Creditors Trade Association, Inc. v. Gemstone Publishing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Creditors Trade Association, Inc.
Defendant: Gemstone Publishing, Inc., Diamond Comic Distributors, Inc. and Stephen A. Geppi
Case Number: 3:2008cv05540
Filed: December 10, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/29/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
April 16, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue case management conference re 6 Stipulation filed by Creditors Trade Association, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
March 10, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing CMC re 4 Stipulation filed by Creditors Trade Association, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/10/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creditors Trade Association, Inc. v. Gemstone Publishing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creditors Trade Association, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Brion Provencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemstone Publishing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Comic Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen A. Geppi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?