Sussex Financial Enterprises, Inc. v. Bayerische Hypo-Und Vereinsbank AG et al

Plaintiff: Sussex Financial Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Bayerische Hypo-Und Vereinsbank AG, HVB Risk Mangement Products, Inc. and HVB U.S. Finance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv04791
Filed: October 17, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2010 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 181 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 182 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 187 Motion for Summary Judgment (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
June 23, 2010 217 Opinion or Order of the Court JURY TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/23/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
March 17, 2010 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 171 Objections to Order to compel; granting in part and denying in part 172 Motion for Relief; finding as moot 174 Motion to Shorten Time (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 167 Objections to Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/17/2010. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
January 21, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Scheduling of Expert Disclosures and Depositions. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/21/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 6, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 105 Motion to Dismiss; denying 125 Motion to Strike (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
October 23, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES AND TRANSFER re 85 MOTION to Transfer Case and Administrative Motion for an Order Determining Cases Related. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/23/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009) Modified on 10/23/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 49 Motion to Dismiss; denying 63 Motion to Strike (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
July 1, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 38 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Sussex Financial Enterprises, Inc. is required to E-FILE the amended document (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sussex Financial Enterprises, Inc. v. Bayerische Hypo-Und Vereinsbank AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sussex Financial Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Leonard Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayerische Hypo-Und Vereinsbank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HVB Risk Mangement Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HVB U.S. Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?