Filing 445 CLERKS NOTICE; 7/20/2009 Motion Hearing reset for 8/10/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 14, 2009 Filing 444 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 7, 2009 Filing 443 Statement of Compliance with June 18, 2009 Stipulated Protective Order by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc., Realnetworks, Inc.. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 442 Memorandum in Opposition re 433 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Studios Motion Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 6-3 to Extend Time to Respond to RealNetworks' Second Amended Complaint RealNetworks' Opposition to Defendants' Administrative Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to RealNetworks' Second Amended Complaint filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Realnetworks, Inc.. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 1, 2009 Filing 441 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Teresa Wen Chia Wang (Wang, Teresa) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
June 30, 2009 Filing 440 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 Filing 439 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE OF DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 438 DECLARATION of Jason Putnam Gordon in Support of RealNetworks' Opposition to Studio Defendants' Administrative Motion for Judicial Notice of RealNetworks' Patent Applications filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc., Realnetworks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 437 Memorandum in Opposition RealNetworks' Opposition to Studio Defendants' Administrative Motion for Judicial Notice of RealNetworks' Patent Applications filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc., Realnetworks, Inc.. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 436 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MOTION OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting STEER Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 435 Response RESPONSE OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' 324 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 6/29/2009) Modified on 6/30/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2009 Filing 434 Declaration of Rohit K. Singla in Support of 433 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Studios Motion Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 6-3 to Extend Time to Respond to RealNetworks' Second Amended Complaint --- Public Redacted Version filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Application to Seal Confidential Version of Declaration of Rohit K. Singla, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re: Application to Seal Confidential Declaration of Rohit K. Singla, # 3 Notice of Manual Filing of Confidential Version of Declaration of Rohit K. Singla)(Related document(s) 433 ) (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 433 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Studios Motion Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 6-3 to Extend Time to Respond to RealNetworks' Second Amended Complaint filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re: Studios' Motion for Extension of Time)(Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 432 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. Studios' Notice of Non-Opposition to RealNetworks' 324 Motion to Amend Its Complaint (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/29/2009) Modified on 6/30/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 430 joint Motion to Seal deposition designations, counter-designations, and exhibits (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 25, 2009 Filing 430 Joint MOTION to Seal Document Parties' Joint Application to File Under Seal Deposition Designations, Counter-Designations, and Exhibits filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 24, 2009 Filing 429 Declaration of Rohit K. Singla in Support of 428 Request for Judicial Notice,, filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to Singla Declaration ISO Administrative Motion for Judicial Notice of RealNetworks' Patent Applications)(Related document(s) 428 ) (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 6/24/2009)
June 24, 2009 Filing 428 Request for Judicial Notice Administrative Motion For Judicial Notice of RealNetworks' Patent Applications filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F to Administrative Motion for Judicial Notice of RealNetworks' Patent Applications, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Judicial Notice of RealNetworks' Patent Applications)(Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 6/24/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 427 STIPULATED PRESERVATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/18/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 426 STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulated Preservation Order by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 425 Opposition to 424 Application of DVD CCA for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to May 5, 2009 Order of the Court by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc., Realnetworks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order [Denying] [Granting in Part] the Application of DVD CCA for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to May 5, 2009 Order of the Court)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 6/17/2009) Modified on 6/18/2009 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2009 Filing 424 NOTICE by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.(a Deleware nonprofit corporation) Application of DVD CCA for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to May 5, 2009 Order of the Court (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 15, 2009 Filing 423 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Awarding Studios Fees for Spoliation of Evidence by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 422 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 6/15/09 for defendants to make application for a monetary sanction; response to be filed by 7/15/09; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/12/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 417 joint Motion to Seal exhibits admitted during preliminary injunction hearing (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 420 STIPULATION (Second) and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Filing of Application for Monetary Sanctions by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), NBC Universal, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Viacom, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 9, 2009 Filing 419 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Glenn Swanson , Daniel M. Flores, and Kaiponanea T. Matsumura (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 418 Proposed Order re 417 MOTION to Seal (Joint) Confidential Exhibits Admitted During Preliminary Injunction Hearing MOTION to Seal (Joint) Confidential Exhibits Admitted During Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 417 MOTION to Seal (Joint) Confidential Exhibits Admitted During Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 416 Exhibit List (Joint) of Exhibits Admitted During Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc... (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 415 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for defendants to file applications for monetary sanctions/spoliation of evidence; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/3/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2009)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 414 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 7/14/09 for DVD CCA to file response to Real's counterclaims; Studios' response to Real's motion for leave shall be due by 6/29/09; Replies to be filed by 7/6/09; Motion to be heard 7/20/2009; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/3/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2009)
June 2, 2009 Filing 389 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Application for Monetary Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 388 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR STUDIO PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF REALNETWORKS, INC. AND FOR DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. TO ANSWER THE COUNTERCLAIMS OF REALNETWORKS, INC. by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 387 Declaration of Peter Biddle in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and realNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 386 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/21/09, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Belle Ball, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 21, 2009 Filing 375 Declaration of James Brennan in Support of 373 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 373 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 21, 2009 Filing 349 Minute Entry: Preliminary Injunction Hearing, Closing Arguments held on 5/21/2009 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 5/21/2009). (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan, Belle Ball.) (awb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/21/2009)
May 20, 2009 Filing 348 STIPULATION Stipulated Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law of DVD Copy Control Association, Inc., Studio Plaintiffs and RealNetworks, Inc. by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 20, 2009 Filing 347 Letter from RealNetworks, Inc. to Judge Patel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Peter Biddle in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 20, 2009 Filing 346 Declaration of Peter Biddle in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 20, 2009 Filing 345 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. re 344 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) DVD CCA and Studios' Notice of Lodging of Hearing and Deposition Designation Exhibits (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 20, 2009 Filing 344 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. DVD CCA and Studios' Notice of Lodging of Hearing and Deposition Designation Exhibits (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 20, 2009 Filing 343 Proposed Findings of Fact by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) RealNetworks' Amended Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Part 2 [Public Redacted Version]. (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 20, 2009 Filing 342 Proposed Findings of Fact by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) RealNetworks' Amended Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Part 1 [Public Redacted Version]. (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 20, 2009 Filing 341 MOTION to Seal Document Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal the Redacted Version of RealNetworks' Amended Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal the Redacted Version of RealNetworks' Amended Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 328 defendant Motion Picture Studio's Motion to Seal proposed findings of fact (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 332 defendant DVD Copy Control's Motion to Seal proposed findings of fact. