Bryan et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donald C. Bryan, Virgil Caldwell, Carroll Hampton and Robert Rodriguez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc. and Jeffrey Hammond
Case Number: 3:2008cv05221
Filed: November 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FEES, COSTS, AND EHANCEMENT AWARDS 570 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S (1) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND (2) MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND DECERTIFICATION 560 561 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 555 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 535 JURY INSTRUCTIONS (FINAL) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 523 JURY INSTRUCTION - RESPONSE TO JURY QUESTION RE CONTROL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER RE: TRIAL BRIEFS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 514 JURY VERDICT FORMS (FINAL) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 505 [DRAFT] JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 INTRODUCTORY JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 436 JURY QUESTIONNAIRE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER RE: JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO STRIKE THE REPORTS AND OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' EXPERTS 336 360 361 365 372 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE CLASS; AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEAL 321 324 325 346 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL 323 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER RE: RECENTLY IDENTIFIED CLASS MEMBERS AND SCHEDULE ADJUSTMENTS 314 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY 290 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 255 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DATED MARCH 11, 2016 267 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Wal-Mart an extension of time to 4/11/16 to lodge their settlement conference statement. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/5/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 256 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (see order for details). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016) (Entered: 02/16/2016) (with Judge's signature) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER Re: Class Member Depositions. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/19/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SECOND AMENDED ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/17/15. (with Judge's signature) Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/17/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 CORRECTED ORDER RE: NEW TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES (SEE #231) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER, Motions terminated: 229 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. Jury Selection set for 9/19/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 9/1 9/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2016 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2016 03:30 PM before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/29/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015) Modified on 9/29/2015 (tfS, COURT STAFF).(11/20/15 CMC remains on calendar)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL 215 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER re 209 Statement filed by Charles Ridgway, 210 Statement filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that lead trial counsel for both parties shall meet and confer in person in Courtroom G no later than July 10, 2015. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/24/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY DISPUTE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTIN FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 181 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER, Motions terminated: 179 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/24/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER RE: CLASS NOTICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE 102 113 134 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 109 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 117 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER, Motions terminated: 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Continuance of Mediation and Class Certification Dates filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. Motion Hearing reserved for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston, mediation deadline extended. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/25/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 92 Stipulation Dismissing Claims of Plaintiffs Brown, Cole, and Bryson (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 74 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/13 is continued to 6/28/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/17/13. Motions terminated: 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Further CMC to June 28, 2013 filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 65 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRECERTIFICATION COMMUNICATION 42 52 52 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER, Continuing 6/15/12 case management conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER vacating 4/3/09 cmc (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND re 11 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C. Bryan
Represented By: Andrew Butler Jones, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Caldwell
Represented By: Andrew Butler Jones, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll Hampton
Represented By: Andrew Butler Jones, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew Butler Jones, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Julian Wing-Kai Poon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?