Harris v. Alameda County Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Harris
Defendant: Alameda County Medical Center and Jeanette L. Louden Corbet
Case Number: 3:2008cv05348
Filed: November 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Reopening Case. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/8/2012. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER. The clerk is DIRECTED to close the file administratively. Within 30 days of Harris's evidentiary hearing, the parties are ORDERED to notify the docket clerk to reopen the file and to submit a joint case management statement summarizing the hearing, its procedures and resolution. The parties shall additionally attach thereto any written or transcribed decision in the matter.(vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF ON DUE PROCESS CLAIM from 9/23/2010 up to and including 10/21/2010. Plaintiff may respond on or before 11/4/2010, re doc 75 filed by Alameda County Medical Center, Jeanette L. Louden Corbet. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/23/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of time to file reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment to and including 3/18/2010, re doc 59 filed by Alameda County Medical Center, Jeanette L. Louden Corbet. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/12/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 44 filed by Dawn Harris. The hearing on Defendant's amended motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative, summary adjudication, doc #40, shall be re-set for March 25, 2010 at 10:00 AM. Opposition due 2/15; Reply, if any due on 3/3. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/20/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED : Fact discovery cutoff is extended to 3/31/2010. Expert witness disclosures and Reports are extended to 4/2/2010. Rebuttal Expert/Reports are extended to 4/16/2010. Expert discovery cutoff is extended to 5/7/2010. The Court set a Trial Setting Conference for 6/3/2010 at 3:30 PM re doc 38 filed by Alameda County Medical Center, Jeanette L. Louden Corbet. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/23/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FACT DISCOVERY AND OTHER DEADLINES re doc 36 filed by Alameda County Medical Center, Jeanette L. Louden Corbet, Dawn Harris. Fact discovery cutoff is extended to 1/18/2010. Designation of experts 9; reports is extended to 1/29/2010. Rebuttal experts' reports is extended to 2/2/2010. Hearing on dispositive motions is continued to 2/4/2010 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/23/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re extension of time for discovery, doc 18 filed by Alameda County Medical Center, Jeanette L. Louden Corbet. Fact discovery cutoff is extended to 12/18/2009. Designation of experts' reports is extended to 1/4/2010. Rebuttal experts' reports is extended to 1/18/2010. Experts' discovery cutoff is extended to 1/28/2010. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/2/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/23/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Alameda County Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Harris
Represented By: Howard Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette L. Louden Corbet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?