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 335 plaintiffs' Motion to Seal proposed findings of fact (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 18, 2009 Filing 413 Proposed Findings of Fact by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 412 Proposed Findings of Fact by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 337 Proposed Findings of Fact by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) RealNetworks' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law - Part 2. (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 336 Proposed Findings of Fact by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) RealNetworks' Proposed Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law- Part 1. (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 335 MOTION to Seal Document RealNetworks' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal the Redacted Version of RealNetworks' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 334 Proposed Findings of Fact by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Public Redacted Version). (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 333 Proposed Order re 332 MOTION to Seal Highly Confidential Version of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by DVD CCA by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 332 MOTION to Seal Highly Confidential Version of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 331 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. re Documents Filed Under Seal (Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Submitted by Motion Picture Studio Plaintiffs) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 330 Proposed Findings of Fact by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. And Conclusions of Law Submitted by Motion Picture Studio Plaintiffs. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 329 Proposed Order re 328 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Version of [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Submitted by Motion Picture Studio Plaintiffs MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Version of [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Submitted by Motion Picture Studio Plaintiffs by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 328 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Version of [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Submitted by Motion Picture Studio Plaintiffs filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 327 AMENDED DOCUMENT by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. SECOND AMENDED DVD CCA AND STUDIOS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS; REAL'S COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Lodging of Additional Designations)(Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 325 NOTICE by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. re 324 MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ERRATA REGARDING EXHIBIT A TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND VIOLATION OF SHERMAN ACT AND STATE LAW (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 13, 2009 Filing 324 MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 13, 2009 Filing 323 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 96 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, REALNETWORKS' ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO THE COUNTERCLAIMS OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC., COUNTERCLAIM against DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 326 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/7/09, before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 322 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. re 321 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Studios' Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Mark Hollar and Video (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 321 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. Studios' Notice of Lodging of Designated Deposition Testimony of Mark Hollar and Video (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 320 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/7/09, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan and Belle Ball, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 319 Minute Entry: Preliminary Injunction Hearing, Day Four held on 5/7/2009 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 5/7/2009); Closing arguments set for 5/21/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan, Belle Ball.) (awb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2009)
May 6, 2009 Filing 318 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
May 6, 2009 Filing 317 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. DVD CCA AND STUDIOS NOTICE OF LODGING OF DESIGNATED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AND VIDEOS (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Real's motions to dismiss DVD CCA's second counterclaim has been withdrawn. Real's motion to preclude claims based on non-CSS technologies is DENIED. Defendants' motion for sanctions for spoliation of evidence is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants' motions are granted insofar as: (1) the court instructs the parties to negotiate and file a stipulated proposed Preservation Order for all existing and future documents relating to all products at issue in this litigation, including RealDVD, or Vegas, and Facet; (2) the court imposes monetary sanctions for Real's failure to preserve Hamilton's notebooks; (3) the court awards reasonable attorneys' fees and related costs for pursuing the evidence of spoliation of Hamilton's notebooks and for bringing this part of the sanctions motion; (4) the court will draw an adverse inference as to Real's knowledge of ARccOS and Ripguard. Defendants' remaining motions for sanctions are denied. Defendants are granted leave to file an application and declaration(s) for a monetary award (and a proposed order) including attorneys' fees and costs in accordance with the preceding paragraph within thirty (30) days of the filing of this order. Real may respond as to reasonableness of the fees only and shall do so within thirty (30) days of the filing of the application. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 315 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/29/09, before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 314 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 28, 2009, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan and Belle Ball, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 313 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 29, 2009, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan and Belle Ball, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 29, 2009 Filing 312 Minute Entry: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 4/29/2009 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 4/29/2009); Further hearing re Preliminary Injunction set for 5/7/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan, Belle Ball.) (awb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/29/2009)
April 28, 2009 Filing 310 Minute Entry: Preliminary Injunction Hearing, Day Two held on 4/28/2009 before Hon. Mariliyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 4/28/2009). (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan, Belle Ball.) (awb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2009)
April 28, 2009 Filing 309 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. re 304 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) / AMENDED DVD CCA AND STUDIOS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS; REAL COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 296 Motion to Seal Document AS AMENDED BY COURT (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 292 Motion to Seal Document (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 295 Motion to Seal Document AS AMENDED BY COURT (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 28, 2009 Filing 304 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. DVD CCA and Studios Deposition Designations; Real Counter-Designations (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 27, 2009 Filing 311 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/24/09, before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 27, 2009 Filing 303 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Deposition Designations for Preliminary Injunction Hearing; DVD CCA and Studios' Joint Counter-Designations; and Plaintiff Studios' Counter-Designation for Andrew Parsons (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 27, 2009 Filing 302 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 24, 2009, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell and Belle Ball, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 411 Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus in Support of 410 Reply Memorandum, filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 410 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 410 Reply Memorandum in support of re 402 MOTION in Limine filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 305 Minute Entry: Preliminary Injunction Hearing, Day One held on 4/24/2009 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 4/24/2009). (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan, Belle Ball.) (awb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 301 Reply Memorandum re 277 MOTION in Limine Public Redacted Version of Motion Picture Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 298 filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 300 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. re Documents Filed Under Seal (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 299 Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus in Support of 298 Reply Memorandum, Public Redacted Version, Exhibits A-C filed under seal filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Related document(s) 298 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 298 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 301 . *** Reply Memorandum re 277 MOTION in Limine Public Redacted Version of Motion Picture Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony Public Redacted Version filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/24/2009) Modified on 4/24/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/24/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2009 Filing 297 Proposed Order re 296 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of Reply in Support of Motion Picture Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony and Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus in Support of Motion Picture Studios&# by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 296 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of Reply in Support of Motion Picture Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony and Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus in Support of Motion Picture Studios' Motion in Limine filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 409 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of 408 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 408 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 408 Memorandum in Opposition re 402 MOTION in Limine filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 407 Declaration of Maria Ellinikos in Support of 406 