Alcala v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Javier Alcala
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv04828
Filed: October 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Hamilton re reply to summary judgment order; order granting 91 Motion for Summary Judgment (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 86 Motion for Sanctions.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES IN PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE AND OF FILING REQUIREMENT FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/8/13. THE PARTIES ARE HANDED COPIES OF ORDER IN OPEN COURT(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 46 Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting Monsanto Co.'s Request That Its Corporate Representative Be Excused from Personal Attendance at ENE Session. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 4/6/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcala v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Alcala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Lawrence Paul Riff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?