United Microelectronics Corporation v. LSI Corporation
Plaintiff: United Microelectronics Corporation
Defendant: LSI Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv04991
Filed: October 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Patent Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 28, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 27, 2009 Filing 51 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE and [PROPOSED] ORDER by United Microelectronics Corporation. (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 8, 2009 Filing 50 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties to this matter have advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement. Therefore, you are hereby notified that the Settlement Conference set for April 14, 2009, at9:30 a.m., before the Honorable Joseph C. Spero is VACATED (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS. Deadline date of 4/1/9 to submit settlement conference statements is extended to 4/6/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 04/01/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF AMENDED PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 1, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 30, 2009 Filing 47 Proposed Order and Joint Request to Extend Deadline to Submit Settlement Conference Statements by LSI Corporation. (Ririe, Spencer) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 26, 2009 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT [FIRST] FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against all defendants. Filed byUnited Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 26, 2009 Filing 45 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF AMENDED PLEADINGS by United Microelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 4/15/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/27/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 43 Minute Entry: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/26/9 before Judge Spero. Court to prepare Order. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 42 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING A TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE before Judge Spero on 2/26/9 at 2:00 PM. The Court will initiate the phone contact. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2009 at 2:00 PM. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 23, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Rutowski (Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Chen (Chen, Jerry) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE SCHEDULE FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PATENT LOCAL RULES. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 17, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 37 ERRATA Joint Proposed Schedule for Claim Construction and Patent Local Rules by LSI Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Schedule for Claim Construction and Patent Local Rules)(Ririe, Spencer) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 9, 2009 Filing 36 RESPONSE RE RECENT CORRESPONDENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 9, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 9, 2009 Filing 35 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-5-09, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 9, 2009 Filing 34 Letter from Edward G. Poplawski , counsel for LSI Corporation. (Poplawski, Edward) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 33 Letter from William L. Anthony, Jr.. (Anthony, William) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Mediation/Settlement. Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/23/2009 01:30 PM. A tutorial for the Court (to be conducted by counsel only, not experts) shall be set for 9/9/2009 at 1:30 PM. Discovery due by 11/30/2009. Jury Trial set for 4/5/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 1/7/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/5/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RELATING CASE. The more recently filed case C09-0202 MEJ is related to C08-4991 WHA and shall be reassigned to Judge Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/5/09. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 38 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/5/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 2/5/2009), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Spero for Mediation/Settlement Conference. Jury Trial set for 4/5/2010 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2010 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 30 CLERKS NOTICE the Court has reviewed the motion to relate C08-4991 WHA and C09-0202 MEJ and determined that no cases are related and no reassignment shall occur. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by United Microelectronics Corporation. (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 28 ERRATA Joint Request for Leave and [Proposed] Order Continuing Initial Disclosures by LSI Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ririe, Spencer) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 27 NOTICE by LSI Corporation and Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Attachments: #1 Errata Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Ririe, Spencer) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 26 NOTICE by LSI Corporation Under FRCP 7.1 and Civil L.R. 3-16 (Ririe, Spencer) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling CMC on Reassignment and in the Related Case. Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2009 02:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2009. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #16 Motion to Relate Case. The more recently filed case C09-0105 JCS is related to C08-4991WHA and shall be reassigned to Judge Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 16, 2009 Filing 22 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM BY LSI CORPORATION byUnited Microelectronics Corporation. (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Winston Ririe (Ririe, Spencer) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 20 LSI Rule 41(a) WITHDRAWAL of Claim re #13 Answer to Complaint, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, byLSI Corporation. (Ririe, Spencer) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ririe, Spencer) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 16 MOTION to Relate Case to Case No. 3:09-CV-00105-JCS filed by United Microelectronics Corporation. (No hearing required)(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/14/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re #14 Stipulation filed by United Microelectronics Corporation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/8/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 8, 2009 Filing 14 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by United Microelectronics Corporation. (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 24, 2008 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims byLSI Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Poplawski, Edward) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #11 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
December 1, 2008 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2009 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2009. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/25/08. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 24, 2008 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 8 STIPULATION (Joint) LR 6-1(A) Extension of Time to Respond to UMC's Complaint by LSI Corporation. (Poplawski, Edward) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 7 Joint Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by LSI Corporation and United Microelectronics Corporation. (Poplawski, Edward) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 4, 2008 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Microelectronics Corporation re #1 Complaint, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 ADR Scheduling Order, #2 Summons Issued (Anthony, William) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 5 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT & Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Filed by Plaintiff United Microelectronics Corporation. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 1/27/2009 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 2/3/2009 at 3:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant LSI Corporation. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement & Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued]against LSI Corporation, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 54611004138] Filed by Plaintiff United Microelectronics Corporation. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Microelectronics Corporation v. LSI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Microelectronics Corporation
Represented By: Nitin Subhedar
Represented By: William L. Anthony, Jr.
Represented By: Anupam Sharma
Represented By: Diana Rutowski
Represented By: Elizabeth A Howard
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Represented By: Matthew James Hawkinson
Represented By: William Harrison Wright, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Corporation
Represented By: Spencer Winston Ririe
Represented By: Edward G. Poplawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?