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 406 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 406 Memorandum in Opposition re 404 MOTION in Limine filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 295 MOTION to Seal Document 294 Memorandum in Opposition,,, Application of DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. to Seal Highly Confidential Documents filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Applicationof DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. to Seal Highly Confidential Documents)(Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 294 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 280 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Strike Jacob Pak's April 10, 2009 Testimony Regarding AMX Corporation Pursuant to FRE 602, FRE 403 and Rule 30(E) [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Strike Jacob Pak's April 10, 2009 Testimony Regarding AMX Corporation Pursuant to FRE 602, FRE 403 and Rule 30(E) [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] Opposition of DVD CCA to RealNetworks' Motion in Limine to Exclude or Strike Jacob Pak's April 10, 2009 Testimony Regarding AMX Corporation filed byDVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maria Ellinikos In Support of Opposition of DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. to RealNetworks' Motion in Limine to Exclude or Strike Jacob Pak's April 10, 2009 Testimony Regarding AMX Corporation)(Related document(s) 280 ) (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 293 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 292 MOTION to Seal Document Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal (1) The Unredacted Version of RealNetworks' Opposition to Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony Re Settlement Communications (2) Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane (3) Exhibits to Tracy Tosh Lane Declaration filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal (1) The Unredacted Version of RealNetworks' Opposition to Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony Re Settlement Communications (2) Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane (3) Exhs To Tosh Dec)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 291 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of RealNetworks' Opposition to Studios Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony Re Settlement Communications [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 290 Memorandum in Opposition to Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony Re Settlement Communications filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 22, 2009 Filing 405 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of 404 MOTION in Limine filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 404 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 22, 2009 Filing 404 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Strike Jacob Pak's April 10, 2009 Testimony Regarding AMX Corporation Pursuant to FRE 602, FRE 403 and Rule 30(E) filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 275 Motion Picture Studios' Motion to Seal motion in limine to exclude evidence and testimony (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 284 plaintiff's Motion to seal motion in limine to exclude/strike Jacob Park's 4/10/2009 testimony (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 PLAINTIFF'S EQIUPMENT ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 22, 2009 Filing 286 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 403 Declaration of Bart H. Williams in Support of 402 MOTION in Limine filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 402 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 402 MOTION Picture Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony re Settlement Communications filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 285 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing (1) The Unredacted Version of RealNetworks' Motion in Limine to Exclude or Strike Jacob Pak's April 10, 2009 Testimony Re AMX Corporation Pursuant to FRE 403 and Rule 30(E); (2) The Unredacted Versions of the Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Motion in Limine (3) Exhibits to Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Motion in Limine (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 284 MOTION to Seal Document Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal (1) The Unredacted Version of RealNetworks' Motio in Limine to Exclude or Strike Jacob Pak's April 10, 2009 Testimony Re AMX Corporation Pursuant to FRE 403 and Rule 30(E); (2) The Unredacted Version of the Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Motion in Limine and (3) Exhibits to Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Motion in Limine filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 283 Proposed Order re 281 MOTION To Bring Certain Equipment and Materials Into The Courtroom by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 282 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude or Strike Jacob Pak's April 10, 2009 Testimony Regarding AMX Corporation Pursuant to FRE 403 and Rule 30(E) [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 281 MOTION To Bring Certain Equipment and Materials Into The Courtroom filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 280 MOTION in Limine to Exclude or Strike Jacob Pak's April 10, 2009 Testimony Regarding AMX Corporation Pursuant to FRE 602, FRE 403 and Rule 30(E) [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 279 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. re Documents Filed Under Seal (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 278 Declaration of Bart H. Williams in Support of 277 MOTION in Limine Public Redacted Version of Motion Picture Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Public Version of Exhibits A-J)(Related document(s) 277 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 277 MOTION in Limine Public Redacted Version of Motion Picture Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 276 Proposed Order re 275 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of Motion Picture Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony and Declaration of Bart H. Williams in Support of Motion Picture Studios' Motion in Lim by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 275 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of Motion Picture Studios' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony and Declaration of Bart H. Williams in Support of Motion Picture Studios' Motion in Limine filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 272 plaintiffs' Motion to to exhs to deposition designations for Andrew Parsons (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 20, 2009 Filing 401 EXHIBITS to Deposition Designations for Andrew Parsons for the Preliminary Injunction Proceeding filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 17, 2009 Filing 273 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 17, 2009 Filing 272 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits to Deposition Designations for Andrew Parsons for the Preliminary Injunction Proceeding filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 17, 2009 Filing 271 NOTICE by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Deposition Designations for Andrew Parsons for the Preliminary Injunction Proceeding (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 270 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing The Exhibits to RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Deposition Designations for Preliminary Injunction Proceeding (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 269 MOTION to Seal Document Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal the Exhibits to RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Deposition Designations for Preliminary Injunction Proceeding filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Filing Under Seal the Exhibits to RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Deposition Designations for Preliminary Injunction Proceeding)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 268 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Deposition Designations for Preliminary Injunction Proceeding (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 267 EQUIPMENT ORDER; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/16/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 266 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. of Manual Filing re Notice of Errata Regarding Exhibit 21 to the Declaration of Jonathan H. Blavin in Support of Studio Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 265 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. re Confidential Version of Errata to Blavin Declaration (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 264 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. of Errata Regarding Exhibit Number 21 to the Declaration of Jonathan H. Blavin in Support of Studio Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 263 MOTION to Seal Document Notice of Errata Regargind Exhibit Number 21 to the Declaration of Jonathan H. Blavin in Support of Studio Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 15, 2009 Filing 262 Proposed Order re 261 MOTION of Studio Plaintiffs to Bring Certain Equipment and Materials into the Courtroom by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 15, 2009 Filing 261 MOTION of Studio Plaintiffs to Bring Certain Equipment and Materials into the Courtroom filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 247 Motion Picture Studios' Motion to Seal response memorandum in support of motion for preliminary injunction, supplemental declaration of Jonathan Blavin AS AMENDED BY COURT (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 250 defendant DVD COPY CONTROL's Motion to Seal response memorandum in support of preliminary injunction AS AMENDED BY COURT (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 254 Motion to Seal unredacted version of Realnetworks' response to studios' and DVD CCA's Motions for Preliminary Injunction (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 13, 2009 Filing 400 EXHIBITS 63-83 to Declaration of Christopher F. Nelson in support of 396 Response to Studios and DVD CCA Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 Filing 399 EXHIBITS 84-113 to Declaration of Christopher F. Nelson in support of 396 Response to Studios and DVD CCA Motions for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 Filing 398 EXHIBIT B to Declaration of Edward W. Felten in support of 396 Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 Filing 397 EXHIBIT A to Declaration of Edward W. Felten in support of 396 Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 Filing 396 RESPONSE to Studios and DVD CCA's 202 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 Filing 257 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. Notice of Manual Filing (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 395 Declaration of Maria Ellinikos in Support of 392 Response Memorandum filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 392 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 394 Declaration of Jacob Pak in Support of 392 Response Memorandum filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 392 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 393 Declaration