Brave New Films 501 (C)(4) v. Weiner et al Featured Case

Talk radio host Michael Weiner (aka Michael Savage) and his syndication network, Original Talk Radio Network, filed a DMCA takedown request for YouTube to remove a video made by Brave New Films containing clips of Savage\'s commentary. Brave New Films is suing Savage and OTRN for a declaratory judgment that Savage\'s material in the video is a fair use. Plaintiff is also suing Savage and OTRN for damages and injunctive relief, based on alleged misrepresentations made via the takedown notice to YouTube. http://cyberlaw.stanford.edu/case/brave-new-films-v-savage

Plaintiff: Brave New Films 501 (C)(4)
Defendant: Michael Weiner and Original Talk Radio Network Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv04703
Filed: October 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Copyright Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees incuured in this action. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 97 STIPULATION and Order Dismissing Complaint by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4), Original Talk Radio Network Inc., Michael Weiner. (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUEST WITHOUT PREJUDICE [Docket No. 94] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 27, 2009 Filing 95 Letter from Benjamin Shapiro, attorney for Michael Weiner and OTRN requesting denial of letter to compel by Plaintiff Brave New Films. (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/27/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 94 Letter from PLAINTIFF LETTER BRIEF RE DISCOVERY ISSUES. (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2009 03:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 93 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/12/2009 before Illston Case continued to 10/16/09 @ 3:00 p.m. for Further Case Management Conference Case continued to 10/16/09 @ 9:00 a.m. for Motion for Summary Judgment (file 9/11/09, opposition 9/25/09, reply 10/5/09) Discovery Cutoff: Designate Experts by: , Rebuttal Experts:, Expert Date Filed: 6/17/2009), ***Motions terminated: 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment Proposed Order filed by Original Talk Radio Network Inc., 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Original Talk Radio Network Inc., 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Notice of Motion filed by Michael Weiner.. () (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/17/2009) Modified on 6/17/2009 (ts, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 91 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement filed by Michael Weiner, Original Talk Radio Network Inc., Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 90 Request for Judicial Notice re 89 Reply Memorandum, SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT filed byBrave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Related document(s) 89 ) (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 89 Reply Memorandum re 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Reply Brief In Support filed byBrave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER taking defts. motion off 6/12/09 calendar (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 87 Memorandum in Opposition re 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byOriginal Talk Radio Network Inc.. (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 86 Declaration of Ronald Severaid in Support of 83 Memorandum in Opposition filed byMichael Weiner. (Related document(s) 83 ) (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 85 Declaration of Carter Glahn in Support of 83 Memorandum in Opposition filed byMichael Weiner. (Related document(s) 83 ) (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 84 Declaration of Benjamin Shapiro in Support of 83 Memorandum in Opposition filed byMichael Weiner. (Related document(s) 83 ) (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 83 Memorandum in Opposition re 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byMichael Weiner. (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 21, 2009 Filing 82 STIPULATION re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Notice of Motion, 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment Stipulation and [Proposed] Order To Continue Hearing by Michael Weiner, Original Talk Radio Network Inc., Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT OTRN'S MOTION FOR A SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 9, 2009 Filing 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment Proposed Order filed by Original Talk Radio Network Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Glahn, Carter) (Filed on 5/9/2009)
May 9, 2009 Filing 79 Reply to 71 Opposition to Motion for additional protective order filed byOriginal Talk Radio Network Inc.. (Glahn, Carter) (Filed on 5/9/2009) Modified on 5/11/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2009 Filing 78 NOTICE of JOINDER by Michael Weiner re 63 MOTION for Protective Order (Supplemental) Notice of Joinder (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/8/2009) Modified on 5/11/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2009 Filing 77 Declaration in Support of 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Notice of Motion filed byMichael Weiner. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 76 Declaration of Carter Glahn in Support of 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Notice of Motion filed byMichael Weiner. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 75 Declaration of Benjamin Shapiro in Support of 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Notice of Motion filed byMichael Weiner. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Notice of Motion filed by Michael Weiner. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B: 9/29/08 Letter, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A: BNF Website Posting)(Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 5, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 63 MOTION for Protective Order (Supplemental), 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2009 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER setting summary judgment motions for 6/12/09 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Sheila M. Pierce in Opposition to 71 Memorandum in Opposition, 63 MOTION for Protective Order (Supplemental) filed byBrave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Defendant Original Talk Radio Network Inc.'s Motion for Supplemental Protective Order)(Related document(s) 71 , 63 ) (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 71 Memorandum in Opposition re 63 MOTION for Protective Order (Supplemental) PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' OPPOSITION TO THE ORIGINAL TALK RADIO NETWORK INC.'S MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byBrave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 70 STIPULATION re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING by Michael Weiner, Original Talk Radio Network Inc., Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 69 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Brave New Films 501(c)(4) byMichael Weiner. (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 17, 2009 Filing 68 Renotice motion hearing OTRN Motion for Summary Judgment filed byOriginal Talk Radio Network Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 67 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2009 03:00 PM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MICHAEL SAVAGE'S MOTION TO DISMISS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 65 Proposed Order filed by Original Talk Radio Network Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Glahn, Carter) (Filed on 4/10/2009) Modified on 4/13/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2009 Filing 64 Declaration of Ronald H. Severaid in Support of 63 MOTION for Protective Order (Supplemental) filed byOriginal Talk Radio Network Inc.. (Related document(s) 63 ) (Glahn, Carter) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 63 MOTION for Protective Order (Supplemental) filed by Original Talk Radio Network Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Glahn, Carter) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 8, 2009 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Aaron Shapiro Notice of Association of Counsel Severaid and Glahn (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 8, 2009 Filing 61 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 62 . *** NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Benjamin Aaron Shapiro Association of Counsel Severaid and Glahn (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/8/2009) Modified on 4/9/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2009 Filing 60 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael Weiner, Original Talk Radio Network Inc., Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 1, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2009 03:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
April 1, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2009 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
April 1, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2009 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER continuing motions and cmc to 4/17/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/31/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PROTECTIVE ORDER. re 57 Signed by Judge Illston on 3/31/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 30, 2009 Filing 57 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 30, 2009 Filing 56 STIPULATION re 24 MOTION to Dismiss, 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing for Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference and Set Dates for Summary Judgment Hearing by Michael Weiner, Original Talk Radio Network Inc., Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 27, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2009 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 55 CLERKS NOTICE, CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2009 09:00 AM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 54 Reply to 49 Opposition re 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed byMichael Weiner. (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/20/2009) Modified on 3/23/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER taking off calendar summary judgment motions (to be reset by parties). Signed by Judge Illston on 3/12/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 52 STIPULATION re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING by Michael Weiner, Original Talk Radio Network Inc., Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 2, 2009 Filing 51 EXHIBIT G re 50 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byBrave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Related document(s) 50 ) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
March 2, 2009 Filing 50 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF 49 PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS 501(C)(4)'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL WEINER AKA MICHAEL SAVAGE'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed byBrave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B)(Related document(s) 49 , 24 ) (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 3/2/2009) Modified on 3/5/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2009 Filing 49 Memorandum in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL WEINER AKA MICHAEL SAVAGE'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed byBrave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MICHAEL WEINER AKA MICHAEL SAVAGE'S MOTION TO DISMISS)(Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 48 Proposed Order re 43 Motion for summary judgment filed by Original Talk Radio Network Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Glahn, Carter) (Filed on 2/27/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2009 Filing 47 Request for Judicial Notice in support of 43 motion for Summary Judgment filed byOriginal Talk Radio Network Inc.. (Glahn, Carter) (Filed on 2/27/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2009 Filing 46 Declaration of Ronald H. Severaid in support of 43 Summary Judgment filed byOriginal Talk Radio Network Inc.. (Glahn, Carter) (Filed on 2/27/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2009 Filing 45 Declaration of Carter Glahn in support of 43 Summary Judgment filed byOriginal Talk Radio Network Inc.. (Glahn, Carter) (Filed on 2/27/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2009 Filing 44 Declaration of Benjamin A. Shapiro in support of 43 Summary Judgment filed byOriginal Talk Radio Network Inc.. (Glahn, Carter) (Filed on 2/27/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2009 Filing 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Original Talk Radio Network Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Glahn, Carter) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 42 Request for Judicial Notice re 41 Declaration in Support,, 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byBrave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits C & D, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits E, F, & G)(Related document(s) 41 , 40 ) (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 41 Declaration of James Gilliam in Support of 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DECLARATION OF JAMES GILLIAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byBrave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Related document(s) 40 ) (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 20, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2009 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER continuing hearing (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 19, 2009 Filing 38 STIPULATION re 24 MOTION to Dismiss STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING by Michael Weiner, Original Talk Radio Network Inc., Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 11, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2009 03:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER setting 4/3/09 for motions and continuing cmc to 4/3/09. Motion to Dismiss shall remain on 3/13/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/10/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
