Shao v. Forster
Plaintiff: Yibo Shao
Defendant: Denis M. Forster
Case Number: 3:2008cv05112
Filed: November 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL re 133 Stipulation filed by Yibo Shao. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/3/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/18/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DENYING re 128 Letter filed by Yibo Shao for Mr. Shao to appear by phone at the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/6/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 4/16/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/24/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 20 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Yibo Shao, Attorney Feather D. Baron and David Charles Phillips terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/06/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to enlarge time to respond to complaint re 14 Stipulation filed by Denis M. Forster. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/02/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shao v. Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yibo Shao
Represented By: David Charles Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis M. Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?