of John J. Kelly, PH.D in Support of 392 Response Memorandum filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 392 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 392 RESPONSE Memorandum in support of 61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 391 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Jonathan H. Blavin in support of Studio Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 390 RESPONSE Memorandum of Studio Plaintiffs in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 256 Reply Memorandum RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Response to Studios and DVD CCA's Motions for Preliminary Injunction [Public Redacted Version] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 255 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 254 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2009 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal (1) the Unredactd Version of RealNetworks, Inc.'s Response to Studios and DVD CCA's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; (2) Exhibits to the Declaration of Christopher F. Nelson in Support of)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 253 Declaration of Edward W. Felten in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 252 Declaration of Anthony J. DeNatale in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Response to Studios and DVD CCA's Motions for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 251 Declaration of Christopher F. Nelson in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Response to Studios and DVD CCA Motions for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 250 MOTION to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of Response Memorandum and Supporting Documents filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Application to Seal)(Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 249 RESPONSE in Support re 61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byDVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Maria Ellinikos ISO Response Brief of DVD CCA, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Jacob Pak ISO Response Brief of DVD CCA)(Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 248 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. Proof of Service of Documents Filed Under Seal (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 247 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of (1) Response Memorandum of Studio Plaintiffs in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction; (2) Supplemental Declaration of Jonathan H. Blavin filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 246 Declaration of Jonathan H. Blavin in Support of 202 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Public Redacted Version: Supplemental Declaration of Jonathan H. Blavin In Support of Studio Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Related document(s) 202 ) (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 245 RESPONSE in Support re 202 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Public Redacted Version: Response Memorandum of Studio Plaintiffs in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 8, 2009 Filing 244 Witness List by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) for Preliminary Injunction Proceeding (Supplemental). (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS REALNETWORKS, INC. AND REALNETWORKS HOME ENTERTAINMENT, INC. TO ANSWER THE COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/6/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 6, 2009 Filing 242 Witness List by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. DEFENDANTS JOINT WITNESS DISCLOSURE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PROCEEDING. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 2, 2009 Filing 241 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/23/09, before Judge MARILYN H. PATEL. Court Reporter/Transcriber MARGARET "MARGO" GURULE, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2009. (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 240 Witness List by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. for Preliminary Injunction Proceeding. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 239 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. to Answer the Counterclaims of Defendant and Counterclaim Plaintiff DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 26, 2009 Filing 238 Witness List by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Aull, Laura Ashley) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 26, 2009 Filing 237 Witness List by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 236 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 235 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion Filing Under Seal Corrected Exhibits 3 and 4 to the Declaration of Christopher F. Nelson in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 234 MOTION to Seal Document (Corrected Exhibits 3 and 4 to the Declaration of Christopher F. Nelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 233 NOTICE by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. of Manual Filing (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 200 Picture Studio's Motion to unredacted version of preliminary injunction AS AMENDED BY COURT (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 198 defendant DVD Copy Control's Motion to Seal memorandum, declaration of John PJ Kelly, selected exhs. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 220 plaintiffs' Motion to plaintiffs' opposition, and declarations of Phil Barrett, James Brennan, Jeffrey Buzzard, and Jeffrey Chasen in support thereof (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 23, 2009 Filing 229 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/23/2009 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 3/23/2009); Preliminary Injunction hearings date reserved for 4/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Margo Garule.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/23/2009)
March 23, 2009 Filing 228 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Revised Public Redacted Version] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 385 Declaration of Christopher F. Nelson in Support of 373 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 373 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 384 EXHIBIT 5 to the Declaration of Larry Gerbrandt in support of Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 383 EXHIBIT B to the Declaration of Matthew A. Bishop, PH.D. in support of Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 382 EXHIBIT A to the Declaration of Matthew A. Bishop, PH.D in support of Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 381 EXHIBIT B to the Declaration of Edward W. Felten in support of 373 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 380 EXHIBIT A to the Declaration of Edward W. Felten in support of 373 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 379 EXHIBIT B to the Declaration of Douglas Dixon in support of 373 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 378 EXHIBIT A to the Declaration of Douglas Dixon in support of 373 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 377 Declaration of Jeffrey Buzzard in Support of 373 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 373 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 376 Declaration of Jeff Chasen in Support of 373 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 373 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 374 Declaration of Phil Barrett in Support of 373 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 373 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 373 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 227 NOTICE by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. re 98 MOTION to Dismiss DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.'s Second Counterclaim Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.'s Second Counterclaim (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 123 plaintiffs' Motion to seal unredacted version of motion to preclude (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 225 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 122 plaintiffs' Motion to Seal unredacted version of reply to motion to preclude (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel DENYING 102 plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Document (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 194 defendants' Motion to Seal Studio's reply in support of motion for sanctions AS MODIFIED BY COURT (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 372 Declaration of Jonathan H. Blavin in Support of 368 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 368 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 371 Declaration of Robert Schumann in Support of 368 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 368 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 370 Declaration of Mark Hollar in Support of 368 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 368 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 369 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Miller in Support of 368 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 368 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 368 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 367 Declaration of Maria Ellinikos with Exhibits A through W in Support of 61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 61 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 366 Declaration of Jacob Pak with Exhibits I through O in Support of 61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 61 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 365 Declaration of John P.J. Kelly, PH.D in Support of 61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 61 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 364 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of 61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 61 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 221 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 220 MOTION to Seal Document RealNetworks, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Decls. of Barrett, Brennan, Buzzard and Chasen filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion Filing Under Seal RealNetworks, Inc. Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Decls. of Barrett, Brennan, Buzzard and Chasen)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 219 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing Highly Confidential Documents (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 218 Declaration of Larry Gerbrandt in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction [PUBLIC VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 217 Declaration of Christopher F. Nelson in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 216 Declaration of Gordon L. Klein in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 215 Declaration of Timothy F. Bresnahan in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 214 Declaration of Phil Barrett in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction [PUBLIC VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 213 Declaration of Jeffrey Buzzard in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction [PUBLIC VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 212 Declaration of Douglas Dixon in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 211 Declaration of Jeff Chasen in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction [PUBLIC VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 210 Declaration of James Brennan in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction [PUBLIC VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 209 Declaration of Matthew A. Bishop in Support of RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 208 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. re 202 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Service of Documents Filed Under Seal (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 207 Proposed Order re 202 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 206 Declaration of Jonathan H. Blavin in Support of 202 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 65-70)(Related document(s) 202 ) (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 205 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Miller in Support of 202 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Related document(s) 202 ) (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 204 Declaration of Robert Schumann in Support of 202 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed bySony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Related document(s) 202 ) (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 203 Declaration of Mark Hollar in Support of 202 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed bySony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Related document(s) 202 ) (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 202 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 201 Proposed Order re 200 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of (1) Notice of Motion and Motion of Studio Plaintiffs' for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; (2) Declaration of Mark Holl MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of (1) Notice of Motion and Motion of Studio Plaintiffs' for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; (2) Declaration of Mark Holl MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of (1) Notice of Motion and Motion of Studio Plaintiffs' for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; (2) Declaration of Mark Holl by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 200 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of (1) Notice of Motion and Motion of Studio Plaintiffs' for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; (2) Declaration of Mark Hollar; (3) Declaration of Robert Schuman (4) Declaration of Jeffrey S. Miller; and (5) Declaration of Jonathan H. Blavin filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 199 Brief re 61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byDVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Ellinikos Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A-X to Ellinikos Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Y part 1 to Ellinikos Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Y part 2 to Ellinikos Declaration, # 5 Pak Declaration, # 6 Exhibit to Pak Declaration, # 7 Parsons Declaration, # 8 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 61 ) (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 198 MOTION to Seal Document APPLICATION OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. TO SEAL (1) HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL VERSION OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; (2) DECLARATION OF JOHN P.J. KELLY; (3) SELECTED EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF JACOB PAK; AND (4) SELECTED EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF MARIA ELLINIKOS filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 197 Reply Memorandum re 129 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Public Redacted Version filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 196 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. Proof of Service of Documents Filed Under Seal (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 18, 2009 Filing 359 Declaration of Zachary Katz in support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 18, 2009 Filing 358 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 18, 2009 Filing 195 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. Notice Of Manual Filing (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 18, 2009 Filing 194 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of (1) Studios' Reply In Support Of Motion For Sanctions For Spoliation Of Evidence, And (2) Declaration Of Zachary Katz In Support Of Same filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 18, 2009 Filing 193 Declaration of Dr. John P.J. Kelly in Support of 129 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Public Redacted Version Supplemental Declaration Of Dr. John P.J. Kelly In Support Of Studios' Motion For Sanctions For Spoliation Of Evidence filed bySony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Related document(s) 129 ) (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 18, 2009 Filing 192 Declaration of Zachary Katz in Support of 129 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Public Redacted Version Public Redacted Version: Declaration of Zachary Katz In Support Of Motion For Sanctions For Spoliation Of Evidence filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Related document(s) 129 ) (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 18, 2009 Filing 191 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Reply Memorandum re 129 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Public Redacted Version Public Redacted Version: Studio Defendants' Reply In Support Of Motion For Sanctions For Spoliation of Evidence filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/18/2009) Modified on 3/19/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Granting re 152 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Karma M. Giulianelli( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611029778.) filed by Realnetworks, Inc.. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/12/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 150 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Donald E. Scott (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 148 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Alan E. Littmann (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 171 Administrative Motion to Seal Document (I) The Unredacted Version of Realnetworks's Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Sanctions For Spoliation of Evidence; (II) the Unredated Versions of the Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane, William Way, John Moore, Dale Dewhitt, Phil Barrett, And Rishi Mathew; and (III) the Exhibits G and H to Tracy Tosh Lane's Declaration In Support of The Opposition. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 357 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of 351 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 351 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 356 Declaration of Phil Barrett in Support of 351 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 351 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 355 Declaration of Rishi Mathew in Support of 351 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 351 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 354 Declaration of John Moore in Support of 351 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 351 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 353 Declaration of William Way in Support of 351 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 351 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 352 Declaration of Dale DeWhitt in Support of 351 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 351 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 351 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 186 CLERKS NOTICE: Motion Hearing previously set for 3/16/2009 are reset for 3/23/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 152 plaintiff's Motion for attorney Karma M Giulianelli to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 184 Declaration of Elizabeth Coppinger in Support of Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 183 Declaration of Jeff Buzzard in Support of RealNetworks and RealNetworks Home Entertainment's Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 182 Declaration of William Way in Support of Plaintiffs and Counter-Claim defendants RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 181 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 180 Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 11, 2009 Filing 179 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing [Confidential Version] Exhibit H to the Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 178 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing Exhibit G to the Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 177 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing [Confidential Version] Declaration of Rishi Mathew in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 176 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing [Cofidential Version] Declaration of Phil Barrett in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 175 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing [Confidential Version] Declaration of William Way in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 174 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing [Confidential Version] Declaration of John Moore in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 173 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing [Confidential Version] Declaration of Dale DeWhitt in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 172 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Manual Filing Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation [Confidential Version] (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 171 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal (1) The Unredacted Version of RealNetworks' Opposition to Defs' Motion for Sanction for Spoliation of Evidence; (2) The Unredacted Version of the Declarations of Tracy Tosh Lane, William)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 170 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 169 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Declaration of William Way in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 168 Declaration of Phil Barrett in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 167 Declaration of Rishi Mathew in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 166 Declaration of John Moore in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 165 Declaration of Dale DeWhitt in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 164 Declaration of Brent Wood in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 163 Declaration of Richard Wolpert in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 162 Declaration of Jeff Leitner in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 161 Declaration of Dave Watson in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 160 Declaration of Lindsey Godfrey in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 159 Declaration of Jeff Chasen in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and realNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 158 Declaration of James Brennan in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and realNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 157 Declaration of James Bielman in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and realNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 156 Declaration of Todd Basche in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 155 Declaration of Jeff Albertson in Support of Plaintiffs RealNetworks, Inc. and realNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Spoliation filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 154 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 146 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Ouweleen (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 9, 2009 Filing 153 Proposed Order re 152 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611029778) by Realnetworks, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 Filing 152 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Karma M. Giulianelli Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611029778) filed by Realnetworks, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 6, 2009 Filing 146 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.) filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 5, 2009 Filing 151 Proposed Order re 150 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611029649) by Realnetworks, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 5, 2009 Filing 150 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Donald E. Scott Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611029649) filed by Realnetworks, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 4, 2009 Filing 149 Proposed Order re 148 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611029590) by Realnetworks, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 4, 2009 Filing 148 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Alan E. Littmann Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611029590) filed by Realnetworks, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 141 Motion to Seal versions of Joinder in Motion for Sanctions AS AMENDED BY COURT (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 2, 2009 Filing 350 NOTICE of Joinder and Joinder in Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
March 2, 2009 Filing 144 Memorandum in Opposition re 135 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Studios' Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence filed byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
March 2, 2009 Filing 143 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. (1) Notice of Joinder and Joinder of DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. in Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence (Highly Confidential - Filed Under Seal) and (2) [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence (Highly Confidential - Filed Under Seal) (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
March 2, 2009 Filing 142 Proposed Order re 141 MOTION to Seal DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC.'S APPLICATION TO SEAL HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL VERSIONS OF (1) JOINDER IN MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE, AND (2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EV MOTION to Seal DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC.'S APPLICATION TO SEAL HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL VERSIONS OF (1) JOINDER IN MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE, AND (2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EV by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
March 2, 2009 Filing 141 MOTION to Seal DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC.'S APPLICATION TO SEAL HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL VERSIONS OF (1) JOINDER IN MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE, AND (2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
March 2, 2009 Filing 140 Proposed Order re 139 Joinder, [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE - PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
March 2, 2009 Filing 139 Joinder re 129 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Public Redacted Version NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. IN MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOILATION OF EVIDENCE - PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING Hearing on Motions 98 MOTION to Dismiss, 129 MOTION for Sanctions, 104 MOTION for to Preclude Claims Based on Non-CSS Technologies or Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee to 3/16/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/27/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 137 Proposed Order re 135 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Studios' Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 136 Declaration of Rebecca Gose Lynch in Support of 135 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Studios' Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 135 ) (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 135 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Studios' Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 134 Proposed Order re 133 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of (1) Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence, (2) Declaration of Rebecca Gose Lynch in Support thereof, (3) Declaration of Dr. John P.J. Kelly in Support Thereof, an MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of (1) Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence, (2) Declaration of Rebecca Gose Lynch in Support thereof, (3) Declaration of Dr. John P.J. Kelly in Support Thereof, an MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of (1) Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence, (2) Declaration of Rebecca Gose Lynch in Support thereof, (3) Declaration of Dr. John P.J. Kelly in Support Thereof, an by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 133 MOTION to Seal Document Application to Seal Highly Confidential Versions of (1) Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence, (2) Declaration of Rebecca Gose Lynch in Support thereof, (3) Declaration of Dr. John P.J. Kelly in Support Thereof, and (4) Proposed Order Granting Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 132 Proposed Order re 129 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Public Redacted Version Public Redacted Version by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 131 Declaration of Dr. John P.J. Kelly in Support of 129 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Public Redacted Version Public Redacted Version filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Related document(s) 129 ) (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 130 Declaration of Rebecca Gose Lynch in Support of 129 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Public Redacted Version Public Redacted Version with Public Exhibits filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Related document(s) 129 ) (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 129 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof - Public Redacted Version filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 20, 2009 Filing 128 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss DVD CCA's Second Counterclaim by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Lane, Tracy) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 125 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 3, 2009, before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine Triska, Telephone number (650) 743-8425. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2009. (cat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 9, 2009 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Support Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.'s Second Counterclaim filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 123 MOTION to Seal Document Administrative Motion for Filing Under seal (1) Unredacted Version of RealNetworks' Motion to Preclude Claims Based on Non-CSS Technologies or, Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee; and (2) Exhibits E-H, Inclusive to the Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane ISO Plaintiffs' and Counterclaim Defendants Motion to Shorten Time and Motion to Preclude or Continue filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Filing Under Seal)(Lane, Tracy) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 122 MOTION to Seal Document Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal (1) Unredacted Version of RealNetworks Reply ISO Motion to Preclude Claims Based on Non-CSS Technologies or, Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee; and (2) Exhibits A-C, inclusive to the Supplemental Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane ISO Plaintiffs' and Counterclaim Defendants Motion to Preclude or Continue filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal)(Lane, Tracy) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 109 defendants' Motion to Seal response to motion for preliminary injunction (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 363 EXHIBITS A,B and C to the Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Reply in support of Motion to Preclude Claims based on Non-CSS Technologies or, Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 362 Reply Memorandum re 360 MOTION to Preclude Claims based on Non-CSS Technologies or, Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 120 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 2/3/2009 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 2/3/2009);Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Christine Triska.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/3/2009)