February 7, 2009 Filing 36 STIPULATION to Set Briefing Schedule for Motions for Summary Judgment by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Ahrens, Julie) (Filed on 2/7/2009)
January 27, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2009 03:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 35 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/23/2009 before Illston (Date Filed: 1/27/2009). case continued to 3/13/09 () (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2009)
January 22, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 1/22/09. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 22, 2009 Filing 34 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael Weiner, Original Talk Radio Network Inc., Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification on behalf of Defendant OTRN (Shapiro, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 32 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 1/22/09 at 10:00 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 16, 2009 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4) re 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options, 30 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) PROOF OF SERVICE (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 16, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) re 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options re document 29 ) (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 16, 2009 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 14, 2009 Filing 28 ERRATA re 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Weiner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reilly, Christine) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting substitution. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/13/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting substitution. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/23/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Original Talk Radio Network Inc. (Reilly, Christine) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 11, 2009 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael Weiner. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Christine) (Filed on 1/11/2009)
January 11, 2009 Filing 23 Proposed Order /Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Michael Weiner. (Reilly, Christine) (Filed on 1/11/2009)
January 11, 2009 Filing 22 Proposed Order /Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Original Talk Radio Network Inc.. (Reilly, Christine) (Filed on 1/11/2009)
January 11, 2009 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael Weiner aka Michael Savage (Reilly, Christine) (Filed on 1/11/2009)
January 11, 2009 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Original Talk Radio Network Inc. (Reilly, Christine) (Filed on 1/11/2009)
January 11, 2009 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Damages byOriginal Talk Radio Network Inc.. (Reilly, Christine) (Filed on 1/11/2009)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RELATING CASE 07-6076. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER extending deadlines; cmc remains on 1/23/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/3/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
December 3, 2008 Filing 15 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Second Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Enlarging Case Dates; Proposed Order by Michael Weiner, Original Talk Radio Network Inc.. (Reilly, Christine) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 14, 2008 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 13, 2008 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4) re 12 Clerks Notice, 13 Order Relating Case (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 13, 2008 Filing 13 ***ERRONEOUS ATTACHMENT***ORDER RELATING CASE to 07-6076. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 13, 2008 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2009 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 3, 2008 Filing 11 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Extending Time to Respond by Michael Weiner, Original Talk Radio Network Inc.. (Reilly, Christine) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). Michael Weiner served on 10/15/2008, answer due 11/4/2008. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4). Original Talk Radio Network Inc. served on 10/15/2008, answer due 11/4/2008. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4) re 6 Certificate of Interested Entities, 7 Certificate of Service AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4) re 6 Certificate of Interested Entities (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4) PLAINTIFF BRAVE NEW FILMS 501(C)(4)'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES AND PERSONS (CIVIL L.R. 3-16) (Pierce, Sheila) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding COPYRIGHT INGRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2009. Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2009 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/10/08. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement re 1 Complaint filed byBrave New Films 501 (C)(4). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE TO c07-6076 SI by Brave New Films 501 (C)(4) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT / issued summons against Michael Weiner, Original Talk Radio Network Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611024298.). Filed byBrave New Films 501 (C)(4). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2008: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit E) (ga, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2008: # 4 Exhibit D) (ga, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brave New Films 501 (C)(4) v. Weiner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Original Talk Radio Network Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brave New Films 501 (C)(4)
Represented By: Christopher Kay Ridder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?