February 2, 2009 Filing 119 MOTION to Seal Document Reply in Support of Motion to Preclude Claims Based on Non-CSS Technologies or, Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 Filing 118 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Reply in Support of 104 Motion to Preclude Claims Based on Non-CSS Technologies or, Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 2/2/2009) Modified on 2/4/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2009 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Support of 104 Motion to Preclude Claims Based on Non-CSS Technologies or, Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 2/2/2009) Modified on 2/4/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2009 Filing 116 Memorandum in Opposition re 98 MOTION to Dismiss DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.'s Second Counterclaim OPPOSITION OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND COUNTERCLAIM filed byDVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 127 Declaration of Rohit K. Singla in Support of 126 Response filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 126 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 126 Response to Realnetworks' Motion to Extend Preliminary Injunction Schedule or Exclude Topics by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 113 Memorandum in Opposition RESPONSE OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. TO REALNETWORKS' MOTION TO EXTEND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SCHEDULE OR EXCLUDE TOPICS; DECLARATION OF REGINALD D. STEER filed byDVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 111 DECLARATION of Rebecca Gose Lynch in Opposition to 104 MOTION for Hearing Motion to Preclude Claims Based on Non-CSS Technologies or Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee DECLARATION OF REBECCA GOSE LYNCH IN SUPPORT OF STUDIOS' RESPONSE TO REAL'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME OR EXCLUDE TOPICS FROM THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 110 Declaration of Rohit K. Singla in Support of 108 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Real's Motion to Extend Time or Exclude Topics From The Preliminary-Injunction Hearing - Public Redacted Version filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B & C)(Related document(s) 108 ) (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 109 MOTION to Seal Document 108 Memorandum in Opposition,, APPLICATION TO SEAL (1) MOTION PICTURE STUDIOS' RESPONSE TO REAL'S MOTION TO EXTEND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SCHEDULE OR EXCLUDE TOPICS, AND (2) DECLARATION OF ROHIT SINGLA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION PICTURE STUDIOS' RESPONSE TO REAL'S MOTION TO EXTEND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SCHEDULE OR EXCLUDE TOPICS filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 108 Memorandum in Opposition re 104 MOTION for Hearing Motion to Preclude Claims Based on Non-CSS Technologies or Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee MOTION PICTURE STUDIO PARTIES' RESPONSE TO REALNETWORKS' MOTION TO EXTEND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SCHEDULE OR EXCLUDE TOPICS filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/28/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 106 Proposed Order [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 361 EXHIBITS E,F,G and H to the Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in support of Motion to Shorten Time and Motion to Preclude or Continue filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 360 MOTION to Preclude Claims based on Non-CSS Technologies or, Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 105 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of Plaintiffs' and Counterclaim Defendants' Motion to Shorten Time and Motion to Preclude or Continue filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 104 MOTION for Hearing Motion to Preclude Claims Based on Non-CSS Technologies or Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting RealNetworks' Motion to Preclude Claims Based on Non-CSS Technologies or Alternatively, to Continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing and for the Appointment of a Discovery Referee)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 103 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiffs' and Counterclaim Defendants' Motion to Preclude or Continue and for a Discovery Referee filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting RealNetworks' Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiffs' and Counterclaim Defendants' Motion to Preclude or Continue and for a Discovery Referee)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 102 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Filing Under Seal)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 101 Letter from Plaintiffs RealNetworks to Judge Patel re Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date & Schedule. (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 99 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.'s Second Counterclaim and to Strike Affirmative Defenses Filed on December 4, 2008 (Lane, Tracy) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 16, 2009 Filing 98 MOTION to Dismiss DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.'s Second Counterclaim filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2009 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss DVD CCA's Second Counterclaim)(Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 100 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/3/08, before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter Juanita Gonzalez. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 97 Answer to Amended Complaint of Declaratory Judgment byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 96 ANSWER to Complaint ANSWER OF DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; COUNTERCLAIMS, COUNTERCLAIM against Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. byDVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 9, 2009 Filing 95 **FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD**ADR Clerk's Notice Re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ls7, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009) Modified on 1/22/2009 (ls7, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2009 Filing 94 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/3/08, before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Juanita Gonzalez, Telephone number 925) 978-3411. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/1/2009. (Gonzalez, Juanita) (Filed on 1/4/2009) Modified on 1/5/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2008 Filing 93 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Robert Henry Rotstein Re: Betsy Zedek (Rotstein, Robert) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 Filing 92 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2008 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 12/23/2008) re 65 MOTION to Strike, 62 MOTION to Amend/Correct ; Further Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/23/2008)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 85 defendants' Motion to obtain sealed 10/3/2008 transcript (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 90 Letter from James A. DiBoise on behalf of Plaintiffs in response to 12/19/08 letter from Munger Tolles re deposition of Nicole Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Lane, Tracy) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 21, 2008 Filing 89 Letter from Real Networks Regarding Issues in Advance of Preliminary Injunction Proceeding. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 12/21/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 88 Proposed Order Denying Studio Defendants' Administrative Motion to Obtain Sealed Transcript of October 3, 2008 Hearing by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (DiBoise, James) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 87 Memorandum in Opposition to Studio Defendants' Administrative Motion to Obtain Sealed Transcript of October 3, 2008 Hearing filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (DiBoise, James) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 86 Letter from Rohit K. Singla to Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel Regarding the Deposition of Ms. Nicole Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Rohit K. Singla)(Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 18, 2008 Filing 85 MOTION to Authorize Court Reporter to Provide Copy of Sealed Transcript filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 17, 2008 Filing 84 Certificate of Interested Entities by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 80 plaintiff's Motion to Seal declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in support of reply (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 115 Declaration of Tracy Tosh in Support of 62 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc..FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 62 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Support of Motion to Strike DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 81 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal The Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane ISO Motion for Leave to Amend filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Lane, Tracy) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 80 MOTION to Seal Document 79 Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2008 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lane, Tracy) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 79 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane ISO of Motion for Leave to Amend- NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING UNDER SEAL filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Lane, Tracy) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Lane, Tracy) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 4, 2008 Filing 77 Proposed Order re 76 MOTION to Dismiss Second CounterClaim and Strike Affirmative Defenses of DVD CCA by Realnetworks, Inc.(a Washington corporation), Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
December 4, 2008 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss Second CounterClaim and Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Realnetworks, Inc.(a Washington corporation), Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
December 1, 2008 Filing 75 Joinder re 72 Memorandum in Opposition, JOINDER OF DVD CCA IN MOTION PICTURE STUDIOS' OPPOSITION TO REALNETWORKS, INC. AND REALNETWORKS HOME ENTERTAINMENT, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF REGINALD D. STEER IN SUPPORT OF JOINDER OF DVD CCA IN MOTION PICTURE STUDIOS' OPPOSITION TO REALNETWORKS, INC. AND REALNETWORKS HOME ENTERTAINMENT, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND)(Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
December 1, 2008 Filing 74 Declaration of Ravi Sekhar in Support of 72 Memorandum in Opposition, to Motion to Amend Complaint, filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) 72 ) (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
December 1, 2008 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 62 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint of Glenn Pomerantz filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
December 1, 2008 Filing 72 Memorandum in Opposition re 62 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Paramount Pictures Corp.(a Delaware corporation), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
December 1, 2008 Filing 71 Memorandum in Opposition re 65 MOTION to Strike DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 65-2 and 7-2 and F.R.C.P. 7(b)(1) MOTION to Strike DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 65-2 and 7-2 and F.R.C.P. 7(b)(1) DVD CCA'S OPPOSITION TO REALNETWORKS AND REAL NETWORKS HOME ENTERTAINMENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE DVD CCA'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byDVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF REGINALD D. STEER IN SUPPORT OF DVD CCA'S OPPOSITION TO REALNETWORKS AND REALNETWORKS HOME ENTERTAINMENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE DVD CCA'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)(Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 20, 2008 Filing 70 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) of Withdrawal of Motion to Shorten Time on RealNetwork's Motion for Leave to Amend (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 20, 2008 Filing 69 NOTICE by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Renotice of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 20, 2008 Filing 68 Letter from Reginald Steer Regarding Discovery Disputes. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 20, 2008 Filing 67 Letter from Rohit K. Singla Regarding Discovery Disputes. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 20, 2008 Filing 66 Letter from Colleen Bal re protective order, discovery and PI briefing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 17, 2008 Filing 65 MOTION to Strike DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 65-2 and 7-2 and F.R.C.P. 7(b)(1) filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 11, 2008 Filing 64 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 09:00 AM. (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2008)
November 11, 2008 Filing 63 Declaration of Colleen Bal in Support of Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2008)
November 11, 2008 Filing 62 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 61 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 60 AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND, COUNTERCLAIM OF DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT DVD COPY CONTROL ASSOCIATION, INC. against Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. byDVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 57 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 15 Counterclaim, Plaintiffs & Counterclaim Defendants RealNetworks, Inc. & Real Networks Home Entertainment, Inc.'s Answer to Counter-Complaint byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 56 Letter from Colleen Bal on Behalf of RealNetworks, Inc.. (DiBoise, James) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 55 Letter from Bart H. Williams Regarding Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 54 STIPULATION STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR STUDIO DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND REAL'S ANSWER TO COUNTERCOMPLAINT by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint byDVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 49 Motion to RELATE AND CONSOLIDATE C 08-4719 CRB to this action (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 51 Letter from Glenn D. Pomerantz Regarding Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Discovery. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 50 Letter from Colleen Bal on Behalf of RealNetworks, Inc.. (DiBoise, James) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 49 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Stipulation)(Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 16, 2008 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT re 47 Notice of Appearance PROOF OF SERVICE by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Reginald David Steer (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 34 defendants' Motion to Seal reply in support of application for TRO (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 45 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2008 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 10/9/2008) re 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order < (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 44 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/07/08, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2009. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 114 Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DVD Copy Control Association, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 20 plaintiffs' Motion to seal declaration of Jacqueline Lang in opposition to defendants' application for TRO (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. re: Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - Confidential Version Filed Under Seal (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 39 Declaration of Dr. Alan E. Bell in Support of 36 Response in Support, Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Related document(s) 36 ) (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 38 Declaration of Dr. John P. Kelly in Support of 36 Response in Support, Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Inunction Thereof filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Related document(s) 36 ) (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 37 Declaration of Glenn D. Pomerantz in Support of 36 Response in Support, Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re: Prelimary Injunction Thereof filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Support re 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 35 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 34 MOTION to Seal Document APPLICATION TO SEAL DEFENDANT/COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 42 NOTICE of Posting Bond by Realnetworks, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Service of Confidential Documents Filed Under Seal (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 30 NOTICE by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) Manual Filing Notification of Confidential Version of Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants' Opposition Brief (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 29 Declaration of Edward W. Felten in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition, Public Version filed byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) 22 ) (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 28 Declaration of Jacqueline Lang in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition, Public Version filed byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) 22 ) (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 27 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part II), # 3 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 26 Declaration of Gordon L. Klein in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) 22 ) (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 25 Declaration of Timothy F. Bresnahan in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) 22 ) (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 24 Declaration of Jeffrey Buzzard in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) 22 ) (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. Notice of Manual Filing (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition re 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 21 Declaration of Tracy Tosh Lane in Support of 20 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed byRealnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) 20 ) (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 6, 2008 Filing 20 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 43 Minute Entry: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (Date Filed: 10/3/2008). FILED UNDER SEAL (gba, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE DISREGARD SEALED Minute Entry: (gba, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/8/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Marilyn H. Patel for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 10/03/08. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 19 Amended Proof of Service by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Text modified on 10/6/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ERRATA by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. re 11 Certificate of Service (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Text modified on 10/6/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 17 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Text modified on 10/6/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 16 Application for Temporary Restraning Order and Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction re 8 filed by Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc., (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Text modified on 10/6/2008 conforming to posted document cation (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 15 COUNTER-Complaint against Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. Filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Text modified on 10/6/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 13 (Proposed) Order Granting Application to Seal (1) Notice of Application and Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and (2) Declaration of Glenn D. Pomerantz in Support of Ex Parte Application re ( 12 ) by Disney Enterprises, Inc. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Linkage added on 10/6/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 12 Application to Seal (1) Notice of Application and Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities and (2) Declaration of Glenn D. Pomerantz in Support of Ex Parte Application filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 11 Proof of Service re ( 10 ) by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 10 (Proposed) Temporary Retraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Text modified on 10/6/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 9 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Counter-Complaintants by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Text Modified on 10/6/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 8 PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION -- Application and Ex-Parte Application for Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re; Preliminary Injunction filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) c(Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Text modified on 10/6/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 7 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 15 . *** COUNTER-Complaint against all plaintiffs by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/6/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Text modified on 10/3/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2008 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DVD Copy Control Association, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2009. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2009 01:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 2 EXHIBIT - 1 to the Complaint for Declaratory Relief re 1 Complaint, filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief (Summons Issued); jury demand; against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611023854). Filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Realnetworks, Inc. et al v. DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realnetworks, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Tosh Lane, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Tosh Lane, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Betsy Adelman Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Pictures Corp.
Represented By: Betsy Adelman Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Betsy Adelman Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
Represented By: Betsy Adelman Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Rohit K. Singla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Betsy Adelman Zedek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Rohit K. Singla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Rohit K. Singla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Paramount Pictures Corp.
Represented By: Rohit K. Singla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Rohit K. Singla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
Represented By: Rohit K. Singla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Rohit K. Singla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Realnetworks, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?